PARKER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00083-RBA
District Judge Roger B. Andewelt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MONROE PARKER, JR., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/12/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $650000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/23/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated 2/21/97, dismissed [16-1] appeal by MONROE PARKER JR. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [16-1] appeal by MONROE PARKER JR. CAFC NUMBER: 97-5028. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MONROE PARKER JR. Copy to defendant, Judge Andewelt and to CAFC. Fee waived, In Forma Pauperis. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 7/26/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/26/96 ) to [11-1] motion to Strike [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. Reply due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by MONROE PARKER JR. (Service : 6/9/96 ) to Strike [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA , (by leave of the Judge). Response due: 6/26/96. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                    NOTICE of change of address by Lauren Springer Moore (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service: 6/26/96) to Extend Time within which to (1) respond to plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's motion to dismiss, and (2) to reply to plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss [until 7/26/96]. Response due: (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                        MOTION by MONROE PARKER JR. (Service : 6/9/96 ) to Strike [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA , (by leave of the Judge). (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/10/96 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 6/10/96 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to answer plaintiff's complaint and reset Answer deadline to 5/13/96 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996, Terminated: 5/3/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/96) to Extend Time within which to answer plaintiff's complaint [to 5/13/96]. Response due: 4/29/96. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service : 2/29/96. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [2-1] complaint, granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996, Terminated: 2/12/1996 Terminated:
                                      COMPLAINT Answer due on 4/12/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by MONROE PARKER JR. (Service : 2/12/96) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?