ARIADNE FINANCIAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00202-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARIADNE FINANCIAL SERVICES PTY. LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Richard Henry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlson, Richard Henry +1 510 835 8400
No Logo MEMVALE PTY. LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Richard Henry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlson, Richard Henry +1 510 835 8400
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Hosford +1 202 616 0332 +1 202 305 7643 elizabeth.hosford@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/16/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $39000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/8/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 24, 1998 affirmed [17-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [20-1] appeal by MEMVALE PTY. LTD., ARIADNE FINANCIAL CAFC NUMBER: 97-5050 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ARIADNE FINANCIAL, MEMVALE PTY. LTD. Copy to USA, Judge Wiese and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 043113. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [18-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [16-1] order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997, Terminated: 2/4/1997 Terminated:
          MOTION by ARIADNE FINANCIAL, MEMVALE PTY. LTD. (Service: 1/21/97) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [16-1] order . (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Terminated Case
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION granting [10-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                  SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [10-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Marie Hosford. Service: 10/15/96 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                      SEE 90-8C FOR RESPONSE by ARIADNE FINANCIAL (Service: 10/7/96) to [10-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/18/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by ARIADNE FINANCIAL, MEMVALE PTY. LTD. (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [10-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                  NOTICE of change of address by Franklin Elgin White Jr. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/10/96 ) to Stay , and for Leave to File motion to adopt special management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                      NOTICE by ARIADNE FINANCIAL, MEMVALE PTY. LTD. of related case(s). ( 90-773C, 90-772C, 90-581C, 90-830C, 90-843C, 90-878C, 90-981C, 90-1291C, 90-3982C, 91-34C, 91-993C, 91-1550C, 92-138C, 92-247C, 92-265C, 92-428C, and 92-466C). (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Franklin Elgin White Jr. Service : 5/7/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                          NOTICE by ARIADNE FINANCIAL, MEMVALE PTY. LTD. of related case. (93-52 C). (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through E), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041249. Answer due on 6/17/96. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?