CREST A APARTMENTS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00687-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CREST A APARTMENTS, LTD. II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Grey Lewis +1 202 429 2082
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/30/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (145) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 136 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 135 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 137 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Terminated:
      MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), by CREST A APARTMENTS, LTD. II. Service: 3/24/03. Response due 4/24/2003. (lrd)
        LREF
        Blank 134 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 3/20/03. (lrd)
          LREF
          Blank 133 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 3/24/03 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 132 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
            SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 131 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 130 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                PUBLISHED DECISION granting [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, denying [37-1] motion for summary judgment as to liability, denying [40-2] motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 129 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Response
                  RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS to [128-1] response (supplemental brief) by USA. Service: 5/14/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 128 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Response
                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA pursuant to [126-3] order. Service: 4/30/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to suppelemntal brief due 5/14/02 . (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 127 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 16, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 126 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Court Filing
                          ORDER Defendant's supplemental Brief due 4/30/02 , and Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief due 5/14/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Oral Argument
                            Oral Argument re: [111-1] cross motion, [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, [40-2] motion for summary judgment, and [37-1] motion for summary judgment ( Transcript due 4/22/02 ) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 125 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/16/02 for [111-1] cross motion, [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [40-1] motion for partial dismissal and for [40-2] motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 124 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by USA to response to [111-1] cross motion. Service: 5/10/01. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 123 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [122-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation for reply brief (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 122 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001, Terminated: 5/7/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/4/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation for reply brief. Filed by leve of the Judge. Response due: 5/21/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 121 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [120-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/10/01 for [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, reset to 5/10/01 for [40-2] motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 120 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001, Terminated: 4/18/2001 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/13/01) to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment , (until May 10, 2001). (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 119 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                          RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 3/9/01 ) to [111-1] cross motion. Reply due: 4/19/01. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 118 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [117-1] motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, granting [116-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation . The coirt directs the Clerk of the Court to file Plaintiff's response. Defendant shall file any reply by deadline of 4/19/01 ( signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 117 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001, Terminated: 4/4/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                              MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 3/1/01) to Amend the Scheduling Order (to March 9, 2001 for plaintiff's response/reply brief; to April 19, 2001 for defendant's reply brief) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 116 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 3/9/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: responsive brief. (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Sarah L. Wilson . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER informing plaintiff that its motion to amend the scheduling order may be resubmitted for filing. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service : 3/5/01 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER directing Clerk of the Court to return Plaintiff's motion to amend the scheduling order (Certificate of Service reflects wrong attorney of record) ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA, (together with two separate volume appendices) (Service: 1/19/01) and RESPONSE to [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CREST A APARTMENTS, filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/20/01. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [108-1] motion to Extend Time to file cross-motion for summary judgment, granting [108-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Clerk is directed to file the Defendant's motion to dismiss in part, and for summary judgment, and opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability and supporting appendices ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Response to [108-1] motion to Extend Time to file cross-motion for summary judgment reset to 3/6/01, [108-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation reset to 3/6/01 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 3/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/12/01) to Extend Time to file cross-motion for summary judgment (to January 19, 2001), and, motion, out of time, For leave to exceed the page limitation . (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [106-1] motion to Extend Time to file combined motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's summary judgment motion Response to [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 1/12/01 , plaintiff's response to cross-motion reset to 2/23/01 , defendant's reply brief reset to to 3/23/01 . ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 1/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/00 ) to Extend Time to file combined motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's summary judgment motion [until January 12, 2001]. Response due: 1/8/01 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER re: (1) granting [104-1] motion to Extend Time to file combined motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and opposition to summary judgment motion by deadline of 12/22/00 ; (2) Plaintiff's Response by deadline of 2/2/01 ; and (3) Defendant's Reply by deadline of 3/9/01 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/17/00) to Extend Time to file combined motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and opposition to summary judgment motion , (until December 18, 2000). (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [102-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment defendant's cross-motion and Response to [98-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 11/17/00 ; plaintiff's response reset to 12/18/00 ; and defendant's reply reset to 1/12/01 . ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000, Terminated: 10/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 ) to Extend Time to file motion to dismiss and for summary judgment and respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [until November 17, 2000]. Response due: 11/3/00 (JT) Modified on 10/20/2000
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                              PROPOSED STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF LAW by USA. Service: 9/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [99-2] motion for Leave to File proposed statement of issues of law. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/1/00 ) to Extend Time, out of time, to file joint stipulations of fact [until September 1, 2000] and for Leave to File proposed statement of issues of law. Response due: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 8/28/00 ) for Summary Judgment . (1 Separate Volume of Attachments and 4 Separate Volumes of Exhibits) Response due: 9/28/00 (JT) Modified on 01/22/2001
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [95-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                        Joint Stipulations of Fact by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000, Terminated: 9/1/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                          MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 8/28/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER filing by leave Plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed page limitations and granting [93-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint stipulations of fact and joint statement of issues of law. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000, Terminated: 9/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/28/00 ) to Extend Time to file the joint stipulations of fact and joint statement of issues of law [until August 31, 2000]. Response due: 9/14/00 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 6, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [90-1] motion for Leave to amend the scheduling order. Reset deadline for the parties' joint stipulations to 8/28/00 ; reset Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 8/28/00 ; reset Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment filing deadline to 10/17/00 ; reset Plaintiff's response/reply deadline to 11/14/00; and reset Defendant's reply deadline to 12/5/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000, Terminated: 8/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 7/28/00) for Leave to amend the scheduling order . (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER set deadline of 8/8/00 for the parties joint stipulations of fact and joint statement of issues of law ; set Plaintiff's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 8/8/00 ; set Defendant's motion to dismiss and cross- motion filing deadline to 9/27/00 ; set Plaintiff's reply/response deadline to 10/25/00; and set Defendant's reply deadline to 11/15/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [86-1] motion to modify the Order dated 5/26/00 by USA ( Transcript due 8/7/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 7/5/00 ) to [86-1] motion to modify the Order dated 5/26/00, [86-2] motion to Extend Time, out of time, to respond to Plaintiff's proposed stipulations. Reply due: 7/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 7/6/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/30/2000 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [86-1] motion to modify the Order dated 5/26/00 by USA set at 10:30 a.m. on 7/6/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/20/00 ) to modify the Order dated 5/26/00 and to Extend Time, out of time, to respond to Plaintiff's proposed stipulations. Response due: 7/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Response
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS to [84-5] order. Service: 6/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time to file stipulations, granting [83-2] motion to establish new briefing schedule. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/15/00 for the parties to file the joint stipulations and combined independent proposed stipulations ; set Plaintiff's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 7/14/00 ; set Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment filing deadline to 8/31/00 ; set Plaintiff's response/reply to 9/28/00; and set Defendant's reply to 10/19/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000, Terminated: 5/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/25/00 ) to Extend Time to file stipulations [until June 15, 2000] and to establish new briefing schedule. Response due: 6/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [81-1] motion to Extend Time to file revised joint stipulations and combined independent proposed stipulations. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/25/00 for the parties to file their joint stipulations and to file separately, their combined independent proposed stipulations. Set Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 6/16/00 ; set Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment filing deadline to 7/26/00 ; set Plaintiff's response/reply deadline to 8/23/00; and set Defendant's reply deadline to 9/8/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000, Terminated: 5/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/12/00) to Extend Time to file revised joint stipulations and combined independent proposed stipulations , (until May 25, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [79-1] motion to Extend Time to file revised joint stipulations, granting [79-2] motion revise the briefing schedule. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/12/00 for the parties to file the joint stipulations ; reset Plaintiff's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 6/2/00 ; reset Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment/response deadline to 7/12/00 ; reset Plaintiff's reply/response deadline to 8/9/00; and reset Defendant's reply deadline to 8/25/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000, Terminated: 4/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/00 ) to Extend Time to file revised joint stipulations [until May 12, 2000] and revise the briefing schedule. Response due: 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [77-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulations by 4/25/00 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000, Terminated: 4/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/19/00 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulations. (to April 25, 2000) (DS)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulations. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/19/00 for the Defendant to file the joint stipulations of fact. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000, Terminated: 4/18/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/14/00 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulations (to April 19, 2000). (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [73-1] motion to Extend Time to file stipulations and establish new briefing schedule. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/14/00 for the parties to file the joint stipulations ; reset Plaintiff's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 5/12/00 ; reset Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment filing deadline to 6/21/00 ; reset Plaintiff's reply and response deadline to 7/19/00; and reset Defendant's reply deadline to 8/4/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000, Terminated: 3/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/29/00) to Extend Time to file stipulations and establish new briefing schedule , (until April 14, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time for the parties to file revised joint stipulations. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/29/00 for the parties to file revised joint stipulations ; set Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 4/28/00 ; set Defendant's motion to dismiss and cross-motion deadline to 6/7/00 ; set Plaintiff's response/reply deadline to 7/5/00; and set Defendant's reply deadline to 7/26/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/7/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000, Terminated: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/6/00 ) to Extend Time for the parties to file revised joint stipulations [until March 27, 2000]. Response due: 3/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint status report. Reset deadline of 3/6/00 for the parties to file a joint stipulation and reset joint status report deadline to 3/6/00. ( by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000, Terminated: 3/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/00 ) to Extend Time to file joint status report [until March 7, 2000]. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [65-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulations and status report. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/1/00 for the parties to file the joint stipulations , reset joint status report deadline to 3/1/00 , and reset status conference for 10:00 a.m., 3/8/00. The Clerk's Office is directed to strike from the record the following previously-filed submissions: 6/11/99 joint stipulation, 6/11/99 joint statement, Plaintiff's 6/18/99 volume of attachments, Plaintiff's 6/21/99 motion for summary judgment and exhibits, Defendant's 7/22/99 partial motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment and appendix, Plaintiff's 8/20/99 response to motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment, and Defendant's 9/8/99 reply to response to motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 10, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000, Terminated: 2/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 2/16/00 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulations and status report [two weeks]. Response due: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [50-1] motion for leave to file deposition transcripts, denying [63-1] motion for Leave to File revised proposal regarding Defendant's briefs. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/16/00 for the parties to file a new joint stipulation of facts ; set joint Status Report deadline to 2/16/00 ; set Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 2/23/00 ; set Defendant's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 3/17/00 ; set Plaintiff's cross-motions deadline to 4/10/00 ; set Defendant's response to 4/17/00 and set Plaintiff's reply to 4/24/00. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 01/14/2000
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument held ( Transcript due 2/9/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/7/00 ) for Leave to File revised proposal regarding Defendant's briefs. Response due: 1/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 2, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/27/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [60-1] response re: motion for leave by CREST A APARTMENTS Service: 12/23/99 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS to [58-7] order. Service: 12/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Statement re: the accuracy of the Defendant's briefs by USA. Service: 12/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability; denying [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability; Striking [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability ; directing plaintiff to supplement its motion for leave to file deposition transcripts; and directing defendant to file a statement re: factual contentions by 12/10/99 ; directing defendant to file a response to plaintiff's supplement by 12/23/99 ; Staying proceedings pending receipt of the filing of corrective briefs by defendant and until the court and parties can discuss the issues ; and scheduling oral argument on outstanding motions for 10:00 a.m. on 1/10/00 . ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. by CREST A APARTMENTS ( Transcript due 1/3/00 ), [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability by CREST A APARTMENTS ( Transcript due 1/3/00 ), [50-1] motion for Leave to file deposition transcripts by CREST A APARTMENTS ( Transcript due 1/3/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument re: [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. by CREST A APARTMENTS set at 10:30 12/2/99, [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability by CREST A APARTMENTS set at 10:30 12/2/99, [50-1] motion for Leave to file deposition transcripts by CREST A APARTMENTS set at 10:30 12/2/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m., 12/2/99 for [52-1] motion for Leave; [51-1] motion for Leave; and [50-1] motion for Leave. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CREST A APARTMENTS to response to [50-1] motion for Leave to file deposition transcripts, [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability, [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. Service: 11/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/5/99 ) to [50-1] motion for Leave to file deposition transcripts, [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability, [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. Reply due: 11/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [53-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motions to file depositon transcritps, supplemental points and authorities, and supplemental brief Response to [52-1] motion for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. reset to 11/5/99, [51-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability reset to 11/5/99, [50-1] motion for Leave to file deposition transcripts reset to 11/5/99 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 10/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motions to file depositon transcritps, supplemental points and authorities, and supplemental brief [until November 5, 1999]. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT) Modified on 10/28/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999, Terminated: 12/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 10/21/99 ) for Leave to File report in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to liability. (report included) Response due: 11/8/99 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. SEE ORDER OF DECEMBER 3, 1999. (JT) Modified on 12/06/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 10/7/99) for Leave to file supplemental points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment as to liability . Response due: 10/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999, Terminated: 1/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 10/7/99) for Leave to file deposition transcripts . Response due: 10/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Paul Schroeder. Service: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, [40-2] motion for summary judgment. Service: 9/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [46-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [46-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's opposition brief. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 9/8/99 for [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, reset to 9/8/99 for [40-2] motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999, Terminated: 9/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/1/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation and to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's opposition brief [until September 8, 1999]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 8/20/99 ) to [40-1] motion for partial dismissal and [40-2] motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 9/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [43-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999, Terminated: 8/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 8/5/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [41-1] motion for Leave to amend scheduling order. Plaintiff's response to [40-1] motion for partial dismissal reset to 8/20/99, [40-2] motion for summary judgment reset to 8/20/99 ; Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 8/20/99 for [37-1] motion for summary judgment as to liability ; and Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 9/3/99 for [40-1] motion for partial dismissal, reset to 9/3/99 for [40-2] motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999, Terminated: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 7/26/99 ) for Leave to amend scheduling order. Response due: 8/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/14/99 ) for partial dismissal and for summary judgment. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 8/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [38-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. The Clerk's Office is directed to retain the three copies of the motions which have already been submitted, and to file those three copies when the originally-signed copy is submitted by the Defendant. Set Defendant's deadline to file the originally-signed copy of the motions for partial motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment to 7/28/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 7/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/6/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 6/2/99 ) for summary judgment as to liability. (3 Separate Volumes of Exhibits) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by CREST A APARTMENTS re: [33-5] order. Service: 6/18/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Stipulation of Facts by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF LAW by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to file by the Court's leave the joint stipulations and joint statement of issues of law. Set Additional Documents (bound set of declarations containing original signatures) due: 6/18/99 for CREST A APARTMENTS ; reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment deadline to 7/14/99 ; reset Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response and response to Defendant's cross-motion deadline to 8/11/99 ; and reset Defendant's reply to response to cross-motion deadline to 8/25/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to File a motion to exceed page limitations out of time, granting [31-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, with defendant granted permission to exceed the page limitations, if necessary; returning plaintiff's motion for summary judgment for corrections (binding; Exhibit 3 is missing; original declarations; exhibits are to be sequentially numbered); directing plaintiff to file its motion for summary judgment, together with the joint stipulation of facts and joint statement of issues of law, by June 2, 1999 , defendant to file its response and cross-motion by July 7, 1999 , plaintiff to respond by August 4, 1999 , and defendant to reply by August 18, 1999 . ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 5/3/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation with respect to its motion for summary judgment filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999, Terminated: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 5/3/99 ) for Leave to File a motion to exceed page limitations out of time. Response due: 5/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting: (1) [28-1] motion for Leave to amend scheduling order ; (2) Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment, etc., by 5/3/99 ; (3) Defendant shall file its response and cross-motion by 6/1/99 ; (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply by 6/28/99 ; and (5) Defendant's reply by 7/12/99 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999, Terminated: 4/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 4/7/99 ) for Leave to amend scheduling order . Response due: 4/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] joint motion for Leave to file status report, granting [26-2] joint motion for Leave to amend scheduling order. Set Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 4/12/99 , set Defendant's cross-motion deadline to 5/10/99 , set Plaintiff's response to cross-motion deadline to 6/7/99 and set Defendant's reply to response to cross-motion deadline to 6/21/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999, Terminated: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA for Leave to file status report , and for Leave to amend scheduling order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 10/2/98 ) for Leave to amend scheduling order , (until November 30, 1998). Response due: 10/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA Service: 9/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/4/98 ) for Leave to file status report . Response due: 9/21/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER reset dispositive motion filing deadline to 10/30/98 and set joint status report deadline to 9/4/98. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by CREST A APARTMENTS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order. Reset Discovery deadline to 7/10/98 , reset Joint Status Report deadline to 8/7/98 , reset Amended Pleadings deadline to 8/7/98 and reset Motion Filing deadline to 9/4/98. If no dispositive motions are to be filed, the parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 9/4/98. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998, Terminated: 4/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 4/7/98 ) for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order. Response due: 4/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order reset Discovery deadline to 4/10/98 , reset Joint Status Report deadline to 5/8/98 , reset Amended Pleadings deadline to 5/8/98 , reset Dispositive Motion Filing or Joint Status Report deadline to 6/5/98 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/15/1997, Terminated: 12/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service: 12/3/97) for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order Response due: 12/22/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Amend [10-5] order reset Discovery deadline to 12/10/97 , reset Joint Status Report deadline to 1/8/98 , reset Amended Pleadings or motions pursuant to Rule 14 deadline to 1/8/98 , reset Dispositive Motion Filing (or joint status report if motion is not filed) deadline to 2/5/98 . (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997, Terminated: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 9/2/97 ) to Amend [10-5] order (complete discovery: 12/10/97; joint status report: 1/8/98; amendments to pleadings and Rule 14 motions: 1/8/98; dispositive motions or joint status report: 2/5/98.) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to August 1, 1997, to respond to discovery requests. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 7/21/97 ) to Extend Time to August 1, 1997, to respond to discovery requests. Response due: 8/7/97 (CDC) Modified on 07/23/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/8/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to July 23, 1997, to respond to defendant's discovery. reset Interrogatories deadline to 7/23/97 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997, Terminated: 7/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CREST A APARTMENTS (Service : 7/3/97 ) to Extend Time to July 23, 1997, to respond to defendant's discovery. Response due: 7/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Discovery deadline to 9/11/97 , set Status Report deadline to 10/9/97 , set Amended Pleadings deadline to 10/9/97 and set Motion Filing [or status report] deadline to 11/6/97 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents reset Interrogatories and request for documents deadline to 2/14/97 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997, Terminated: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/6/97) to Extend Time within which to respond to first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents , (until 2/14/97). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 1/27/97 ( JPSR due 3/17/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/27/97 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997, Terminated: 1/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/30/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until 1/27/97). Response due: 1/16/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brian Michael Simkin. Service: 11/13/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibit A), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042499. Answer due on 12/30/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?