POORE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00101-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JERRY L. POORE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Marguerite Freund +1 520 575 5555
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/20/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $891000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/3/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by JERRY L. POORE, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and reset Interrogatories deadline to 10/7/96 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Answer to Counterclaim
        ANSWER by JERRY L. POORE to counterclaim. Service: 9/12/96 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996, Terminated: 9/19/1996 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/13/96) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 10/6/96. Response due: 9/30/96 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Additional Documentation
            Additional Documentation [counterclaim] by USA. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File counterclaim (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Deadline updated; set Answer to counterclaim deadline to 9/23/96 . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996, Terminated: 8/30/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/28/96) for Leave to File counterclaim . Response due: 9/16/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/7/1996, Entered: 6/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER set Discovery deadline to 12/6/96 and set joint Status Report deadline to 12/23/96 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/11/1996 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 4/22/96 (JPSR due 6/10/96) (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: special procedures ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by G. Robson Stewart Service: 3/4/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 8), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040968. Answer due on 4/22/96. (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?