LITTLE ARCH CREEK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00159-KRH
District Judge Kenneth R. Harkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LITTLE ARCH CREEK PROPERTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loyd M. Starrett +1 617 457 3100
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/20/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/23/1998
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
194-cv-00604-KRH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
SEE 94-604T FOR NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LITTLE ARCH CREEK, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
      Notice of reassignment to Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins. Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
        Notice of reassignment to Senior Judge Kenneth R. Harkins . Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Consolidate 94-604 T with this Case and transferring to Judge Harkins ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Set/Clear Flags
            Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 9-604 T for further proceedings. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/16/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 6/17/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service : 4/12/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996, Terminated: 5/24/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by LITTLE ARCH CREEK (Service : 3/27/96 ) to Consolidate 94-604 T with this Case . Response due: 4/15/96 Copy to defendant. (HW) Modified on 04/02/1996
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                    NOTICE by LITTLE ARCH CREEK of related case - ( 94-604 T). Copy to defendant. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibit A), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041091. Answer due on 5/20/96. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 90 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?