MICHIGAN BANK F.S.B., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00583-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHIGAN BANK F.S.B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo Michigan National Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth MacPhee Kulak
Office COFC
Filed 9/17/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/15/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHIGAN BANK F.S.B., MICHIGAN NATIONAL and USA without prejudice. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service : 10/11/96 (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Notice of Related Cases
        NOTICE by MICHIGAN BANK F.S.B., MICHIGAN NATIONAL of related case(s). (96-494 C, 96-525 C, 90-8 C, 90-773 C, 90-772 C). (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
          Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Complaint
            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042265. Answer due on 11/18/96. (FE)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 151 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?