SHANE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00108-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL FORMER SHAREHOLDERS OF MERCURY SAVINGS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Kurt Rosen +1 310 788 7000 +1 213 891 8763
No Logo LEONARD SHANE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Kurt Rosen +1 310 788 7000 +1 213 891 8763
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesleyanne Koch Kessler +1 202 307 0277
Office COFC
Filed 2/22/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $800000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/8/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) form CAFC dated January 22, 1999 affirmed [19-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER the Clerk of Court is directed to return document entitled Complaint in Intervention of FDIC, received on 3/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by LEONARD SHANE, ALL FORMER SHAREHOLD. Copy to USA, Judge Wiese and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105,00; RECEIPT # 043165. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 01/14/1997
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
            SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION granting [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
              SEE 95-66- C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 10/28/96 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                  SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by LEONARD SHANE (Service: 10/7/96) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/18/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by LEONARD SHANE, ALL FORMER SHAREHOLD (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by LEONARD SHANE, ALL FORMER SHAREHOLD (Service : 6/24/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney John W. Karr for ALL FORMER SHAREHOLD, attorney John W. Karr for LEONARD SHANE Added Peter Kurt Rosen. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                  NOTICE of change of address by Arnold Mark Auerhan (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/16/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/22/96) to Stay pending decision in Winstar Corp . Response due: 5/9/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arnold Mark Auerhan. Service : 3/11/96. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040986. Answer due on 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?