LLOYD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00580-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo WINSTON LLOYD, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Chesney Specker ellen.c.specker@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/13/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $33000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/15/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 Published DecisionCourt Filing
PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished order entered on September 10, 1997). ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Publication of the Order of September 10, 1997. Pursuant to RCFC 52.1(b), the order of September 10, 1997, is reissued for publication this date. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997, Terminated: 9/18/1997 Terminated:
      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/97 ) for Publication of the Order of September 10, 1997. Response due: 10/6/97 (CDC)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997
          Case closed (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing complaint ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (See entry of 9/18/97, publishing this decision) (FE) Modified on 10/08/1997
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/27/1997 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/22/97 ) to [21-1] cross motion. Reply due: 9/8/97. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to August 22, 1997 to reply to plaintiff's repsonse to defendant's motion to dismiss and defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/22/97 for [18-1] motion to Dismiss Complaint. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997, Terminated: 8/11/1997 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/8/97 ) to Extend Time to August 22, 1997 to reply to plaintiff's repsonse to defendant's motion to dismiss and defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Terminated:
                    CROSS MOTION by WINSTON LLOYD ( Service: 7/8/97 ) and RESPONSE to [18-1] motion to Dismiss Complaintfiled [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 8/8/97 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Deadline updated; Response to [21-1] cross motion reset to 8/8/97 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to July 22, 1997, to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss. Response to [18-1] motion to Dismiss Complaint. reset to 7/22/97 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997, Terminated: 6/6/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by WINSTON LLOYD (Service : 5/28/97 ) to Extend Time to July 22, 1997, to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss. Response due: 6/16/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/16/97 ) to Dismiss Complaint. Response due: 6/16/97 (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time until May 16, 1997, to file JPSR. Set Motion to Dismiss Filing deadline to 5/16/97 (Signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997, Terminated: 5/13/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/7/97 ) to Extend Time until May 16, 1997, to file joint preliminary status report. Response due: 6/9/97 (CDC) Modified on 05/16/1997
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to file Joint Preliminary Status Report set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/7/97 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997, Terminated: 5/2/1997 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/7/97 ) to Extend Time to file Joint Preliminary Status Report , [until 5/7/97]. Response due: 4/24/97 (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA: amends [12-1] answer by USA. Service: 2/26/97 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Answer
                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 2/21/97. (JPSR due 4/10/97). (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint, reset Answer deadline to 2/21/97 and returning defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996, Terminated: 1/2/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/20/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to February 21, 1997]. Response due: 1/6/97 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 12/23/96 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996, Terminated: 12/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to December 23, 1996]. Response due: 12/27/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to answer complaint and reset Answer deadline to 12/12/96 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996, Terminated: 11/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/96) to Extend Time to answer complaint (to December 12, 1996). Response due: 11/29/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ellen Chesney Specker. Service: 9/30/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT, Answer due on 11/12/96. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996, Terminated: 9/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by WINSTON LLOYD to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?