NORRIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00677-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HOWARD F. NORRIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia Kay Griggsby +1 202 224 2981 +1 202 514 8780 lydia.griggsby@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/28/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/12/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. No costs. ( Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (CDC)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 11/7/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] cross motion . Service: 10/29/97 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service: 10/17/97 ) to [33-1] cross motion Reply due: 10/31/97 (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY by HOWARD F. NORRIS to response to [24-1] cross motion . Service: 10/17/97 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to October 17, 1997, to reply to response to plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/17/97 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, reset to 10/17/97 for [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997, Terminated: 10/3/1997 Terminated:
                MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 9/24/97 ) to Extend Time to October 17, 1997, to reply to response to plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record. Response due: 10/14/97 (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                  CROSS MOTION by USA for judgment upon the administrative record ( Service: 9/9/97 ) and RESPONSE to [24-1] cross motion by HOWARD F. NORRIS Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Proposed Additional FactsCourt Filing
                    COUNTER-STATEMENT of FACTS and PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA. Service: 9/9/97. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 9/9/97) to [24-1] cross motion. Reply due: 9/26/97. (FE) Modified on 10/29/1997
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to September 9, 1997, to respond to plaintiff's motion for judgment on the record and reply to defendant's motion to dismiss. Response to [24-1] cross motion reset to 9/9/97 , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/9/97 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, reset to 9/9/97 for [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997, Terminated: 8/13/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/11/97 ) to Extend Time to September 9, 1997, to respond to plaintiff's motion for judgment on the record and reply to defendant's motion to dismiss. Response due: 8/28/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Statement of Facts
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by HOWARD F. NORRIS [by leave of the judge]. Service: 7/17/97 (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Terminated:
                              CROSS MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS ( Service: 7/17/97 ) and RESPONSE to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA, [8-2] motion for SummaryJudgment together with 2 separate volumes of appendix, filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 8/18/97 (DS) Modified on 08/08/1997
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Leave to File errata, granting [20-1] motion to supplement the record ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; Response to [24-1] cross motion set to 8/18/97 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997, Terminated: 7/28/1997 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 7/21/97 ) for Leave to File errata Response due: 8/7/97 (CDC)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and for summary judgment Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 7/18/97, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. reset to 7/18/97 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 7/17/97 ) to supplement the record Response due: 8/4/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997, Terminated: 7/14/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 7/16/97 ) to Extend Time to July 18, 1997, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment. Response due: 8/4/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 07/18/1997
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to July 18, 1997, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment. Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 7/18/97, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. reset to 7/18/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 7/8/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 7/7/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and for summary judgment (to July 17, 1997). (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 7/14/97, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. reset to 7/14/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997, Terminated: 6/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 5/27/97) to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment (to July 14, 1997), (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motions to dismiss and for summary judgment Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 6/2/97, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. reset to 6/2/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997, Terminated: 5/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 4/25/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motions to dismiss and for summary judgment , (until 6/2/97). Response due: 5/12/97 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lydia Kay Griggsby Service : 4/24/97 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 5/1/97, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment. reset to 5/1/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997, Terminated: 3/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by HOWARD F. NORRIS (Service : 3/11/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until May 1, 1997). (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Waiver of Duplication ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997
                                                                Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 2/13/97 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/12/97) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or for Summary Judgment. Response due: 3/17/97 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997, Terminated: 2/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/13/97) for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 3/3/97 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/13/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996, Terminated: 1/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/23/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to February 13, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Edmund W. Chapman Service : 11/15/96 (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042482. Answer due on 12/27/96. (FE)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?