FABER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00205-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY E. FABER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil B. Kabatchnick +1 202 872 1051
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/17/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/3/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint without prejudice with costs to prevailing party (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing case without prejudice on June 3, 1996 and waiving filing fee if and when case is refiled (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by LARRY E. FABER to response to [3-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Service: 5/20/96. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/16/96) to [3-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 5/30/96 (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER addressing case procedures and status (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore Service : 5/2/96 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                MOTION by LARRY E. FABER (Service : 4/29/96 ) to Stay proceedings until completion of administrative relief at the AFBCMR. Response due: 4/16/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041262. Answer due on 6/17/96. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 105 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?