PI ELECTRONICS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00664-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pi Electronics Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lonnie Lloyd Simpson +1 813 229 2111 +2291 229 229 1447
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/21/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $150000000
Nature of Suit 118 - Contract - Other (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County
Terminated 6/22/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (338) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 315 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by PI ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. Service: 6/18/2004.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 314 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held on Tuesday, 5/4/2004 05:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller, if settlement has not been finalized. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 313 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 312 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/12/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 311 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
            LREF
            Blank 310 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/2/04.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 309 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/15/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 308 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Dft shall file a subsequent Status Report on behalf of the parties by 1/15/2004. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 307 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/15/03.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 306 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/17/03.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 305 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Paragraph 9 of the order entered on March 6, 2003, is vacated. Dft shall file a subsequent Status Report on behalf of both parties by 11/17/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 304 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/31/03.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 303 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by PI ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, USA. Service: 10/15/03.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 302 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/30/03.(dw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 301 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [300] Dft's Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Pretrial Proceedings. Paragraphs 6-8 of the order entered on 3/6/03, and paragraphs 2-3 of the order entered on 8/15/03, are stayed pending approval by the authorized representative of the DOJ of the settlement agreed on in principle by pltf and defense counsel's line atty. Dft shall file a Joint Status Report on behalf of the parties by 9/30/03, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that date. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2003. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 300 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003, Terminated: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Stay of Pre-Trial Deadlines by USA.Service: 9/15/03. Response due by 10/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 299 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [298] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Entered on August 15, 2003. Paragraph 1 of the order on August 15, 2003, is modified insofar as by 9/15/2003, the parties shall disclose and idenfity experts to be called in each party's case-in-chief and exchange expert reports. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/11/2003 (jcp, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 298 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                      THIRD UNOPPOSED MOTION to Modify the Deadline for the Parties' Disclosure of Experts and Their Reports Established in the [296] Court's Order Dated August 13, 2003 by USA.Service: 9/5/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 297 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        [CORRECTED COPY] ORDER: re: [296] Order of August 15, 2003. Granting [295] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed on April 2, 2003. 1) Paragraph 1 of the order is modified insofar as by 9/5/03, the parties shall disclose and identify experts to be called in each party's case-in-chief and exchange expert reports. 2) Paragraph 2 of the order is modified insofar as by 9/26/03, the parties shall disclose the identity of experts on rebuttaland exchange rebuttal reports of experts. 3) Paragraph 4 of the order is modified insofar as the Discovery deadline is extended to 10/10/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 296 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003, Terminated: 8/15/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [295] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed on April 2, 2003. 1) Paragraph 1 of the order is modified insofar as by 9/5/03, the parties shall disclose and identify experts to be called in each party's case-in-chief and exchange expert reports. 2) Paragraph 2 of the order is modified insofar as by 9/26/03, the parties shall disclose the identity of experts on rebuttal and exchange rebuttal reports of experts. 3) Paragraph 4 of the order is modified insofar as the Discovery deadline is extended to 10/10/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 295 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003, Terminated: 8/15/2003 Terminated:
                                            SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, until 10/10/03, and MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/5/03 to file Expert Disclosures and until 9/26/03 to file Rebuttal Expert Disclosures by USA.Service: 8/13/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 294 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to ADR Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003
                                                Judge Lawrence J. Block added. Judge Wilkes C. Robinson no longer assigned to case. (dls, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 292 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion filed on April 22, 2003, to modify the scheduling order filed on March 6, 2003, is granted. Discovery due by 9/30/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 293 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to modfy scheduling order : complete discovery by 9/30/03 by The United States.Service: 4/22/03. (hw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 291 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for The United States. Service: 4/22/03.(hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 290 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/6/03 ; Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m., 11/5/03 ; Plaintiff's Appendix A deadline on 10/20/03, Defendant's Appendix A deadline on 11/3/03. Trial deadline set on 10:00 a.m., 11/12/03 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 289 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          JOINT MOTION for entry of a modified scheduling order . Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 288 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                            PUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 287 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Parties revised scheduling order due 2/28/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 286 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [284-1] motion to Extend Time only insofar as the obligation to respond to any discovery request issued since January 6, 2003, is stayed pending a ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss. After the opinion issues, the court will enter a rescheduling order. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 285 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Defendant's argument that Plaintiff has not allegfed sufficient authorization for the USPS action that resulted in the taking of Plaintiff's property by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 1/31/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 284 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003, Terminated: 2/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/03) to Extend Time to complete discovery . Response due: 2/18/03. (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 283 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of supplemental authority by USA. Service: 1/23/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 282 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's sur-reply due 1/31/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 281 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER re: Discovery deadline to 3/31/03 , Defendant's (contentions of fact and law) Appendix A deadline on 4/4/03; Plaintiff's (contentions of fact and law) Appendix A deadline on 4/4/03 , and Pretrial Conference for 2:00 4/8/03 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 280 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [275-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 12/23/02 (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 279 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response
                                                                              Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by PI ELECTRONICS, and USA pursuant to [263-3] order. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 278 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 12/13/02) to [275-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 12/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: the amount of defendant's judgment on its counterclaim for unpaid royalties is reserved for the damages trial. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/04/2002
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 276 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying [273-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60(b) (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 275 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/18/02 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 11/13/02) to [273-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60(b). (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 273 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/02) for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60(b) . (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 272 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by PI ELECTRONICS (Answer due 11/18/02) amending [267-1] amended complaint by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 11/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 269 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Washington, D.C. volume, at October 30, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 271 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [270-1] motion for More Definite Statement in that plaintiff is to file an amended complaint by 11/8/02 ; directing defendant to file its answer by 11/18/02 , with service of the amended complaint and answer to be by overnight mail; defendant to file any authorities by 11/12/02 and plaintiff to respond by 11/20/02 ; defendant to produce documents, etc. by 11/29/02 ; parties to file a stipulation re: amount due on defendant's counterclaim by 11/29/02 ; and parties to file a discovery plan by 12/16/02 . ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 270 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/28/02) for More Definite Statement . Response due: 11/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                    (CORRECTED) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by PI ELECTRONICS amending [264-1] amended complaint by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 10/18/02. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 266 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [265-1] motion for Leave to File corrected version of second amended complaint (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 265 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002, Terminated: 10/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/18/02 (by hand)) for Leave to File corrected version of second amended complaint. Response due: 11/1/02 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 264 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by PI ELECTRONICS (Answer due 10/30/02 amending [1-1] complaint. Service by hand: 10/15/02 (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patricia Mary McCarthy Service :10/10/02 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 263 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [260-1] motion to enlarge deadlines in the 9/10/02 order Discovery Plan due: 12/20/96 and Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. 10/30/02 , in the National Courts Building (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 9/24/02) to [260-1] motion to enlarge deadlines in the 9/10/02 order. Reply due: 10/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ERRATUM of opinion filed 9/10/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 260 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/16/02) to enlarge deadlines in the 9/10/02 order . Response due: 10/3/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION, Parties stipulation and amended complaint due 10/15/02 , Defendant's answer due 10/30/02 , Discovery deadline is 3/30/03 , and Trial set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/14/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 258 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 16, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 257 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: An opinion will issue by 9/16/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 256 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting to the extent that it prescinds any action that the court might have taken to reschedule the status conference to an earlier date [255-1] motion to Continue status conference. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 255 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002, Terminated: 6/24/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 6/21/02) to Continue status conference . Response due: 7/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 254 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 7/16/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 253 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 252 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 6/14/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 251 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER returning Lanson & Looney's response unfiled (signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 250 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [239-1] motion to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER, denying [238-1] motion to Intervene by JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, P.C., denying [237-1] motion to Intervene by LAMSON & LOONEY (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 249 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/1/02) to [239-1] motion to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER, [238-1] motion to Intervene by JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, P.C., [237-1] motion to Intervene by LAMSON & LOONEY. Reply due: 5/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 248 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 4/22/02 ) to [239-1] motion to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER. Reply due: 5/9/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 247 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting ADR Hearing for 11:00 a.m. on 5/14/02 and 10:00 a.m. on 5/15/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Senior Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 246 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Defendant's combined Response to [239-1] motion to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER, [238-1] motion to Intervene by JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, P.C. and [237-1] motion to Intervene by LAMSON & LOONEY due 5/2/02 , Intervenors and Plaintiff's replies due 5/15/02 (by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 245 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LAMSON & LOONEY to [240-1] motion response by PI ELECTRONICS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/12/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 244 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [243-1] motion to Extend Time within which to complete the Alternative Dispute Resolution procedures by 6/14/02 and Joint Status Report deadline to 6/14/02 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 243 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002, Terminated: 4/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS, USA (Service : 4/12/02 ) to Extend Time within which to complete the Alternative Dispute Resolution procedures , (until June 14, 2002). (Second of two events in one document). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 243 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002, Terminated: 4/15/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by PI ELECTRONICS, and USA. Service: 4/12/02. (First of two events in one document). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 242 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [241-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to Gary M. Riebschlager's motion to intervene Response to [239-1] motion to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER reset to 4/22/02 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 241 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002, Terminated: 4/11/2002 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 4/10/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to Gary M. Riebschlager's motion to intervene , (until April 20, 2002). Response due: 4/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 240 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 3/28/02) to [238-1] motion to Intervene by JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, P.C., [237-1] motion to Intervene by LAMSON & LOONEY. Reply due: 4/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 239 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002, Terminated: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION (Service: 3/21/02) to Intervene by GARY M. RIEBSCHLAGER filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 4/8/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION (Service: 3/13/02) to Intervene by JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, JAMES WESLEY CHRISTIAN, P.C. . Response due: 4/1/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 237 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION (Service: 3/11/02) to Intervene by LAMSON & LOONEY . Response due: 3/28/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 236 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        ADR hearing held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          ADR hearing set at 10:00 a.m. on 1/22/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Status Conference held. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 1/8/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith for ADR Senior Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 01/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing (Original Signature) by USA. Service: 12/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing theparties to file a Joint Status Report by deadline of 2/8/02 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION to Extend Time for the completion of "ADR" proceedings until 2/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/01) for Leave to file facsimile signature of opposing counsel and to substitute original signature when received . Response due: 12/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 230 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [229-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which to increase the deadline for completing ADR proceeding by 12/10/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001, Terminated: 9/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS, USA to Extend Time within which to increase the deadline for completing ADR proceeding , (until December 9, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 1/23/2002 ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR hearing held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADR Hearing for 9:30 a.m. 8/23/01 through 8/24/01 , in the National Courts Building, 7th Floor Conference Room, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (29 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of June 11, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Joint Status Report deadline to 8/31/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/11/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [224-1] motion to Extend Time to complete mediation, granting [223-1] motion for a status conference Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 6/11/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001, Terminated: 5/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 5/17/01) to Extend Time to complete mediation , (until July 15, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 5/17/01) for a status conference . Response due: 6/4/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER filing by leave of the judge and granting [221-1] motion to substitute Lonnie L. Simpson as attorney of record for plaintiff. (terminated attorney Gary Michael Riebschlager for PI ELECTRONICS Added Lonnie Lloyd Simpson). (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001, Terminated: 5/1/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 4/27/01) to substitute Lonnie L. Simpson as attorney of record for plaintiff filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [219-1] joint motion to Extend Time to complete alternative dispute resolution proceedings (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Mediation deadline is extended until 06/01/01. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 04/09/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS and USA to Extend Time to complete alternative dispute resolution proceedings , (until June 1, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ADR Hearing is set for 9:00 a.m., (EST) 3/7/01 The conference will be held in the 7th floor conference room of the National Courts Bldg., 717 Madison Place, N.W., (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Gary Michael Riebschlager. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER referring case for settlement by ADR, for a period not to exceed 90 days, unless the settlement judge reports that a settlement has been reached, approved by plaintiff, and is awaiting approval by defendant. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 1/17/2001 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS and USA to refer the pending case for alternative dispute resolution , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge Wilkes C. Robinson . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 214 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER staying proceedings for the purposes of settlement. By 1/15/01 the parties shall schedule a status conference. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 213 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [212-1] motion for a status conference. Set Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 11/2/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000, Terminated: 10/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/25/00 ) for a status conference. Response due: 11/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 3 volumes, at Washington, D.C., for the dates of September 25-27, 2000. Filed with Cumulative Index and Plaintiff's Exhibits: 304, 307-309, 313-314, 318(A), 319, 323, 325, 458; Defendant's Exhibits: 196, 300-302, 400, 404, 406, 412, 414-415, 432, 439, 458-459, 464-472. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 19, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part, denying in part [206-1] motion to exclude evidence, etc. The report of Betty James, dated 9/21/00, is excluded. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: a ruling for Plaintiff's motion for relief pursuant to the Spoliation Doctrine is deferred. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: the proofs shall be closed upon the filing of the official transcript of trial and exhibits. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Evidentiary Hearing held ( Transcript due 10/27/00 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/22/00 ) to exclude evidence, etc. Response due: 10/10/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/22/00 ) for relief pursuant to the spoliation doctrine . Response due: 10/10/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [203-1] motion to Quash Depositions, granting [203-2] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000, Terminated: 9/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/18/00 ) to Quash Depositions , and for Protective Order . Response due: 10/5/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 9/7/00 ) to [200-1] motion to reschedule hearing date, [200-2] motion to permit additional discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 09/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [200-1] motion to reschedule hearing date and denying [200-2] motion to permit additional discovery ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 9/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000, Terminated: 9/12/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/1/00 ) to reschedule hearing date and to permit additional discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filing by leave Defendant's motion to reschedule hearing date and permit additional discovery. Defendant shall enter his notice of appearance and supply the original declaration of Ms. James as soon as practicable. Plaintiff shall respond by 9/8/00. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Marian Blank Horn for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 8/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Statement of Position on Witnesses and Evidence by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 8/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Stipulation of Expected Testimony by PI ELECTRONICS. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [193-1] motion to Extend Time to comply with the 7/11/00 Order. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000, Terminated: 8/10/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 8/8/00 ) to Extend Time to comply with the 7/11/00 Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part, denying in part [190-1] motion For reconsideration of [187-2] order under Rule 83.2. Reset deadline to 7/31/00 for the filings pursuant to Paragraphs 1-2, 4-6, and 8 of the Order of 6/28/00 and reset Evidentiary Hearing, not to exceed 3 days, for 9:00 a.m., 9/25/00. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 27, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000, Terminated: 7/11/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 6/30/00) to [185-1] motion to Compel, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/14/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 190 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000, Terminated: 7/11/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 6/30/00) For reconsideration of [187-2] order under Rule 83.2 , by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 189 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiff's June 30, 2000, Motion for Reconsideration. Service: 7/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 188 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing Declaration of OMAR DAJANI by USA. Service: 7/3/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 187 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [185-1] motion to Compel, granting [185-2] motion for expedited consideration. The court ordered the reporter to prepare a five-day copy of the transcript (6/27/00 status conference) and to send it, along with a bill, to Mr. Riebschlager. Set deadline of 7/7/00 for: Plaintiff to produce all documents related to Mr. Gil's Masters Degree in Aeronautics and answer deposition questions relating to the degree; Mr. Riebschlager shall return either an executed original of the Stipulation of Expected Testimony of Bogdan Jonic or execute a copy of the affidavit and return it to the Clerk of the Court for filing Plaintiff shall file and serve PX-56, 257, 264A, 278; Plaintiff shall return DX-193 to the Clerk of the Court; Plaintiff's counsel shall advise Defense counsel whether Ms. Koppenhave has issued a supplemental report; Plaintiff can file a supplemental statement of Plaintiff's position on any other witnesses or evidence. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/06/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/3/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Plaintiff's Response to [185-1] motion to Compel reset to 6/23/00, [185-2] motion for expedited consideration reset to 6/23/00 ; and Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/27/00 for [185-1] motion to Compel, reset to 6/27/00 for [185-2] motion for expedited consideration. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000, Terminated: 6/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/16/00 ) to Compel and for expedited consideration. Response due: 7/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 13, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [178-1] motion to clarify, [178-2] motion to modify. Defendant's motion is denied except insofar as Plaintiff shall examine DX 193 as admitted in evidence. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for oral argument and to tax costs (contained in their response to Defendant's motions). The dates in Paragraphs 1 and 2 of the 3/23/00 Order are extended to 4/6/00 and the dates in Paragraphs 2 and 3 of the 3/14/00 Order are extended to 4/13/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 4/3/00) to [178-1] motion to clarify and [178-2] motion to modify the Court's 3/23/00 Order. Reply due: 4/17/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's response to [178-1] motion to clarify, [178-2] motion to modify the Court's 3/23/00 Order, and 178-3] motion for expedited consideration reset to 4/3/00. Paragraphs 1 and 2 of the Court's 3/23/00 Order are suspended pending resolution of the motion to clarify and to modify. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/28/00 ) to clarify and to modify the Court's 3/23/00 Order and for expedited consideration. Response due: 4/14/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Plaintiff shall produce the actual copy or copies of DX 193. By 3/31/00 Plaintiff shall supply the document(s) as directed by Defendant. By 3/31/00 Defendant shall produce the actual copy of DX 193. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/22/00) to Compel production of documents and for Expedited consideration . Response due: 4/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order. Set discovery re: documents and witnesses relating to the authenticity of DX 193 deadline to 6/16/00 ; set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 6/27/00 ; and set evidentiary hearing for 10:00 a.m., 7/17/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order by PI ELECTRONICS ( Transcript due 4/12/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [173-1] motion requesting an oral hearing on the motion for reconsideration. Oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 3/13/00 for [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000, Terminated: 3/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 3/1/00 ) requesting an oral hearing on the motion for reconsideration. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by PI ELECTRONICS to response to [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order. Service: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [170-1] motion for leave to withdraw Donald Gunn as Attorney of Record for plaintiff (Terminated attorney Carl Donald Gunn for PI ELECTRONICS); and directing Gary M. Riebschlager to enter his appearance forthwith in order to file the reply brief on the motion for reconsideration by March 2, 2000. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000, Terminated: 1/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 1/16/00 ) for leave to withdraw Donald Gunn as Attorney of Record for plaintiff filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [168-1] motion to Extend Time to reply re: motion for reconsideration Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/2/00 for [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order . ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000, Terminated: 12/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Suggestion of death and) MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 12/22/99 ) to Extend Time to reply re: motion for reconsideration (to March 2, 2000) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000, Terminated: 12/29/1999 Suggestion of Death
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUGGESTION OF DEATH of attorney Donald Gunn (and motion for enlargement of time) filed by PI ELECTRONICS [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/22/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Reply to Response to Motion set to 1/3/00 for [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order . ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/10/99 ) to [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Response to [164-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order set to 12/10/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 2/15/2000, Terminated: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 11/19/99 ) for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [162-1] order filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [154-1] motion in Limine regarding availability of certain theories of recovery, exclusion of any expert report or expert testimony by Kenneth J. Malek, exclusion of certain specified documents and seeking other relief. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 5 volumes, at Houston, Texas, for the dates of September 20-24, 1999. Filed with Cumulative Index and Plaintiff's exhibits: 9, 17, 19, 31, 37-39, 85, 87, 99, 108, 115, 117, 119, 129, 141, 143, 162, 174-175, 198 (1-2, 4-5), 227 (videotape), 228-230, 239, 242, 244, 264-277. Defendant's exhibits: 1-3, 5-11, 30, 30A, 31-32, 35-36, 36A, 37, 37A, 38, 38A, 43, 58, 60, 62, 65-68, 70-74, 76, 82-83, 85, 91-92, 96-97, 100, 106, 108-109, 111, 115, 118-120, 130, 139-141, 144, 147-148, 171-173, 187-190, 192-193, 200, 221, 240-242, 244-247. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [158-1] motion for Leave to File a supplemental brief. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [157-1] motion to Withdraw [146-1] motion in limine granting [157-2] motion for Leave to Substitute a new amended motion in limine, granting [157-3] motion to modify the Court's order to allow Defendant more time to respond to this motion. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 10/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/99 ) for Leave to File a supplemental brief. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999, Terminated: 10/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/12/99 ) to Withdraw [146-1] motion in limine ; for Leave to Substitute a new amended motion in limine ; and to modify the Court's order to allow Defendant more time to respond to this motion. Response due: 10/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [153-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion in limine. Defendant's response to [146-1] motion in limine reset to 10/22/99 and Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 10/27/99 for [146-1] motion in limine. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/19/99 ) to [154-1] motion in Limine regarding availability of certain theories of recovery, exclusion of any expert report or expert testimony by Kenneth J. Malek, exclusion of certain specified documents and seeking other relief. Reply due: 11/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999, Terminated: 11/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/22/99 ) in Limine regarding availability of certain theories of recovery, exclusion of any expert report or expert testimony by Kenneth J. Malek, exclusion of certain specified documents and seeking other relief. Response due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [157-1] motion to Withdraw [146-1] motion in limine reset to 10/29/99, [157-2] motion for Leave to Substitute a new amended motion in limine reset to 10/29/99, [157-3] motion to modify the Court's order to allow Defendant more time to respond to this motion reset to 10/29/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/19/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion in limine [until October 22, 1999]. Response due: 11/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [150-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion and limine. Defendant's response to [146-1] motion in limine reset to 10/20/99 and Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 10/25/99 for [146-1] motion in limine. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/22/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [149-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion in limine. Defendant's response to [146-1] motion in limine reset to 10/15/99 and Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 10/20/99 for [146-1] motion in limine. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999, Terminated: 10/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion and limine [until October 20, 1999]. Response due: 11/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/16/1999, Terminated: 10/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/12/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion in limine [until October 15, 1999]. Response due: 10/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [147-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's 9/20/99 motion in limine. Defendant's response to [146-1] motion in limine reset to 10/12/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999, Terminated: 10/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/7/99) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's 9/20/99 motion in limine , (until October 12, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/20/99 ) in limine regarding availability of certain theories of recovery, exclusion of any expert report or expert testimony by Kenneth J. Malek, exclusion of certain specified documents and seeking other relief. Response due: 10/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Letter dated 9/28/99 with attached Exhibits 162 and 279 by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 10/06/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Plaintiff shall file their motion in limine forthwith; set Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion to 10/8/99 and set Plaintiff's reply to 10/19/99. ( signed by Judge Christine C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Amended Second Proposed Stipulations for Trial by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Second Proposed Joint Statement of Issues by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Second Proposed Stipulations for Trial by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [138-1] motion for Leave to File deposition transcripts in lieu of testimony. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/17/99 ) to [138-1] motion for Leave to File deposition transcripts in lieu of testimony. Reply due: 10/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999, Terminated: 9/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/16/99 ) for Leave to File deposition transcripts in lieu of testimony. Response due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Defendant shall respond to motion for leave to file depositions by 9/17/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [134-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental documentation in support of motion in limine and for other relief, granting in part, denying in part [133-1] motion in limine and for other relief, granting in part, denying in part [133-2] motion for expedited consideration. By 5:00 p.m. on 9/17/99, the parties shall file a joint issues of fact and law, with a courtesy copy sent to chambers by facsimile transmission. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 9/14/99 ) to [133-1] motion in limine and for other relief. Reply due: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999, Terminated: 9/15/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: pretrial conference (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on September 14, 1999 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999, Terminated: 9/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 ) for Leave to File supplemental documentation in support of motion in limine and for other relief. Response due: 10/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 9/15/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/13/99 ) in limine and for other relief and for expedited consideration. Response due: 9/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW & FACT by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Witness ListCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Witness list by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED STIPULATIONS FOR TRIAL by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit list by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES by USA. Service: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [122-1] motion for Leave to File proposed joint statement of issues (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit list by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness list by USA. Service: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999, Terminated: 9/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/7/99 ) for Leave to File proposed joint statement of issues. Response due: 9/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney-In-Charge by PI ELECTRONICS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER filing, by leave of the judge, plaintiff's designation of attorney-in-charge as an unopposed motion for subsitution of attorney; granting [119-1] motion to Extend Time to make pretrial filings parties' Appendix G filings due on 9/7/99 ; and informing counsel that future submissions that do not comply with the court's rules will be returned unfiled. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999, Terminated: 9/1/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 8/30/99 ) to Extend Time to make pretrial filings (to September 7, 1999) filed [by leave by the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999, Terminated: 9/1/1999 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael A. Lamson for PI ELECTRONICS; Added Carl Donald Gunn. filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [116-1] motion to Extend Time to file the parties' witness and exhibit lists, statement of issues and factual stipulations Prehearing Submissions due: 8/31/99 for USA, for PI ELECTRONICS (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/30/99 ) to Extend Time to file the parties' witness and exhibit lists, statement of issues and factual stipulations [until August 31, 1999]. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 28, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part [98-1] motion for summary judgment. Set the parties Appendix G deadline on 8/9/99 ; reset pretrial conference for 1:00 p.m., 9/14/99 ; trial shall be held in courtroom 10B on the 10th Floor of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas, 515 Rusk Avenue, Houston, TX. (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA ( Transcript due 7/28/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. 6/28/99 for [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [104-1] statement by PI ELECTRONICS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [108-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 6/1/99 for [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/03/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [98-1] motion for summary judgment. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Service: 5/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999, Terminated: 5/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment [until June 1, 1999]. Response due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [106-1] motion for attachment of protective order seal. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999, Terminated: 5/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 5/14/99 ) for attachment of protective order seal. Response due: 6/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 5/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 5/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 5/13/99) to [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment, filed with a one (1) volume appendix. Reply due: 5/27/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: format for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and all further briefing. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 4/19/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Paul Charles Looney for PI ELECTRONICS Added Michael A. Lamson. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/14/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/14/99) for Summary Judgment , by leave of the Judge, [filed with a four (4) volume appendix (protected material)]. Response due: 5/17/99. (FE) Modified on 04/22/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Protective Order ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/13/99 ) for Protective Order. Response due: 4/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 23, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [94-1] motion to Extend Time to file their motion for summary judgment. Reset Defendant's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 4/14/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/22/99 ) to Extend Time to file their motion for summary judgment [until April 14, 1999]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/30/99; Defendant shall file dispositive motion by 4/14/99; Plaintiff shall file response by 05/14/99; Defendant shall file reply by 05/25/99; (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/22/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 3/23/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [86-1] motion for entry of a protective order. Service: 3/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER returning as unfiled Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response to motion for rehearing pursuant to Rule 83.2(f). ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 3/5/99 ) to [86-1] motion for entry of a protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [87-1] motion For reconsideration of [82-3] order under Rule 83.2. Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 3/25/99 , Howard T. Markey National Courts Building. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/5/99 ) to [87-1] motion For reconsideration of [82-3] order under Rule 83.2. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999, Terminated: 3/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 2/22/99 ) For reconsideration of [82-3] order under Rule 83.2. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/99 ) for entry of a protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 3/17/99; Dispositive Motion by 3/26/99; Plaintiff shall respond by 04/26/99; Defendant shall reply by 5/10/99; Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m. 8/24/99 in the National Courts Building; Trial deadline set on 10:00 a.m. 9/20/99, in the U.S. District for the Southern District of Texas, 515 Rusk Avenue, Houston, Tx ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/26/99 ) to [80-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/5/99 for Defendant to respond addressing the issue of whether the information contained in Plaintiff's 2/18/99 motion was already before the court. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [80-2] motion for expedited consideration, denying [81-1] motion for Clarification or, in the alternative, for reconsideration Response to [80-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery reset to 2/24/99 , and scheduling trial, not to exceed 5 days, to commence on 8/16/99 at 10:00 a.m. in Houston, Texas. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 2/10/99 ) for Clarification or, in the alternative, for reconsideration , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/1/99. (FE) Modified on 02/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 2/12/99 ) to Extend Time to conduct discovery (to March 17, 1999), and for expedited consideration . Response due: 3/1/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 2/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [70-1] motion for clarification, [70-2] motion for reconsideration of [69-1] order, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [70-2] motion for reconsideration of [69-1] order, vacating [69-1] order, and deeming, as untimely, plaintiff's second supplemental responses to interrogatories, to the extent objected to in defendant's motion. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 4/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories, requests for admission, and requests for production reset Discovery deadline to 1/31/00 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Notice of Change of AddressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of firm name - Lamson & Looney, filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/22/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories, requests for admission, and requests for production , (until January 29, 1999) by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/22/99. (FE) Modified on 01/26/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Pursuant to RCFC 83.2(f), nunc pro tunc, Response to [70-1] motion for clarification reset to 1/29/99, [70-2] motion for reconsideration of [69-1] order. reset to 1/29/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 1/15/99) to [70-1] motion for clarification. Reply due: 2/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/24/98 ) for clarification or, in the alternative for reconsideration of [69-1] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories No. 24(a) and 24(b). ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. {ORDER VACATED PER ORDER OF JANUARY 27, 1999} (JT) Modified on 02/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998, Terminated: 12/14/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 12/7/98 ) for Leave to File Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories No. 24(a) and 24(b). (Supplemental Responses included) Response due: 12/28/98 (JT) Modified on 02/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [66-1] motion to Stay, granting [66-2] motion to Extend Time for discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 2/15/99 and reset joint status report deadline to 1/15/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998, Terminated: 11/4/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/30/98 ) to Stay and to Extend Time for discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/16/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [64-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 12/31/98 and reset Joint Status Report deadline to 11/19/98. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge James T. Turner for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998, Terminated: 10/13/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 10/5/98 ) to Extend Time for discovery (until December 31, 1998), and to Expedite consideration , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/5/98. (FE) Modified on 10/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 10/1/98 for Defendant to provide Plaintiff with the appendices to the Statement of Work for the Solicitation Hardware and Baseline Software Development for the Customer Service Terminal as well as appendices to the contracts between the Postal Service and IBM and NCR. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by PI ELECTRONICS to response to [57-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery and [57-2] motion for Expedited consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/21/98 (AB) Modified on 08/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 11/2/98 and set Joint Status Report deadline to 11/9/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998, Terminated: 8/21/1998 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 8/17/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Gary Michael Riebschlager for PI ELECTRONICS Added Paul Charles Looney (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/19/98 ) to [57-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery. Reply due: 8/21/98 pursuant to 8/13/98 order. (AB) Modified on 08/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Defendant's response to [57-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery and for Expedited consideration reset to 8/19/98 with service by facsimile transmission. Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 8/21/98 for [57-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct discovery and [57-2] motion for Expedited consideration with service by facsimile transmission. The parties shall serve a courtesy copy on chambers by facsimile transmission. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998, Terminated: 8/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 8/11/98 ) to Extend Time to conduct discovery [to November 1, 1998] and for Expedited consideration. Response due: 8/28/98 (JT) Modified on 08/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct Discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 8/17/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998, Terminated: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to conduct Discovery until 8/15/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against PI ELECTRONICS Service: 5/7/98 ( Answer to counterclaim due 6/1/98 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 6/18/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998, Terminated: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/24/98) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 5/18/98. Response due: 5/11/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [43-1] motion to Compel documents, denying [43-2] motion for Sanctions, denying [43-3] motion for Expedited consideration ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint Reset Answer deadline to 5/18/98 ( Signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998, Terminated: 4/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/16/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint [to May 17, 1998]. Response due: 5/4/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/14/98 ) to [43-1] motion to Compel documents. Reply due: 4/27/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the renewed motion to compel Response to [43-1] motion to Compel documents reset to 4/14/98, [43-2] motion for Sanctions reset to 4/14/98 , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/17/98 for [43-1] motion to Compel documents, reset to 4/17/98 for [43-2] motion for Sanctions ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998, Terminated: 4/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the renewed motion to compel [to April 14, 1998]. Response due: 4/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by PI ELECTRONICS to response to [37-1] motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, [37-2] motion expedited consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [43-3] motion for Expedited consideration Response to [43-1] motion to Compel documents reset to 4/9/98, [43-2] motion for Sanctions reset to 4/9/98 , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/15/98 for [43-1] motion to Compel documents, reset to 4/15/98 for [43-2] motion for Sanctions , with service to be by facsimile. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998, Terminated: 4/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 3/31/98 ) to Compel documents , for Sanctions , and for Expedited consideration . Response due: 4/17/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by PI ELECTRONICS (Answer due 4/13/98 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Leave to Amend Complaint set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/31/98 for plaintiff to file amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/11/98 ) to [37-1] motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, [37-2] motion expedited consideration. Reply due: 3/23/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [37-2] motion for expedited consideration. Response to [37-1] motion for Leave to Amend Complaint reset to 3/11/98 , Reply to Response to Motion set to 3/16/98 for [37-1] motion for Leave to Amend Complaint , with service of both response and reply to be by facsimile. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Gary Michael Riebschlager. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998, Terminated: 3/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 3/2/98 ) for Leave to Amend Complaint and expedited consideration. Response due: 3/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to and including May 1, 1998, granting [33-2] motion to Compel discovery. Reset Discovery deadline to 5/1/98 , set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/10/98 for Defendant to respond to Request for Production of Document No. 67 and Interrogatory No. 27 and set Joint Status Report deadline to 5/15/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/4/98 ) to [30-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery until May 1, 1998. Reply due: 2/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Responses to [33-1] motion to Extend Time to and including May 1, 1998 and [33-2] motion to Compel discovery reset to 2/11/98, with service by overnight express mail. The court will rule on the motion without a reply. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998, Terminated: 2/20/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 2/4/98 ) to Extend Time to and including May 1, 1998 , and to Compel discovery , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/23/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/4/98 ) to [30-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery until May 1, 1998. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Response to [30-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery until May 1, 1998 reset to 2/4/98. The court will rule on the motion without a repy. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS to Extend Time for discovery until May 1, 1998 , for expedited consideration of this motion Response due: 2/12/98 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/22/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/11/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 4, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/5/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 10:30 on 12/4/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 30, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting, to the extent stated in order, [22-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories and production of documents; and resetting Discovery deadline to 1/31/98 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/1/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [22-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories and production of documents . Service: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 10/27/97 ) to [22-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories and production of documents. Reply due: 10/29/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Response to [22-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories and production of documents deadline reset to 10/27/97 with service by facsimile transmission , Reply to Response to Motion deadline reset to 10/29/97 with service by facsimile transmission for [22-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories production of documents ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/21/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997, Terminated: 10/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/97 ) to Compel responses to interrogatories and production of documents , and for Expedited consideration Response due: 11/6/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [20-1] motion to release information ( signed by Chief Judge Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997, Terminated: 10/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service : 9/29/97 ) to release information Response due: 10/16/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER reset Status Conference for 2:30 on 10/30/97 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 2, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set Discovery deadline to 12/31/97 , set Status Conference for 2:00 10/10/97 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held. ( Transcript due 6/2/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to requests for admissions, production of documents and first set of interrogatories, granting [12-2] motion to Extend Time to file separate preliminary status report reset Response to Interrogatories deadline to 4/25/97 , and set Status Conference for 3:00 5/2/97 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 4/16/97 ) to [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to requests for admissions, production of documents and first set of interrogatories, [12-2] motion to Extend Time to file separate preliminary status report. Reply due: 4/28/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 4/15/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/14/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997, Terminated: 4/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/14/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to requests for admissions, production of documents and first set of interrogatories , [until 4/25/97] and to Extend Time to file separate preliminary status report , [until 4/25/97]. Response due: 5/1/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Interrogatories deadline to 4/16/97 , Plaintiff shall file its owm Preliminary Status Report by deadline of 4/17/97 . The Court will issue a scheduling order based on the report received by April 17, 1997 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 3/19/97 ) to [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/31/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by PI ELECTRONICS to [6-2] counterclaim by USA. JPSR due 4/15/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File answer to counterclaim (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/97) to Extend Time to respond to discovery until 4/10/97. Response due: 3/10/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PI ELECTRONICS (Service: 2/21/97) for Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim. Response due: 3/10/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against PI ELECTRONICS. Service: 1/17/97 ( Answer to counterclaim due 2/10/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/17/97 (signed by the Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/20/1996, Terminated: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 1/17/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service : 10/30/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A,B & C), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042441. Answer due on 12/20/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?