CEDILLO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00117-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ONESIMO CEDILLO, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Mark Alexander +1 202 307 0361 +1 202 514 7965 gerald.alexander@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/27/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/16/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated 9/2/97 affirmed [31-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by ONESIMO CEDILLO. Copy to USA, Judge Bruggink and to CAFC. Fee Waived, In Forma Pauperis. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Published DecisionCourt Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [23-2] motion for Summary Judgment on administrative record (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
            [filed by leave of the Judge] RESPONSE by ONESIMO CEDILLO to [28-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 12/27/96 (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [23-2] motion for Summary Judgment on administrative record. Service: 12/11/96 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER filing plaintiffs motionf for summary judgment as a cross motion for summary judgment and plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for an enlargement of time by leave of the Judge and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/11/96 for [25-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for judgment on the administrative record (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                  RESPONSE by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service: 11/1/96) to [25-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for judgment on the administrative record by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/18/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                    CROSS MOTION by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service: 11/1/96) and RESPONSE to [23-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA, [23-2] motion for Summary Judgment on administrative record by USA by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/2/96 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Deadline updated; Response to [26-1] cross motion reset to 12/2/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/23/96) to Extend Time to reply to respond to motion for judgment on the administrative record [to December 11, 1996]. Response due: 11/12/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                          RESPONSE by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service: 10/16/96) to [23-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and [23-2] motion for Summary Judgment on administrative record by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/4/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/30/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment on administrative record by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/31/96. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                              Administrative record filed by USA by the leave of the Judge. Service: 9/30/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/30/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying [19-1] motion for trial by jury, denying [15-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and reset Answer deadline to 9/30/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996, Terminated: 8/27/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service: 8/19/96) for trial by jury . Response due: 9/5/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 8/21/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to 30 days after denial of motion to suspend proceedings or 60 days from date of AFBCMR decision on appeal]. Response due: 9/6/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/13/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service: 8/8/96) to [15-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 8/22/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/31/96) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 8/19/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/27/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                NOTICE of change of address by Gerald Mark Alexander (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996, Terminated: 6/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/19/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until August 27, 1996). Response due: 7/5/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 6/28/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996, Terminated: 4/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/23/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to June 28, 1996]. Response due: 5/10/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [8-1] motion for appointment of counsel (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996, Terminated: 4/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service : 3/22/96) for appointment of counsel . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gerald Mark Alexander. Service : 3/18/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [4-1] complaint, granting [3-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996, Terminated: 2/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. Answer due on 4/29/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by ONESIMO CEDILLO (Service : 2/27/96) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?