LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00584-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Local Oklahoma Bank, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott David Austin Scott.Austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/17/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 3/31/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-5106'[], '04-5107'[], '07-5068'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 142 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [140] Notice of Appeal filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 141 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 07-5068 for [140] Notice of Appeal filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 140 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065990. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 139 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER denying [136] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 138 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006
          REPLY to Response to Motion re [136] MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. Service: 11/22/2006.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 137 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [136] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by USA.Reply due by 11/27/2006. Service: 11/13/2006.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 136 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 12/18/2006 Motion for Attorney Fees
              MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/12/2006.Response due by 11/13/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 135 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                MANDATE of CAFC affirming [128] Unpublished Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 134 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Terminated:
                  CAFC Case Number 04-5107 for [132] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 133 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Terminated:
                    CAFC Case Number 04-5106 for [131] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 132 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004, Terminated: 8/21/2006 Notice of cross-appeal
                      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 060751. Copy to judge, opposing party and CAFC.(hw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 131 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 130 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                          Certified transcript of judgment, dated April 12, 2004, forwarded to Melvin Carl Garbow. See letter in file. (bre,)
                            LREF
                            Blank 129 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004
                            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58m that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $5,833,296.00. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 128 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Court Filing
                              UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [127] MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) filed by USA, LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A.. The Clerk is directed to vacate the March 29, 2004 Order and March 31, 2004 judgment and enter judgment in the amount of $5,833,296.00 in favor of plaintiff. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 127 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004, Terminated: 4/9/2004 Terminated:
                                JOINT MOTION to Correct Judgment and Stipulation Pursuant to Rule 59(e) by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A., USA.Service: 4/7/2004 by hand. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 126 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
                                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $5,883,296.00. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, ) Modified on 4/9/2004 (lld, ). [Vacated by April 9, 2004 Order]
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 125 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER DIRECTING JUDGMENT. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $5,883,296.00. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, ) Modified on 4/9/2004 (lld, ). [Vacated by April 9, 2004 Order]
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 124 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT and STIPULATION by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A., USA. (jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 123 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                        ORDER: Pursuant to footnotes 21 and 25 of the court's 2/26/2004 opinion, [117] Pltfs' Motion for Leave to Comment on an Unsponsored Expert Exhibit Appended to Dft's Reply Brief is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 122 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                          PUBLISHED OPINION GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART both parties' motions for summary judgment [110] CROSS MOTION to [100] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB filed by USA, [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Local is awarded $4,503,296 in damages to compensate it for the government's breach of contract in revoking the agreement to provide CAL tax benefits. Plaintiff's request to recover a tax gross-up is rejected, as is its claim for borrowing costs. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on interest offset is, for the present, denied. Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on interest offset is denied. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 3/30/2004 with a proposed schedule for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 121 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Austin for USA. Service: 2/5/2004.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 120 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by all plaintiffs. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 119 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                OPPOSITON to [117] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Comment on Unsponsored Expert Exhibit Appended to Dft's Reply Brief re: [114] Reply to Response to Dispositive Motion filed by USA. Reply due by 12/2/2003. Service: 11/19/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 18, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (hw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003, Terminated: 3/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Comment on Unsponsored Expert Exhibit Appended to [114] Dft's Reply Brief, by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. Service: 11/12/03. Response due by 12/1/2003.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/5/2003. (vp1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003
                                                        NOTICE of filing re: argument of computational error discussed at pages 13-16 of defendant's reply brief, etc. by USA. Service: 10/31/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [100] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and [110] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [100] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment:Oral Argument set for 11/5/2003 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Counsel for both parties shall appear in person. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                            REPLY BRIEF in Support of [110] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [100] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/5/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/5/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                RESPONSES to [108] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A., Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 8/22/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  REPLY Memorandum in Support of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages and RESPONSE to [110] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [100] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, Together with Separately Bound Supplemental Appendix Volume filed by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A., Filed by Leave of the Judge. (Styled as Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages) Reply due by 9/10/2003. Service: 8/22/03 by hand.(jcp, ) Modified on 8/28/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: On August 22, 2003, the court received pltf's "Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages," together with "Supplemental Appendix to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages," and "Pltf's Responses to Dft's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages." Pltf's brief should have been entitled "Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmnet on Damages and Response to Dft's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment." Pltf's brief and supporting documents are filed by my leave. The timing of a reply by dft to pltf's response to dft's cross-motion shall be controlled by the court's rules. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and OPPOSITION to [100] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes (Large) by UNITED STATES. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 7/22/03 by hand. Response due by 8/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                        RESPONSE to [101] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by UNITED STATES. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 7/22/03 by hand.(jcp, ) Modified on 7/23/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by UNITED STATES. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 7/22/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [103] Motion to modify scheduling order, granting [105] Motion to allow additional expert discovery and denying [105] Motion to Strike expert report of Mark Wood. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Cross Motions due by 7/22/2003. Plaintiff's Response/Reply due by 8/22/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                Reply memorandum by LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. re [103] MOTION modify scheduling order and for permission to use addendum to expert report, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 6/6/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [102] Motion to Substitute Party. LOCAL OKLAHOMA BANK, N.A. rep by Melvin Carl Garbow added. LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB; LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA and LOCAL AMERICA, INC. terminated Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dls, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                    MOTION to allow defendant additional expert discovery and to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, or, in the alternative, to Strike the expert report of Mark Wood. by UNITED STATES. Filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 5/30/03. Response due by 6/16/2003 Response due by 6/16/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003, Terminated: 6/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION modify scheduling order and for permission to use addendum to expert report by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 5/19/03 by hand. Filed UNDER SEAL. Response due by 6/2/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003, Terminated: 6/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Party (Local Oklahoma Bank, N.A.) by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 5/16/03 by hand. Response due by 6/2/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by all plaintiffs. Filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/19/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages (together with separate appendix - Filed UNDER SEAL) by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 5/19/03 by hand. Response due by 6/19/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 19, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Scheduling Conference held on 3/19/2003. (dmh)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on damages due by 5/19/2003. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lrd)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/18/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, LOCAL AMERICA, INC. and LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/18/03 by hand.(dw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 3/19/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/04/2003
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER dismissing defendant's counterclaims with prejudice, and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                            Stipulation of dismissal by LOCAL AMERICA BANK and USA. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing of statement of modification of damages by LOCAL AMERICA BANK. Service: 1/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 02/03/2003
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [91-1] joint motion to Amend [90-3] scheduling order (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002, Terminated: 12/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Amend [90-3] scheduling order . (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER regarding discovery in this case: (1) Damages Discovery shall be completed by deadline of 1/31/03 ; and (2) The parties shall initiate motions for summary judgment on the claims for which they are seeking damages by Motion Filing deadline of 2/28/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: Oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (filed in 96-494C) will be heard 5/15/02 at 2:00 p.m.; Defendant's response to Motion to Compel due 5/8/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION denying [75-1] cross motion and granting [73-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability Joint Status Report due 4/24/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [75-1] cross motion. Service: 1/11/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Comparison of Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact and Defendant's Statement of Genuine Issues. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LOCAL AMERICA BANK (Service by hand: 12/21/01) to [75-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/11/02. (LTD) Modified on 01/04/2002
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by LOCAL AMERICA BANK to response to [73-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service by hand: 12/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by LOCAL AMERICA BANK. Service: 12/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER transferring all aspects of this case to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [80-1] motion to Extend Time of the briefing schedule on the pending dispositive motions Response to [75-1] cross motion reset to 12/21/01 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/11/02 for [75-1] cross motion (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001, Terminated: 12/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service: 12/4/01) to Extend Time of the briefing schedule on the pending dispositive motions , (until December 21, 2001 and January 11, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' corrected appendix, consisting of six volumes, in support of motion for summary judgment filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [74-1] motion for Leave to file corrected appendix in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on liability ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, (of material fact in dispute), filed by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 11/9/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 11/9/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/9/01) and RESPONSE to [73-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, (together with separate three volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/7/01. Reply brief 30 pages. (HW) Modified on 01/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [75-1] cross motion reset to 12/7/01 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001, Terminated: 11/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service by hand: 11/9/01) for Leave to file corrected appendix in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on liability . Response due: 11/23/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION, together with six separate volumes of appendix, by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, et al. (Service by hand: 10/12/01) for Summary Judgment on liability . Response due: 11/9/01 (response brief may be 50 pages) (DS) Modified on 10/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, et al. Service by hand: 10/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery Discovery deadline is 12/31/01 , and Response to Interrogatories is due by 10/30/01 (signed by Sr. Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service: 10/3/01) to Extend Time for discovery , (until ?). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Defendant shall respond to discovery requests by 9/26/01 , Discovery deadline is 4/26/02 , and Motion for Summary Judgment on damages Filing deadline is 5/17/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Discovery deadline related to counterclaim is due on 12/14/01 , and Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Filing deadline is 10/12/01 . The brief in support of this motion and any cross-motion filed by Defendant shall be limited to 50 pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to 30 pages (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated August 23, 2001, re: Local America Bank of Tulsa, et al. v. U.S., No. 96-584C, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/24/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The attached facsimile [letter dated 8/23/01] is filed by my leave ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 08/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to Draft Propsed Order. Service: 8/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedules for further proceedings. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 8/3/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held (See 95-525C for transcript) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 10/2/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: granting the Motion for enlargement within which to respond to motion to compel by September 29, 2000 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (For Transcript SEE: 95-525 C) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 1, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 17, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK ( Service: 5/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to motion for status conference. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/1/00 (See 95-525 for cross-motion) (JT) Modified on 05/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (see: 95-525 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file privilige log by Brief deadline of 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file privilige log , (until 1/8/99). Response due: 1/11/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (See 95-525) Service: 12/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Defendant shall serve their privilege log on Plaintiffs by 12/21/98. The Government is granted leave to file a supplemental privilege log with respect to Office of Thrift Supervision documents. Defendant shall complete their document production by 12/31/98. Set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 1/19/99 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Plaintiffs to file their motion to compel ; set Additional Documents due: 2/9/99 for USA (response to motion to compel) for Plaintiff (response to dispositive motion); 2/23/99 for Plaintiff (reply brief re: motion to compel); for USA (reply brief re: dispositive motion) ; set oral argument regarding the motion to compel on 5:00 p.m., 3/3/99 ; and reset discovery deadline to 6/30/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Paul Gerald Freeborne. Service : 10/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER filing by leave and granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint interrogatories deadline to 11/6/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/30/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/02/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline [to November 6, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [44-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents and the time of discovery. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint set of requests for production deadline to 9/28/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE 95-525C for REPLY by USA to response to motion to extend time to produce documents. Service: 8/25/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE 95-525C for Joint Stipulated MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK, USA (Service : 8/25/98 ) for Protective Order (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service: 8/14/98 (by hand)) to [46-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production fo documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Reply due: 8/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/98 ) to Extend Time to complete production fo documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE 95-525C for MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents . (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents, granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink.) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE Case No. 95-525 for MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [until July 7, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See 95-525 for ORDER re: consideration of defendant's motion for partial dismissal shall be suspended pending further order from the court. The parties are directed to file all future papers using a single caption reflecting all five cases (95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See 95-525 for MEMORANDUM by LOCAL AMERICA BANK re: [37-1] joint preliminary status rpt. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK to [9-2] counter claim by USA. Service: 4/21/98 JPSR due 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE NO. 95-525C FOR JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE NO. 95-525C FOR SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 9/22/98; and directing plaintiff to file a supplement to the joint preliminary status report by 4/10/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 3/6/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE 95-525C FOR MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE NO. 95-525C FOR ORDER denying as moot [31-1] motion to Extend Time until April 27, 1998, within which to reply to the defendant's counterclaim, granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time (to February 25, 1998) to file the joint preliminary status report. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE NO. 95-525C FOR MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/98 ) to Extend Time (to February 25, 1998) to file the joint preliminary status report. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998, Terminated: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 1/23/98 ) to Extend Time until April 27, 1998, within which to reply to the defendant's counterclaim. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/13/98 , set plaintiff's Answer to counter-claims deadline to 4/22/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER reassigning case to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 12/16/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to the government's counterclaim in this action [to January 26, 1998] Response due: 1/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          10th CONSENT MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service: 11/13/97) to Extend Time to reply to the counterclaim in this action until 12/26/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 10/23/97 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to counterclaim , (until November 26, 1997). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 9/22/97 ) to Extend Time to October 27, 1997, to reply to the government's counterclaim Response due: 10/10/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 8/19/97 ) to Extend Time to September 26, 1997, to reply to counterclaim. Response due: 9/5/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to August 27, 1997, for plaintiffs to reply to the defendant's counterclaim. reset Answer to counterclaim deadline to 8/27/97 ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Horn for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997, Terminated: 8/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 7/25/97 ) to Extend Time to August 27, 1997, for plaintiffs to reply to the defendant's counterclaim. Response due: 8/11/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to July 28, 1997, to reply to counterclaim. reset Answer to counterclaim deadline to 7/28/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997, Terminated: 6/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 5/21/97 ) to Extend Time to July 28, 1997, to reply to counterclaim. Response due: 6/9/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to Reply to Counterclaim reset Answer to counterclaim deadline to 5/28/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to Reply to Counterclaim reset Answer to Counterclaim deadline to 4/28/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997, Terminated: 4/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 4/21/97) to Extend Time to Reply to Counterclaim (to May 28, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** See 96-590 C for Motion for entry of supplemental case management Order. *** (HW) Modified on 04/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 3/18/97) to Extend Time to reply to counterclaim (to April 28, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK (Service : 2/18/97) to Extend Time to reply to counterclaim (to March 28, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to counterclaim reset Answer deadline to 2/26/97 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow for Chief Judge Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997, Terminated: 1/17/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LOCAL AMERICA BANK (Service: 1/14/97) to Extend Time to reply to counterclaim [to February 26, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK Service: 1/3/97. (Answer to counterclaim due 1/27/97). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 1/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/3/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/20/1996, Terminated: 12/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 1/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service: 10/11/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 12/18/96 (signed by the Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996, Terminated: 11/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/15/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until 12/18/96). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by LOCAL AMERICA BANK, LOCAL AMERICA, INC., LOCAL FEDERAL BANK of related case(s). (96-494 C, 95-525 C, 90-8 C, 90-773 C, 90-772 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042264. Answer due on 11/18/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?