FIRST NATIONWIDE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00590-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST GIBRALTAR HOLDINGS INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
No Logo First Nationwide Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
No Logo Macandrews and Forbes Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Perelman, Ronald O.
Unknown Role, Mafco Holdings Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott David Austin Scott.Austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/20/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 4/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5128'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (250) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 229 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006
Costs Taxed in amount of $ 32,431.16 against defendant. (Signed by Clerk) (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 228 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [223] Motion for Attorney Fees Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 227 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [223] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by FIRST NATIONWIDE BANK. Service: 5/24/2006.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 226 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Reply to Objections to Bill of Costs
        REPLY to Objections to [222] Bill of Costs , filed by FIRST NATIONWIDE BANK. Service: 5/22/2006.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 225 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Objections to Bill of Costs
          Objections to [222] Bill of Costs filed by USA.Reply due by 5/22/2006. Service: 5/8/2006.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 224 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [223] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by USA.Reply due by 5/25/2006. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 5/8/2006.(dw1) Modified on 5/26/2006 to correct reply due date. (dls ).
              LREF
              Blank 223 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006, Terminated: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
              MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by FIRST NATIONWIDE BANK. Service: 4/10/2006. Response due by 5/8/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/25/2006 to correct response date (mb2, ).
                LREF
                Blank 222 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Bill of Costs
                BILL OF COSTS with separate appendix, filed by FIRST NATIONWIDE BANK. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/8/2006. Service: 4/10/2006 by hand.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/25/2006 to correct response date(mb2, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank 221 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                  MANDATE of CAFC affirming [216] Published Order/Opinion. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 220 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Terminated:
                    CAFC Case Number 03-5128 for [219] Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 219 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [217] Judgment by UNITED STATES. Copies to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 218 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003
                        Certified transcript judgment, dated May 1, 2003, forwarded to Harry Max Reasoner. See letter in file. (bre, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 217 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $70,018,647.00. Costs to plaintiffs. (lld, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 216 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Court Filing
                            PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION concluding plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on damages is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to strike is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for plaintiffs in the amount of $70,018,647. Costs to plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 215 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                              Post-trial brief by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 2/11/03. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 214 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                Supplemantal Brief concerning attribute reduction by USA. Service: 1/31/03. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 213 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Transcript
                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 21, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 212 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of filing of appendix to motion for summary judgment awarding restitution for the Government's Guarini Breach by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 1/7/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 211 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [210-1] motion for Leave to File Third Supplemental Declaration of Richard P. Hodge (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                        The court's order of 12/19/03 is vacated and the following is ORDERED: Oral Argument re: [201-1] motion to Strike portions of expert reports by MACANDREWS & FORBES set at 10:00 a.m., 1/21/03, [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FIRST NATIONWIDE set at 10:00 a.m., 1/21/03 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 210 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003, Terminated: 1/7/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 12/31/02 (by hand)) for Leave to File Third Supplemental Declaration of Richard P. Hodge. Response due: 1/14/03 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Oral Argument re: [201-1] motion to Strike portions of expert reports by MACANDREWS & FORBES set at 10:00 a.m., 1/23/03, [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FIRST NATIONWIDE set at 10:00 a.m., 1/23/03, national Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC, 20005. Counsel for all parties shall appear in person. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 209 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002 Memorandum
                                              SUR_REPLY by USA re: [150-1] cross motion by USA. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 10/24/02. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 208 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [205-1] motion for Leave to File sur-reply in support of Defendant's supplemental opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge John P. Wiese Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service: 11/12/02) to [205-1] motion for Leave to File sur-reply in support of Defendant's supplemental opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE to response to [201-1] motion to Strike portions of expert reports. Service: 11/7/02. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 205 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 11/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) for Leave to File sur-reply in support of Defendant's supplemental opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/24/02 ) to [201-1] motion to Strike portions of expert reports. Reply due: 11/7/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 10/29/2002
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/24/02 ) to Reply due: 11/19/96 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                            Response by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES to [183-1] proposed findings by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/7/02 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 10/7/02) to Strike portions of expert reports . Response due: 10/24/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY, with one volume of Appendix, by FIRST NATIONWIDE to response to [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 10/7/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [198-1] motion to Extend Time to file supplemental reply brief in support of motion for summary judgment Brief deadline to 10/7/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002, Terminated: 10/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 9/26/02 ) to Extend Time to file supplemental reply brief in support of motion for summary judgment [until October 7, 2002]. Response due: 10/15/02 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [196-1] motion for Leave to add revisions to expert report of William F. Wolf to defendant's supplemental appendix (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/20/2002 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/17/02) for Leave to add revisions to expert report of William F. Wolf to defendant's supplemental appendix . [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 9/13/02) to Extend Time to file supplemental reply brief in support of their motion for summary judgment, etc. , (until ?) and For leave to exceed the page limitation . (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Memorandum
                                                                            FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION by USA. Service: 8/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [192-1] motion for Leave to file first supplement to supplemental response to Motion for Summary Judgment for restitution (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002, Terminated: 8/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/9/02) for Leave to file first supplement to supplemental response to Motion for Summary Judgment for restitution . Response due: 8/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Transcript
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's supplemental response to the motion for summary judgment due 9/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying Defendant's request for discovery and supplemental report of defendant's expert shall be delivered to plaintiff on or before 5:00 p.m. on 8/9/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Response
                                                                                        REPLY by USA to [187-1] response by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 7/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Response
                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE pursuant to [185-2] order. Service: 7/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER set deadline of 7/15/02 for Defendant to file its reply to Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's request for Rule 56(f) discovery. Set telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 7/18/02. ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER set deadline of 7/8/02 for Plaintiff to file a written reply solely to defendant's 56(f) motion. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                DECLARATION OF COUNSEL by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 6/19/02 (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 6/19/02 (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES filed by USA. Service: 6/19/02 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE, together with one envelope containing pages 2219-2247 of the appendix, by USA (Service: 6/19/02) to [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 7/10/02 (per court order) [Pages 2219-2247 of appendix FILED UNDER SEAL.] (DS)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [179-1] motion to Extend Time to file expert report and supplemental response to Plaintiffs' restitution calculation Governments' Supplemental response to motion for summary judgment and expert report due 6/19/02 and Plaintiff's reply to the Government's response to the restitution calculation due 7/10/02 for MACANDREWS & FORBES (signed by Sr. Judge G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 6/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/10/02) to Extend Time to file expert report and supplemental response to Plaintiffs' restitution calculation until 6/19/02. Response due: 6/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [176-2] order. Service: 5/20/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES re: motion for summary judgment awarding restitution for the government's Guarini Breach. Service: 5/6/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [175-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental appendix in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgmnet, etc. Defendant's supplemental material in response to appendix due by 5/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service by hand: 5/3/02) for Leave to file supplemental appendix in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgmnet, etc. . Response due: 5/17/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER adopting the schedule set out in the parties' report proposing a schedule for resolving the matter of calculating the amount of restitution as a remedy in this action. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [172-1] motion for Reconsideration of [168-1] order (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/22/02) for Reconsideration of [168-1] order . Response due: 4/8/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 3/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA dated 3/6/02 to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Filed by leave of the Judge nunc pro tunc to 3/7/02. (LTD) Modified on 03/13/2002
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 28, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED DECISION denying as moot [158-1] motion to Strike two newspaper articles Defendant added to its Appendix and attached to its Cross-Motion, denying [150-1] cross motion, granting [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment, and Joint Status Report due 3/26/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/25/2002
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002
                                                                                                                                  Letter dated March 4, 2002 by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 3/5/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [150-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 4/1/02 ), [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FIRST NATIONWIDE ( Transcript due 4/1/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: Testimony of Mr. Hodge at oral argument 2/28/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES to [164-1] remark, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Opposition to live testimony of Plaintiffs' Declarant, Richard Hodge, at Oral Argument on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' restitution claim, by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing plaintifffs to make Richard P. Hoge available for examination at oral argument on 2/28/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 02/11/2002
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE to response to [158-1] motion to Strike two newspaper articles Defendant added to its Appendix and attached to its Cross-Motion. Service: 1/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [150-1] cross motion. Service: 1/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 2/28/02 for [150-1] cross motion and [146-1] motion for Judgment (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/7/02 ) to [158-1] motion to Strike two newspaper articles Defendant added to its Appendix and attached to its Cross-Motion. Reply due: 1/22/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service: 12/21/01) to Strike two newspaper articles Defendant added to its Appendix and attached to its Cross-Motion . Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD) Modified on 03/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 12/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service: 12/21/01) to [150-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/14/02 (per court order) (LTD) Modified on 01/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE to response to [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 12/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER transferring all aspects of this case to Judge Eric G. BRuggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [154-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to cross motion for summary judgment Response to [150-1] cross motion reset to 12/21/01 . Defendant's reply by 1/14/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 11/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 11/28/01) to Extend Time within which to respond to cross motion for summary judgment , (until December 21, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION OF COUNSEL (Scott D. Austin) (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/8/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/8/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          (SECOND CORRECTED) CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/01) and RESPONSE to [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment for restitution or, in the alternative, request for Rule 56(g) Discovery by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/17/01. (LTD) Modified on 03/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [148-1] motion for Leave to file second corrected version of defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs' restitution claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment for restitution or, in the alternative, request for Rule 56(g) Discovery (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [150-1] cross motion reset to 12/17/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001, Terminated: 11/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 11/13/01) for Leave to file second corrected version of defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs' restitution claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment for restitution or, in the alternative, request for Rule 56(g) Discovery . Response due: 11/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Response to [146-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 11/8/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2002 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, with one volume of appendix, by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service: 9/21/01) for Summary Judgment . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/22/01. (LTD) Modified on 03/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST NATIONWIDE Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [143-1] motion to Extend Time to file the Motion for Summary Judgment Motion Filing deadline to 9/21/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service: 9/17/01) to Extend Time to file the Motion for Summary Judgment until 9/21/01. Response due: 10/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Motion for Summary Judgment is due on 9/17/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (37 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 10, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Filing deadline to 9/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 4:00 p.m. 8/10/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [127-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [125-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on liability, Joint proposed schedule for resolving remaining issues is due on 8/3/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [127-1] cross motion by USA, [125-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on liability by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE (See No. 96-494C for transcript) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [133-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on liability (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/8/01) to [133-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on liability, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE NO. 96-494C FOR ORDER scheduling oral argument for 10:00 a.m. on 6/29/01 for [127-1] cross motion, and [125-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on liability . ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001, Terminated: 6/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 5/23/01) for Leave to file supplemental reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on liability . Response due: 6/11/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [127-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 5/3/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service by hand: 5/3/01) to [127-1] cross motion Reply due: 5/15/01. (HW) Modified on 05/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW BY USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001, Terminated: 7/6/2001 Cross MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 4/2/01) and RESPONSE to [125-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on liability by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [127-1] cross motion set to 5/1/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of typographical error in Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by FIRST NATIONWIDE and MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 3/7/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 3/2/01) for Partial Summary Judgment on liability , (filed with Supplemental Appendix Volume 5). Response due: 4/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 3/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Plaintiffs shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment on or before 3/2/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 9, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/12/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 2/9/01, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting a Status conference at 10:00 a.m. on 2/9/01. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. Service by hand: 1/8/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 28, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA : amends [8-1] answer by USA. Service: 8/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [110-1] memorandum by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [82-1] motion for Leave to File first amended answer, denying [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract, granting in part, denying in part [62-1] cross motion, granting [113-1] motion for Leave to File reply to Plaintiffs' supplemental brief. Set joint Status Report deadline to 1/8/01. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 11/16/00 (by hand)) to [113-1] motion for Leave to File reply to Plaintiffs' supplemental brief. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/9/00 ) for Leave to File reply to Plaintiffs' supplemental brief. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting the request to correct the transcript of oral argument. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Request to Correct Transcript by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER correcting order of September 29, 2000, in that defendant is to file its supplemental brief, not exceeding 20 pages by 10/17/00 , and plaintiffs are to file their supplemental brief, not exceeding 15 pages, by 10/31/00 , with defendant not allowed to file a reply without leave of the court. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 28, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set deadline of 10/12/00 for Defendant to file a brief re: issues associated with the memo composed by the Deptartment of Justice re: the FSLIC Resolution Fund and response to Plaintiffs' motion to strike (limited to 20 pages) and set deadline of 10/19/00 for Plaintiff's response. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/04/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 29, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [62-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 10/30/00 ), [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE ( Transcript due 10/30/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Ronald A. Pearlman' Motion for enlargement to respond to Motion to compel is Granted ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 9/22/00 ) to Strike [99-1] motion to take deposition of Lars Viitala. [3 of 3 items filed in one document.] (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES, filed together with separate one volume appendix. Service: 9/22/00. [2 of 3 items in one document.] (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES Pursuant to [78-4] order, filed together with a separate one volume appendix. Service: 9/22/00. [1 of 3 items in one document.] (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 1, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [82-1] motion for Leave to File first amended answer. Service: 9/14/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [99-1] motion to take deposition of Lars Viitala. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000, Terminated: 9/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service by hand: 9/13/00) to take deposition of Lars Viitala . Response due: 9/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [CORRECTED] REVISED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 9/12/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [96-1] motion for Leave to file corrected version of revised statement of genuine issues (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000, Terminated: 9/13/2000 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 9/12/00) for Leave to file corrected version of revised statement of genuine issues , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/26/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REVISED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [86-1] proposed findings by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] cross motion. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix [Volumes 4-6]) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of confidential tax returns and return information. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 9/28/00 for [62-1] cross motion and set for 10:00 a.m. 9/28/00 for [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract , in the National Court Building, 717 Madison Ppl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 9/5/00 (by hand)) to [82-1] motion for Leave to File first amended answer. Reply due: 9/14/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES re: [75-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of confidential tax returns and return information. by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 9/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 10/2/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 2:30 p.m. on 9/1/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/28/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/18/00 (JT) Modified on 08/29/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference set at 11:00 a.m. on 8/29/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 8/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Service: 8/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 8/18/00 ) to [62-1] cross motion. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Reply due: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/00 ) for Leave to File first amended answer. Response due: 9/5/00 (JT) Modified on 08/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [80-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Christine O.C. Miller for Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000, Terminated: 8/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 8/7/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES to response to [75-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of confidential tax returns and return information. Service: 8/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [76-1] joint motion to Extend Time of the briefing schedule. Plaintiff's Response to [62-1] cross motion reset to 8/18/00 ; Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/8/00 for [62-1] cross motion ; and reset Plaintiff's sur-reply deadline to 9/22/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/31/00) to [75-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of confidential tax returns and return information, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/9/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000, Terminated: 8/4/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES and USA to Extend Time of the briefing schedule , (until ?). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000, Terminated: 9/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 7/21/00 (by hand)) for Protective Order concerning discovery of confidential tax returns and return information. Response due: 8/4/00 (JT) Modified on 07/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: hearing on defendant's motion to compel (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on July 6, 2000. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Extend Time of the discovery period and briefing schedule. Reset Discovery deadline to 7/14/00 ; Plaintiff's Response to [62-1] cross motion reset to 8/4/00; Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/25/00 for [62-1] cross motion ; and reset Plaintiff's sur-reply deadline to 9/8/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/7/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing on defendant's motion to compel set at 11:00 a.m. on 7/6/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES, USA to Extend Time of the discovery period and briefing schedule [two weeks]. (JT) Modified on 07/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part [69-1] motion for Protective Order. Set Defendant's motion to compel filing deadline to 6/9/00 ; set Plaintiff's response due 6/16/00; set Defendant's reply due 6/23/00 ; and set oral argument for 2:00 p.m., 6/26/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 5/31/00 ) to [69-1] motion for Protective Order, [69-2] motion for Expedited Consideration. Reply due: 6/9/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 6/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 5/30/00 (by hand)) for Protective Order and for Expedited Consideration. Response due: 6/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 2, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set discovery deadline to 6/30/00 ; Plainiff's response to [62-1] cross motion reset to 7/21/00 ; Defendant's reply to response motion reset to 8/11/00 for [62-1] cross motion ; and set Plaintiff's sur-reply deadline to 8/25/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/1/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 10:15 a.m. on 5/2/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES to response to [64-1] motion for a status conference, [64-2] motion to Extend Time. Service: 4/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/20/00) to [64-1] motion for a status conference and [64-2] motion to Extend Time. Reply due: 5/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service by hand: 4/14/00) for a status conference or, in the alternative, to Extend Time . Response due: 4/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [DECLARATION] AFFIDAVIT by USA Re: [62-1] cross motion by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service 3/15/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 3/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract by MACANDREWS & FORBES, FIRST GIBRALTAR, FIRST NATIONWIDE, (filed together with separate three volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/22/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/15/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 3/15/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [58-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [62-1] cross motion reset to 3/22/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing by leave and granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Defendant's response [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract reset to 3/15/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000, Terminated: 2/29/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/24/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment [until March 15, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/13/00 (JT) Modified on 03/02/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [50-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF RICHARD P. HODGE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES, by leave of the Judge. Service 2/2/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION OF JOHN M. FAUST by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES, by leave of the Judge. Service 2/2/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 1/19/00) for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract , filed with a (2) two volume appendix. Response due: 2/22/00. [filed by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 1/19/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES to response to motion to extend discovery. Service: 10/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (see: 95-525 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by FIRST NATIONWIDE re: [45-1] (corrected) motion reply by FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 6/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of Donald C. Lubick by USA Re: [44-1] motion response by USA. Service 6/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FIRST NATIONWIDE to response to [40-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Service: 6/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [CORRECTED] RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/20/99 ) to [40-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Reply due: 6/4/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES re: Rule 56(g) response of Plaintiffs in the First Heights case. Service: 5/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/14/99 ) to [40-1] motion to compel discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Defendant's response to [40-1] motion to compel discovery reset to 5/14/99 , Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 6/4/99 for [40-1] motion to compel discovery. Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 6/29/99 for [40-1] motion to compel discovery. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR and MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 4/5/99) to Compel Discovery , by leave of Judge. Response due: 4/19/99. (FE) Modified on 04/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott David Austin. Service : 1/26/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log by Brief deadline of 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log , (until 1/8/99). Response due: 1/11/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES. Filed by leave of the Judge. (See 95-525) Service: 12/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Defendant shall serve their privilege log on Plaintiffs by 12/21/98. The Government is granted leave to file a supplemental privilege log with respect to Office of Thrift Supervision documents. Defendant shall complete their document production by 12/31/98. Set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 1/19/99 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Plaintiffs to file their motion to compel ; set Additional Documents due: 2/9/99 for USA (response to motion to compel) for Plaintiff (response to dispositive motion); 2/23/99 for Plaintiff (reply brief re: motion to compel) for USA (reply brief re: dispositive motion) ; set oral argument regarding the motion to compel on 5:00 p.m., 3/3/99 ; and reset discovery deadline to 6/30/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER filing by leave and granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint interrogatories deadline to 11/6/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/30/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline [to November 6, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents and the time of discovery. Set Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint set of requests for production deadline to 9/28/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE 95-525C for REPLY by USA to response to motion to extend time to produce documents. Service: 8/25/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE 95-525C for Joint Stipulated MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES and USA (Service : 8/25/98 ) for Protective Order (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service: 8/14/98 (by hand)) to [29-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents to [September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Reply due: 8/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/98 ) to Extend Time to complete production of documents to [September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time for service of Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production of documents . Interrogatories deadline to 7/10/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998, Terminated: 7/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 7/6/98 (by hand)) to Extend Time for service of Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production of documents [to July 10, 1998]. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT) Modified on 07/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE 95-525C for MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents . (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents, granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE CASE No. 95-525 for MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [until July 7, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            See 95-525 for ORDER re: consideration of defendant's motion for partial dismissal shall be suspended pending further order form the court. The parties are directed to file all future papers using a single caption reflecting all five cases (95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See 95-525 for MEMORANDUM by FIRST NATIONWIDE re: [19-1] joint preliminary status rpt. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE NO. 95-525C FOR JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE NO. 95-525C FOR SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 9/22/98; and directing plaintiff to file a supplement to the joint preliminary status report by 4/10/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 3/6/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE 95-525C FOR MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE NO. 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/25/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 95-525C FOR MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. (to February 25, 1998) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/13/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER reassigning case to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from Winstar related list by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES (Service : 3/26/97 ) for entry of supplemental case management order to govern management of certain pending Winstar-Related cases . Response due: 4/14/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/19/96. (JPSR due 2/5/97) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint . Answer deadline reset to 12/19/96 (signed by DAVID A LAMPEN, Clerk of the Court) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996, Terminated: 11/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/15/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until 12/19/96). Response due: 12/2/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service : 10/9/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by FIRST NATIONWIDE, FIRST GIBRALTAR, MACANDREWS & FORBES of related case. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042287. Answer due on 11/19/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?