HUDSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00081-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DENNIS D. HUDSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/9/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/29/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DENNIS D. HUDSON and USA Service:4/29/97. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41. (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Terminated Case
    Case closed (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER within 10 days of receiving this order, parties shall file a joint stipulation, or joint report ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Stipulation
        Stipulation of agreement. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by DENNIS D. HUDSON, USA. (FE) Modified on 11/06/1996
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report and reset Status Report deadline to 10/31/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996, Terminated: 10/23/1996 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/21/96) to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report (to October 31, 1996). (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [27-2] motion to Extend Time to file a response to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion for judgment on the administrative record and Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 10/21/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Stay proceedings (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996, Terminated: 9/4/1996 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/29/96) to Stay proceedings [to September 30, 1996] and to Extend Time to file a response to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion for judgment on the administrative record [to 14 days from denial of motion to stay]. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response for judgment upon the administrative record and Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 9/5/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996, Terminated: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response for judgment upon the administrative record until 9/5/96. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 8/22/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996, Terminated: 8/7/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/2/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [to August 22, 1996]. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Statement of Facts
                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by DENNIS D. HUDSON. Service: 7/18/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service: 7/12/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  CROSS MOTION by DENNIS D. HUDSON (Service: 7/8/96) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/8/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DENNIS D. HUDSON by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/8/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                      COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by DENNIS D. HUDSON by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/8/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER filing plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and accompanying documents by leave of the Judge and set Additional Documents [statement of facts] due: within five days of receipt of this order for DENNIS D. HUDSON (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Deadline updated; Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 8/8/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                            NOTICE of change of address by Mark Brian Ehrlich (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for judgment upon the administrative record and Response to [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 7/10/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996, Terminated: 6/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by DENNIS D. HUDSON to Extend Time to respond to motion for judgment upon the administrative record (to July 10, 1996). (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Administrative Record
                                                  Administrative record [two volumes] filed by USA. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record and granting [9-2] motion for Leave to File for waiver of the copying requirement (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/10/96 ) for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record. Response due: 6/10/96 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996 Statement of Facts
                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 5/10/96. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996, Terminated: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/10/96 ) for Leave to File the administrative record , and for Leave to File for waiver of the copying requirement . Response due: 5/28/96. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 5/10/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996, Terminated: 4/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/12/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 5/10/96. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint . Answer deadline to 4/30/96 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996, Terminated: 4/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/4/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until April 30, 1996). (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER outlining special procedures (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Brian Ehrlich Service : 2/16/96 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040919. Answer due on 4/9/96. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?