DEHNE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00713-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Randall Gottlieb
Office COFC
Filed 11/7/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/16/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 29, 1999 affirmed [30-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/11/1998 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [33-1] appeal by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE CAFC NUMBER: 98-5109 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE. Copy to Defendant, Judge Hodges and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 045469. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
        UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [31-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Terminated:
          MOTION by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service : 3/20/98 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order . (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998
              Case closed (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                UNPUBLISHED DECISION instructing the Clerk to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Craig Randall Gottlieb. Service : 2/26/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/17/98 ) to [26-1] motion for Clarification of the merits of the case following the status conference. Reply due: 3/2/98. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service : 1/31/98 ) for Clarification of the merits of the case following the status conference. Response due: 2/17/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/8/97 ) for Leave to File response to plaintiff's response to order of August 21, 1997. Response due: 10/27/97 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE to [21-1] order Service: 9/23/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE (letter dated September 4, 1997) by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE to [21-1] order filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                              RESPONSE by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE to [20-2] order, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/19/97. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER re: plaintiff's response to order of August 4, 1997. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER directing plaintiff to submit affidavits re: alleged misrepresentation by 8/20/97. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER set (Telephone) Status Conference for 12:00 7/30/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER denying [15-1] motion to Continue Status Conference set Notice of Compliance deadline that parties are to contact the Court within one week to schedule a status conference ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997, Terminated: 7/16/1997 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service : 7/7/97 ) to Continue Status Conference Response due: 7/24/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER mooting [14-1] motion for Clarification concerning jurisdiction ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service : 6/24/97 ) for Clarification concerning jurisdiction Response due: 7/11/97 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                              UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [8-1] motion to Dismiss set Answer deadline to 7/11/97 ( signed by Judge Robert Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 3/10/97 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service: 2/22/97) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 3/11/97 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Clarifying and Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss set to 3/3/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      RESPONSE by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE to [5-2] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/19/97 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by SUSAN ALICE MONCRIEF DEHNE (Service : 1/25/97 ) for Clarification . Response due: 2/11/97. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/97) to Dismiss . Response due: 3/3/97 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 1/21/97 ( JPSR due 3/6/97 ) (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 1/27/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Response to [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset to 1/21/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997, Terminated: 1/17/1997 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/97) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to February 20, 1997]. Response due: 1/23/97 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service: 12/11/96. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042546. Answer due on 1/6/97. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?