KRUG v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00621-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo GREGORY C. KRUG, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/2/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $200000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/5/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 82 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated April 12, 1999 affirmed [74-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 81 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 RemarkCourt Filing
    Letter dated September 10, 1998, from Gregory C. Krug to the Clerk (Court of Appeals and Court of Federal Claims) and Curtis C. Pett informing them of counsel's new address and telephone numbers. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 09/18/1998
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [79-1] appeal by GREGORY C. KRUG. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5130. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 79 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998, Terminated: 4/12/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by GREGORY C. KRUG. Copy to Defendant, Judge Hodges and CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 045667. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 80 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re: final judgment has been issued in this case (opinion and order dated 4/30/98). Plaintiff's motion to supplement the record therefore is out of time. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 78 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished order entered on 4/30/98). ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 76 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Publication and denying motion for reconsideration if motion is considered as such. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 75 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998, Terminated: 5/8/1998 Terminated:
                MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 5/7/98 ) for Publication (titled as a motion for reconsideration). Response due: 5/26/98 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 74 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
                  JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 granting defendant's as the I.R.C. section 7623 and Publication 733 provide the Secretary with discretionary authority to deny a claim for reward. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
                    Case closed (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 73 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment. No Costs. (See entry of 5/27/98, publishing this decision) ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/01/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank 72 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                        RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service: 12/29/97 ) to [71-1] motion For reconsideration of [70-1] order under Rule 83.2. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/15/98 (JT) Modified on 01/15/1998
                          LREF
                          Blank 71 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 1/6/1998 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/97 ) For reconsideration of [70-1] order under Rule 83.2 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 70 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER directing parties to advise the court of availability for a hearing. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 69 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by GREGORY C. KRUG to response to [65-1] cross motion . Service: 10/24/97 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 68 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 10/9/97 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 67 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/9/97 ) to [65-1] cross motion Reply due: 10/27/97 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER directing counsel to call chambers by 9/29/97 to advise re: status of pending factual stipulations. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 65 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Terminated:
                                      CROSS MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG ( Service: 9/9/97 ) to [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment with request for oral argument and separately bound exhibits. Response due: 10/10/97 (CDC) Modified on 09/12/1997
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GREGORY C. KRUG Service: 9/9/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 63 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by GREGORY C. KRUG Service: 9/9/97 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 62 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service: 9/9/97 ) to [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment and brief in support thereof Reply due: 9/26/97 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 61 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 8/20/97 ) to modify the Court's Order of August 8, 1997, by granting an additional thirty days to October 11, 1997, for plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment and for plaintiff to file his cross-motion for summary judgment. Response due: 9/8/97 (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 60 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER re: recollection of defendant's stipulation on July 30 and hope that this matter will be resolved soon, without further discovery. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 8/8/97 ) to Compel defendant to respond to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents and things. Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/12/97 ) for Leave to File notice of recent decision Response due: 8/29/97 (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 8/6/97 ) to Extend Time to September 22, 1997, to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 8/6/97 ) to Extend Time to September 22, 1997, to file an opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Stipulation
                                                          Stipulation by USA of facts (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER directing parties to file a stipulation within the next week , and plaintiff to file his Response to [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment 31 days after the filing of the stipulation. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 7/29/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 7/25/97 ) to Compel defendant to respond to (1) plaintiff's third set of interrogatories, and (2) plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents and things Response due: 8/11/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997 Remark
                                                                Plaintiff's supplement to motion to compel response to second set of interrogatories filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 7/22/97 (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                  MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 7/21/97 ) to Compel response to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/7/97 (CDC)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/25/97 ) for Summary Judgment and brief in support thereof Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA Service: 7/25/97 (CDC)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/24/97 ) to Quash , and for Protective Order Response due: 8/11/97 (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          REPLY by GREGORY C. KRUG to response to [43-1] motion to Compel defendant to supplement its response to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories . Service: 7/16/97 (CDC)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            REPLY by GREGORY C. KRUG to response to [42-1] motion For reconsideration of [41-1] order under Rule 83.2, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/27/97 (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/11/97 ) to [43-1] motion to Compel defendant to supplement its response to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories. Reply due: 7/25/97 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/24/97 ) to [42-1] motion For reconsideration of [41-1] order under Rule 83.2 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 6/24/97 ) to Compel defendant to supplement its response to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories . Response due: 7/11/97 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service: 6/18/97) For reconsideration of [41-1] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re: defendant reminded that decision concerning scope of discovery, relevance, and the effect of subset 6103 are not made unilaterally by the parties ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/10/97 ) to [39-1] motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with the Court's Order of June 2, 1997. Filed by leave of the judge. Reply due: 6/19/97 (CDC) Modified on 06/19/1997
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 6/5/97 ) to Compel Defendant to Comply with the Court's Order of June 2, 1997. Response due: 6/23/97 (CDC)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 5/28/97 ( JPSR due 7/15/97 ) (CDC)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to File answer out of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service: 6/2/97 ) to [30-1] motion for Leave to File answer out of time. (CDC)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying [32-1] motion for Stay ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG to [29-1] order. Service: 5/27/97 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to order of May 27, 1997, and submission of documents for IN CAMERA review. Service: 5/28/97 (DS)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997, Terminated: 6/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/28/97 ) for Leave to File answer out of time Response due: 6/16/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997, Terminated: 6/2/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/23/97 ) for Stay of May 20, 1997 Order. Response due: 6/9/97. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            REPLY by GREGORY C. KRUG to response to [21-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents. Service: 5/21/97 (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents. Defendant is directed to respond to discovery requests immediately ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/15/97 ) to [21-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents. Reply due: 5/29/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/29/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of letter dated May 6, 1997, from GREGORY C. KRUG. Copy to Defendant. Service: 5/6/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re: further proceedings ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG to [20-1] report by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/5/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant shall show cause why motion to compel should not be granted by Notice of Compliance deadline of 5/16/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                          Additional Documentation Plaintiff's letter together with 3 exhibits by GREGORY C. KRUG. Service: 4/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER the Clerk will file plaintiff's letter dated 4/25/97 and the three exhibits attached ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997, Terminated: 5/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service : 4/29/97 ) to Compel Production of Documents. Response due: 5/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/28/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and granting motion to amend ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing response to defendant's response to first amended complaint, etc. by GREGORY C. KRUG [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 4/16/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by USA. Service: 4/7/97 ( JPSR due 5/27/97 ) (FE) Modified on 04/17/1997
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by GREGORY C. KRUG (Answer due 4/14/9) amending [1-1] complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/21/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 3/18/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for Reconsideration until 3/28/97. Response due: 4/4/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/97 ) For reconsideration of [13-1] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER addressing case status (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Oral Argument - Motion to Dismiss, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 6, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA ( Transcript due 3/10/97 ). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 2/6/97 for [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG to [9-1] motion reply by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/20/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 1/9/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/23/96) to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Oral Argument Requested. Reply due: 1/9/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996, Terminated: 4/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/25/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 12/26/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by GREGORY C. KRUG (Service: 10/28/96) to [4-1] motion to Quash subpoenas and [4-2] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 11/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/96 ) to Quash subpoenas , and for Protective Order . Response due: 11/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by G. Robson Stewart Service: 10/11/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through L), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042347. Answer due on 12/2/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?