MILLER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00273-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Herman Miller Herman Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Nemeroff +1 202 736 8000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Wells Newsom +1 202 624 2522 +1 202 628 5116 bnewsom@crowell.com
Office COFC
Filed 5/15/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $2700000
Nature of Suit 116 - Contract - Supply (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/18/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HERMAN MILLER and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 54 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [53-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 9/30/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 53 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998, Terminated: 9/2/1998 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/1/98) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 9/30/98. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 52 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [51-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 8/31/98. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 51 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998, Terminated: 8/3/1998 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/30/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until August 31, 1998). (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 50 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 7/31/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 49 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998, Terminated: 7/6/1998 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to July 31, 1998]. Response due: 7/17/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 48 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/30/98 ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 47 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 6/30/98]. Filed by leave of the judge. (AB) Modified on 06/03/1998
                      LREF
                      Blank 46 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Set Answer deadline to 5/29/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 45 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 29, 1998) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 5/1/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 43 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998, Terminated: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/1/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to May 1, 1998]. Response due: 4/20/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 42 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 4/1/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 41 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998, Terminated: 3/6/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to April 1, 1998]. Response due: 3/19/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 40 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 3/2/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 39 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998, Terminated: 2/5/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/27/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to March 2, 1998]. Response due: 2/13/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/2/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/31/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998, Terminated: 1/12/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/31/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until January 31, 1998.] Response due: 1/20/98 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to Deember 31, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 12/31/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: 12/11/1997, Terminated: 12/11/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/1/97 ) to Extend Time to Deember 31, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 12/15/97 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/1/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 33 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/6/1997, Terminated: 11/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/31/97) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 12/1/97. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time reset Answer deadline to 10/31/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997, Terminated: 10/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/30/97 ) to Extend Time to October 31, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 10/17/97 (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint. Should the parties desire a Status Conference or settle the case, they are directed to contact the Chief Judge's clerk. reset Answer deadline to 9/30/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997, Terminated: 9/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/29/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until September 30, 1997). (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [27-1] motion out of time to Extend Time to August 29, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 8/29/97 ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Marian Blank Horn for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997, Terminated: 8/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/97 ) out of time to Extend Time to August 29, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 8/22/97 (CDC)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to July 30, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 7/30/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997, Terminated: 7/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/97 ) to Extend Time to July 30, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 7/17/97 (CDC)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/30/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997, Terminated: 6/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/30/97) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 6/30/97. Response due: 6/16/97. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to May 30, 1997 to answer. reset Answer deadline to 5/30/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997, Terminated: 5/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/2/97 ) to Extend Time to May 30, 1997 to answer. Response due: 6/2/97 (CDC)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint reset Answer deadline to 5/2/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997, Terminated: 4/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/4/97) to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (to May 2, 1997). (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 4/4/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997, Terminated: 3/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/5/97) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to April 4, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/6/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997, Terminated: 1/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/24/97) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to March 6, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/27/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/15/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to January 25, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/25/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/19/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 10/25/96. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 9/25/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996, Terminated: 8/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/12/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to September 25, 1996). (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/14/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by HERMAN MILLER (Service: 7/10/96 ) to [6-1] motion to Extend Time within whcih to respond to the complaint. Reply due: 7/22/96. (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/12/1996, Terminated: 7/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/9/96 ) to Extend Time within whcih to respond to the complaint , (until August 14, 1996). Response due: 7/26/96 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Elizabeth Wells Newsom (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Wells Newsom. Service: 5/24/96 (FE) Modified on 05/31/1996
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                            NOTICE by HERMAN MILLER of no related cases). (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1,2, & 3), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041467. Answer due on 7/15/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?