SHEIKH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00134-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHAEL M. SHEIKH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan R. Hyatt +1 503 326 3275
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Lane Tucker +1 202 514 7300
Office COFC
Filed 3/8/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $25000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/13/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of change of address by Dan R. Hyatt. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 Remark
      REMARK U.S. Postal Service returned mailing of November 18, 1998 as forwarding time has expired. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 68, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $8,400.00, inclusive of costs, interest, expenses, and attorney fees. Payment shall be made by check in the lump sum amount of $8,400.00, made payable jointly to plaintiff and his counsel, Dan R. Hyatt. Further, the Air Force agrees that it has not and will not initiate the debt establishment procedd to recoup the educational assistance Mr. Sheikh received. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Stipulation
              Stipulation by MICHAEL M. SHEIKH, USA for entry of judgment. (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/14/98 for the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or a status report. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/13/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998
                    STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 6/5/98 (AB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/1/98 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 11/14/97 (CDC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/12/97 (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 6/13/97 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/24/1997 Status ReportCourt Filing
                              Joint STATUS REPORT by MICHAEL M. SHEIKH and USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/9/97 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 3/21/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/21/97 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/22/97 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/3/97 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Continue Stay and set Status Report deadline to 1/3/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996, Terminated: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/13/96) to Continue Stay . (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996, Terminated: 12/19/1996 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/13/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER the stay is continued until 12/13/96, and set Status Report deadline to 12/13/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/15/96 ) to Continue Stay . Response due: 11/15/96 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/15/96. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER the stay is continued until 11/15/96, and set Status Report deadline to 11/15/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/4/96) to Continue Stay . (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Status Report
                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/4/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 11/4/96 and staying proceedings to said date (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/24/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Stay or enlarge proceedings until September 25, 1996 to file motion for judgment and set Status Report deadline to 9/25/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996, Terminated: 9/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/96) to Stay or enlarge proceedings until September 25, 1996 to file motion for judgment . (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 8/21/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996, Terminated: 8/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/8/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 8/21/96. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/8/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996, Terminated: 8/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/2/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to August 8, 1996]. Response due: 8/19/96 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/2/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996, Terminated: 7/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/8/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to August 2, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 7/8/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996, Terminated: 5/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/3/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until July 8, 1996). Response due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by S. Lane Tucker Service: 3/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041047. Answer due on 5/7/96. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?