FRAZER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00721-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDWIN GASTON, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo I. K. FRAZER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo JANICE COLLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo MARGIE P. BERGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo MICHAEL B. DEAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
No Logo STEWART M. KENDERDINE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by butera-andrews.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Butera +1 202 347 6875 +1 202 347 6876 jbutera@butera-andrews.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Hosford +1 202 616 0332 +1 202 305 7643 elizabeth.hosford@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Vincent Thomas +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 11/12/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/11/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 21, 2002 affirmed [31-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ERRATUM to Order originally filed on May 11, 2001, and reissued for publication on July 13, 2001. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION (of Order filed May 11, 2001, reissued for publication this day, July 13, 2001) granting [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 34 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [33-1] motion for Publication of the 5/11/01 decision ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 33 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/12/01) for Publication of the 5/11/01 decision . Response due: 7/30/01. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 CAFC Case Number
            CAFC Case Number Re: [32-1] appeal by JANICE COLLEY, EDWIN GASTON JR., STEWART M. KENDERDINE, MICHAEL B. DEAR, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MARGIE P. BERGER, I. K. FRAZER. CAFC NUMBER: 01-5118. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2002 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by I. K. FRAZER, MARGIE P. BERGER, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MICHAEL B. DEAR, STEWART M. KENDERDINE, EDWIN GASTON JR., JANICE COLLEY. Copy to Defendant, Judge John P. Wiese and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT #051938. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint. No costs. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (17 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of May 1, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001
                        Oral Argument re: [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA ( Transcript due 5/31/01 ) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 5/1/01 for [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to file additional supplemental authority, etc. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001, Terminated: 2/2/2001 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/1/01) for Leave to file additional supplemental authority, etc. . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Amicus Brief Submission by FDIC. Service: 12/20/00. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to to file amicus brief (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 1/2/2001 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/20/00) for Leave to to file amicus brief . (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      REPLY by USA to [20-1] response by I. K. FRAZER. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/14/00 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                        NOTICE of filing letter dated October 30, 1996 by I. K. FRAZER, MARGIE P. BERGER, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MICHAEL B. DEAR, STEWART M. KENDERDINE, EDWIN GASTON JR., JANICE COLLEY, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/27/00. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by I. K. FRAZER to Defendant's supplemental authority. Service: 11/27/00 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss/supplemental authority until 11/30/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000, Terminated: 11/29/2000 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by I. K. FRAZER, MARGIE P. BERGER, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MICHAEL B. DEAR, STEWART M. KENDERDINE, EDWIN GASTON JR. and JANICE COLLEY (Service: 11/27/00) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss , (until November 30, 2000). Response due: (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by I. K. FRAZER, MARGIE P. BERGER, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MICHAEL B. DEAR, STEWART M. KENDERDINE, EDWIN GASTON JR. and JANICE COLLEY (Service: 11/27/00) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney James Caleb Boggs for JANICE COLLEY, attorney James Caleb Boggs for EDWIN GASTON, attorney James Caleb Boggs for STEWART M. KENDERDINE, attorney James Caleb Boggs for MICHAEL B. DEAR, attorney James Caleb Boggs for PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, attorney James Caleb Boggs for MARGIE P. BERGER, attorney James Caleb Boggs for I. K. FRAZER Added James John Butera. . (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental authority. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000, Terminated: 11/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/3/00 ) for Leave to File supplemental authority. (supplemental authority attached) Response due: 11/20/00 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Marie Hosford Service : 10/26/00 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER extending the appointment of Judge Wiese as Issue Judge to resolve the statute of limitations questioni, with said case to be reassigned to Judge Wiese. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from the list of Winstar related cases by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 3/13/97 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                RESPONSE by I. K. FRAZER (Service: 2/24/97) to [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/13/97 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting plaintiff's [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss to 2/24/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 2/24/97. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997, Terminated: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by I. K. FRAZER (Service : 1/29/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to February 24, 1997). (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Leave to File subsequent support of defendant's pending motion to dismiss (signed by Acting Chief Judge Lawrence S. Margolis for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997, Terminated: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by I. K. FRAZER, MARGIE P. BERGER, PEGGY COTHERN JASSO, MICHAEL B. DEAR, STEWART M. KENDERDINE, EDWIN GASTON JR., JANICE COLLEY, USA (Service : 1/13/97 ) for Leave to File subsequent support of defendant's pending motion to dismiss . Response due: 1/30/97. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997, Terminated: 5/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/3/97) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 2/3/97 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Pamela Anne Roth Service : 12/6/96 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042556. Answer due on 1/13/97. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?