MATHENY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00198-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICK R. MATHENY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randi-Sue Rimerman Serota +1 202 307 0290
Office COFC
Filed 4/15/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/12/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by PATRICK R. MATHENY to response to [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 1/21/97 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to stay proceedings and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/22/97 for [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997, Terminated: 1/22/1997 Terminated:
            MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 1/13/97) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to stay proceedings [to January 22, 1997]. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to stay proceedings and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/14/97 for [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997, Terminated: 1/8/1997 Terminated:
                MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 1/4/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion to stay proceedings [to January 14, 1997]. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to stay and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/7/97 for [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996, Terminated: 12/20/1996 Terminated:
                    MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 12/18/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to stay [to January 10, 1997]. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to suspend proceedings and Response to [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings reset to 12/13/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/12/96 ) to [16-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 12/26/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996, Terminated: 12/12/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to suspend proceedings [to December 13, 1996]. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 11/21/96) to Stay Proceedings in order to submit new evidence to the ABCMR. Response due: 12/9/96 (FE) Modified on 12/11/1996
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 9/27/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File reply to respond to motion to dismiss with a corrected siganture page nunc pro tunc (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/18/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/15/96) for Leave to File reply to respond to motion to dismiss with a corrected siganture page nunc pro tunc . Response due: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re: (1) Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [filed by leave of the Judge - 9/9/99], provided an original is filed within 10 days of receipt of this order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/18/1996 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 9/11/96) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 9/30/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 9/12/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996, Terminated: 8/7/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service: 8/3/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to August 12, 1996]. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File defendant's motion to dismiss out of time (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996, Terminated: 7/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/11/96 ) for Leave to File defendant's motion to dismiss out of time . Response due: 7/29/96. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Randi-Sue Rimerman. Service : 7/11/96. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER outlining special procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman Service: 5/16/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041239. Answer due on 6/14/96. (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?