FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00811-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Keith Huffman +1 202 626 5824 +1 202 628 0858 rhuffman@milchev.com
No Logo PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Keith Huffman +1 202 626 5824 +1 202 628 0858 rhuffman@milchev.com
No Logo Pulte Homes, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Keith Huffman +1 202 626 5824 +1 202 628 0858 rhuffman@milchev.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/26/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $50000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 8/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-5021'[], '06-5108'[]
Def Custody Status
Pending Status PstTrlBrf
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (363) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 331 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [301] Sealed Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 330 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 7/9/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 06-5108 for [329] Notice of Appeal filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 329 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065208. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 328 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [311] Motion for Attorney Fees, finding as moot [321] Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 326 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-69) held on April 25, 2006 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/25/2006. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Blank 325 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [321] MOTION to Strike [318] Reply to Response to Motion, and [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees: Oral Argument set for 4/25/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 324 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 6, 2006, forwarded to Robert Keith Huffman. See letter in file. (bre, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 323 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to [321] MOTION to Strike [318] Reply to Response to Motion , filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC. and PULTE HOMES, INC.. Reply due by 3/30/2006. Service: 3/16/06.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 322 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Surreply
                    SUR-REPLY re [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by USA. Service: 3/9/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 321 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION to Strike portions of [318] Reply to Response to Motion , filed by USA. Service: 3/9/2006. Response due by 3/27/2006. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 320 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Costs Taxed
                        Costs Taxed in amount of $ 8883.01 against defendant. (Sined by Clerk of Court). (lld, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 319 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [317] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Reply due by 2/23/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 318 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB. Service: 2/22/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 317 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/22/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 2/15/2006. Response due by 3/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 316 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [314] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Reply due by 2/17/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 315 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Reply to Objections to Bill of Costs
                                  REPLY to Objections to [310] Bill of Costs , filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 2/3/2006.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 314 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/13/2006 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/17/2006 to File Reply as to [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 1/27/2006. Response due by 2/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 313 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to [311] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by USA. Reply due by 2/3/2006. Service: 1/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 312 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Objections to Bill of Costs
                                        Objections to [310] Bill of Costs , filed by USA. Reply due by 2/3/2006. Service: 1/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 311 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006, Terminated: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees with separate memorandum, filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/15/2005. Response due by 1/17/2006. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 310 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Bill of Costs
                                            BILL OF COSTS, filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 1/17/2006. Service: 12/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 327 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 5/10/2006 Terminated:
                                              Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER. Add certified copy of the taxed matter to the mandate. (hw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 309 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                MANDATE of CAFC affirming [301] Sealed Order/Opinion. (hw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 308 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                  CAFC Case Number 04-5021 for [306] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 307 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 059029. (hw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 306 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Notice of Appeal
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 305 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003
                                                        Certified transcript of judgment, dated September 2, 2003, forwarded to Robert Keith Huffman. See letter in file. (bre,)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 304 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ERRATA: Please substitute the attached corrected opinion for the [301] Opinion released in the case filed August 28, 2003. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 303 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Filing by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. of Their Redacted Version of the [301] Court's Sealed Order/Opinion of August 28, 2003 and Their Suggested Corrections to That Opinion. Service: 9/15/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 302 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
                                                              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $48,683,620.00. Costs to plaintiffs. (lld, ) Modified on 9/2/2003 (lld, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 301 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Sealed Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SEALED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the amount of $48,683,620.00. Costs to plaintiffs. The parties are directed to notify chambers whether any redactions should be made prior to9/15/2003. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 300 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                  RESPONSE to [296] Pltf's Status Report filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 7/7/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 299 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION: The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment are granted in part and denied in part. In sum, pltf's are entitled to recovery of the net amount of lost federal income tax benefit. That amount cannot be finalized because the amount sought for lost tax benefits ($48,683,620) includes the as-yet-resolved claim for state tax benefits. Pltfs' other claims for relief are denied. Pltfs' October 2, 2002 motion to strike, pltfs' February 10, 2003 motion for an order requiring dft to state its position, dft's April 1, 2003 moton to strike, and dft's April 9, 2003 motion to strike portions of pltfs' oral argument are denied. The parties are directed to consult with each other and propose in status reports filed no later than June 23, 2003 further proceedings for resolving the sole remaining issue of the claim for state tax benefits. [This opinion was originally issued on June 3, 2003 under seal. This opinion is identical to that opinion, with the exception of redactions agreed upon by the parties and minor typographical changes.]Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 298 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [297] Dft's Motion to Seal Document [295] Status Report. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 297 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003, Terminated: 7/1/2003 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document re: [295] Defendant's Status Report by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/24/03 by hand. Response due by 7/8/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 296 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC. and PULTE HOMES, INC.. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/23/03.(dw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 295 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Status Report
                                                                            STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service by hand: 6/23/03.(dw1, ) Modified on 6/24/2003 (dw1, ).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 294 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE of filing redacted version by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC. and PULTE HOMES, INC. re [293] Sealed Opinion. Service by hand: 6/20/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 293 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Sealed OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                SEALED OPINION finding that plaintiffs are entitled to recovery of the net amount of lost federal income tax benefit; granting in part and denying in part the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment; denying as moot [280] MOTION to Strike filed by UNITED STATES, [245] Motion to Strike filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC., [267] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, [275] MOTION to Strike filed by UNITED STATES; and directing parties to file status reports proposing further proceedings for resolving the remaining issue of the claim for state tax benefits and to notify the court of any redactions to this opinion by 6/23/03. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dls, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 292 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Redacted Document
                                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT - Notice of filing and 3/24/03 Oral Argument Transcript by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC.. Service: 5/29/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 291 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    [REVISED AND CORRECTED COPY] TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 24, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (dw1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 290 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 24, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (dw1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE of delayed filing by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 4/30/03 by hand. by leave of the Judge(vro, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          REPLY to Response re [280] MOTION to Strike portion of plaintiffs' oral arguement filed by The United States. Service: 4/25/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [284] Motion for Leave requiring the court reporter to make certain corrections to the 3/24/03 oral argument Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (hw1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [280] MOTION to Strike filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC.. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/16/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 284 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File requesting the Court issue an Oder requiring the Court Reporter to make certain corrections to the March 24, 2003 Oral Argument Transcript by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC..Service: 4/16/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 283 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [275] MOTION to Strike filed by The United States. Service by hand: 4/15/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [279] Motion to place the transcropt of 3/24/03 under seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lrd)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [274] MOTION for Leave to File post-hearing memorandum clarifying,filed by The United States. Reply due 4/18/2003. Service: 4/9/03 by hand.FILED UNDER SEAL. (lrd)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike portions of Plaintiffs' oral argument, by The United States.Service: 4/9/03 by hand. Response due 4/23/2003. FILED UNDER SEAL. (lrd)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 279 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION requesting the Court to issue an order placing the transcript dated 3/4/03 under seal pursuant to the Protective Order, by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., and PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 4/8/03.Response due 4/25/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [275] MOTION to Strike filed by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC. and PULTE HOMES, INC.. Reply due by 4/18/2003. Service: 4/4/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 24, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 289 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF - Memorandum Clarifying Certain Issues Raised by Plaintiffs' responses to Questions Asked by the Court at the March 24,2003 Hearing by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES, INC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [274] Motion for Leave to File post-hearing memorandum. Defendant's Response due by 4/9/2003. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike notice of filing of supplemental attachments to the Declaration of Gregory Nelson and the second supplemental Declaration of Bruce Robinson, by The United States. Service: 4/1/03 by hand. Response due 4/15/2003.(lrd)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/24/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File post-hearing memorandum clarifying certain issued raised by Plaintiffs' responses to questions asked by the Court at the 3/24/03 by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., PULTE HOMES,INC.Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 273 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing of corrected pages by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES,INC., and PULTE HOMES, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/21/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Oral Argument held on 03/24/2003. (dmh)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 272 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing of corrected copies by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB and PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC. Service: 2/11/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 271 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of supplemental attachments to the Declaration of Gregory Nelson and the second supplemental Declaration of Bruce Robinson by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, FSB, PULTE DIVERSIFIED COMPANIES, INC., and PULTE HOMES, INC. Service: 3/19/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 270 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK to response to [267-1] motion for an order requiring Defendant to state its position regarding certain issues critical to Plaintiffs' damages. Service: 3/4/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 269 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/25/03) to [267-1] motion for an order requiring Defendant to state its position regarding certain issues critical to Plaintiffs' damages. Reply due: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of corrected certificates of service by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 2/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 267 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 2/10/03) for an order requiring Defendant to state its position regarding certain issues critical to Plaintiffs' damages . Response due: 2/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 265 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [262-1] motion to change the name of plaintiff PULTE CORPORATION. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 266 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [263-1] motion for Oral Argument on plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on damages and defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on damages oral argument set for 9:30 a.m., 3/24/03 for [245-1] motion to Strike opinions of Defendant's experts., set for 9:30 a.m., 3/24/03 for [224-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 1/8/03 ) to change the name of plaintiff PULTE CORPORATION . Response due: 1/27/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 263 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/2/03 ) for Oral Argument on plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on damages and defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on damages . Response due: 1/21/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/15/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Robert Keith Huffman (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Bruce Robinson. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 260 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK to [250-1] response order by USA. Service: 11/5/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [254-1] motion for Leave to file additional exhibit, granting [253-1] motion for Leave to file additional declaration in support of response to the disagreements asserted in Defendant's response to the additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, granting [252-1] motion for Leave to file opposition to the disagreements asserted in defendant's response to plaintiff's additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 258 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED to response to [254-1] motion for Leave to file additional exhibit. Service by hand: 11/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 257 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 11/25/02) to [254-1] motion for Leave to file additional exhibit. Reply due: 12/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 256 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to response to [253-1] motion for Leave to file additional declaration in support of response to the disagreements asserted in Defendant's response to the additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, [252-1] motion for Leave to file opposition to the disagreements asserted in defendant's response to plaintiff's additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact . Service by hand: 11/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 255 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/18/02) to [253-1] motion for Leave to file additional declaration in support of response to the disagreements asserted in Defendant's response to the additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, [252-1] motion for Leave to file opposition to the disagreements asserted in defendant's response to plaintiff's additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. Reply due: 11/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 254 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 12/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 11/12/02) for Leave to file additional exhibit . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 11/8/02) for Leave to file additional declaration in support of response to the disagreements asserted in Defendant's response to the additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact . Response due: 11/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 11/5/02) for Leave to file opposition to the disagreements asserted in defendant's response to plaintiff's additional proposed findings of uncontroverted fact . Response due: 11/19/02 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 251 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK to response to [245-1] motion to Strike opinions of Defendant's experts. Service: 11/5/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 250 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                          Response by USA to [244-1] proposed findings by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK FILED UNDER SEAL. Service by hand: 10/25/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 249 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 10/25/02) to [245-1] motion to Strike opinions of Defendant's experts FILED UNDER SEAL. Reply due: 11/5/02 (included in reply to response to cross motion) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [237-1] cross motion FILED UNDER SEAL. Service by hand: 10/25/02 (also includes response to motion to strike) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [247-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to cross-motion Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/25/02 for [237-1] cross motion and Response to [245-1] motion to Strike opinions of Defendant's experts reset to 10/25/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002, Terminated: 10/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/02) to Extend Time to file reply to cross-motion until 10/25/02. Response due: 11/4/02, (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 10/7/02 (by hand)) to [237-1] cross motion. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Reply due: 10/21/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 245 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 10/7/02 (by hand)) to Strike opinions of Defendant's experts. Response due: 10/21/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                        ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 10/7/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 243 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to [238-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 10/7/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 242 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [241-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, granting [241-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Response to [237-1] cross motion reset to 10/7/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 241 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002, Terminated: 9/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 9/10/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment [until October 7, 2002] and For leave to exceed the page limitation. Response due: 9/27/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 239 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by USA to [225-1] proposed findings by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 8/28/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 8/28/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 237 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 8/28/02) and RESPONSE to [224-1] motion for Summary Judgment by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (together with four volume appendix), FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 9/30/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [237-1] cross motion reset to 9/30/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 240 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [235-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation in Defendant's response and cross-motion for summary judgment on damages (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [234-1] motion for Reconsideration of [227-1] order (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002, Terminated: 8/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/23/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation in Defendant's response and cross-motion for summary judgment on damages. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002, Terminated: 8/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/02 ) for Reconsideration of [227-1] order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of appendix to the Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [230-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental appendix (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [226-1] motion to Strike the supplemental expert report of William F. Wolf (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 8/16/02) for Leave to file supplemental appendix . Response due: 8/30/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 8/15/02) to Withdraw [226-1] motion to Strike the supplemental expert report of William F. Wolf. by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK . Response due: 8/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [229-1] motion to Withdraw [226-1] motion to Strike the supplemental expert report of William F. Wolf. by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK due 8/29/02 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 228 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 8/14/02) to [226-1] motion to Strike the supplemental expert report of William F. Wolf. Reply due: 8/23/02. [FILED WITH SEPARATE VOLUME OF EXHIBITS 1 - 6, FILED UNDER SEAL] (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED DECISION granting [202-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 226 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 7/31/02 (by hand)) to Strike the supplemental expert report of William F. Wolf. Response due: 8/14/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 225 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 7/31/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 224 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 7/31/02) for Summary Judgment on damages, (together with an 11 volume appendix filed UNDER SEAL). Response due: 8/28/02. (HW) Modified on 08/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 223 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 222 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [221-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment. set Motion Filing deadline to 7/31/02 ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Christince O.C. Miller for Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002, Terminated: 6/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 6/19/02 ) to Extend Time to file their motion for summary judgment until 7/31/02. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation by USA, [202-1] motion for Summary Judgment by PULTE CORPORATION (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 220 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: evidentiary hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 25, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 6/18/02 for [202-1] motion for Summary Judgment and for [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Plaintiff's response to Defendant's expert witnesses due 6/25/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY by USA re: [212-1] motion reply by PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 5/1/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [215-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Pulte Corporation's reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability for defendant's breach of implied-in-fact contract (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 5/1/02) for Leave to file sur-reply to Pulte Corporation's reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability for defendant's breach of implied-in-fact contract . Response due: 5/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Expert Report due: 6/5/02 for USA , Plaintiff's response to Defendant's expert witnesses due 6/19/02 , and Discovery deadline is 7/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing held ( Transcript due 5/28/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-RESPONSE by PULTE CORPORATION pursuant to [211-3] order. Service: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by PULTE CORPORATION to response to [202-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Hearing on 4/10/02 "Motion to Strike Pplaintiff's New Experts": 10:00 a.m. 4/25/02 , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. and Pulte shall file a sur-response to defendant's reply in additon to defendant's opposition to motion for summary judgment by 4/19/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 4/11/02) to [209-1] motion to Strike Plaintiff's new experts, [209-2] motion for a Hearing on the record, [209-3] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 4/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 209 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/10/02) to Strike Plaintiff's new experts , for a Hearing on the record , and for a status conference . Response due: 4/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, together with an envelope containing "Attorneys Only Material", by USA (Service by hand: 4/5/02) to [202-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 4/19/02 (included with reply to response to motion to dismiss) Envelope FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation. Service by hand: 4/5/02 (included with opposition to motion for summary judgment) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES filed by USA. Service by hand: 4/5/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 206 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service by hand: 4/5/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [204-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 204 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002, Terminated: 4/3/2002 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 3/28/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 4/11/02. (LTD) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [CORRECTED] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 3/12/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [CORRECTED] RESPONSE by PULTE CORPORATION to [191-1] motion to dismiss. Reply due: 4/9/02 (included in motion for summary judgment) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [CORRECTED] MOTION, together with a corrected volume of appendix, by PULTE CORPORATION for Summary Judgment . Response due: 4/9/02 (Includes response to motion to dismiss) (DS) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [200-1] motion for Correction (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 200 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002, Terminated: 3/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 3/8/02) for Correction . Response due: 3/22/02. (FE) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 199 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 3/6/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PULTE DIVERSIFIED (Service: 3/6/02 ) to [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 4/8/02 (Included in memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 198 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 3/6/02) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 4/8/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (includes response to motion to dismiss) (LTD) Modified on 04/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 197 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 196 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION for Protective Order . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 195 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [194-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Pulte Corp. Response to [191-1] motion to dismiss Pulte Corporation reset to 3/6/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 194 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002, Terminated: 2/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 2/11/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Pulte Corp. until 3/6/02. Response due: 2/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [190-1] motion to exclude the expert reports of Bruce Robinson and supplemental reports of Roger Cregg and Gregory Nelson, granting [190-2] motion to Extend Time to submit expert reports Defendant shall furnish its expert reports to Plaintiff by 5/15/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 192 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Attorney's only material SEALED) -by USA re: [190-1] motion to exclude the expert reports of Bruce Robinson and supplemental reports of Roger Cregg and Gregory Nelson by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/30/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 191 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 1/30/02) to dismiss Pulte Corporation . Response due: 2/27/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 190 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002, Terminated: 2/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/02) to exclude the expert reports of Bruce Robinson and supplemental reports of Roger Cregg and Gregory Nelson , or in the alternative to Extend Time to submit expert reports until 7/22/02. Response due: 2/19/02 (LTD) Modified on 01/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 189 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [187-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file expert reports (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 188 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER transferring all aspects of this case to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 187 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 12/18/01) to Extend Time within which to file expert reports , (until 12/28/01). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 186 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [185-1] motion to Extend Time for parties to file expert reports defendants shall furnish Plaintiff with its expert report by 4/17/02 and Plaintiff's shall furnish Defendant with it's expert report by 12/21/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 185 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, et al. (Service: 12/3/01) to Extend Time for parties to file expert reports (to December 21, 2001 for plaintiffs; to April 17, 2002 for defendant). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 184 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: defendant's question raised during the status conference of October 15, 2001, of whether the court would enter an order dismissing certain counts of plaintiff's complaint, and informing defendant that if it wishes to pursue the matter it must do so by a renewed motion. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 183 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume(28 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of October 15, 2001. Notice to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 182 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Discovery deadline to 6/10/02 and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages Filing deadline to 6/30/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/11/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (19 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 10, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (50 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 15, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re: Corrections to the opinion filed 8/16/01: (1) Page 6, paragraph 4, line 9: insert comma after the word "million"; and (2) Page 6, paragraph 4, line 10: delete the word "that" (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part (with respect to Count I), denying in part (with respect to Count II; and defendant's RCFC 56(g) request is denied), [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denied in part as moot [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment (The motion remains pending with respect to Counts III and VII. Consideration remains suspended pending further order.) The parties are directed to file a joint proposal recommending further proceedings in the case by deadline of 9/10/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation regarding Tax Return filing dates. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to [168-1] response by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service by hand: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION re: [168-1] response by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 8/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [171-1] motion for Leave to file a reply to response to supplemental brief on prior material breach, granting [170-1] motion for Leave to supplement their response to defendant's supplemental brief on prior material breach (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 8/15/01 for [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment and [54-1] motion for summary judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001, Terminated: 8/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/10/01) for Leave to file a reply to response to supplemental brief on prior material breach . Response due: 8/24/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED and PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 8/10/01) for Leave to supplement their response to defendant's supplemental brief on prior material breach . Response due: 8/24/01. (FE) Modified on 08/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 3/7/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Plaintiff's shall file a supplement to the appendix of their 8/1/01 filing by 8/13/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/10/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK to [167-1] supplemental brief by USA. Service by hand: 8/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA. Service: 7/18/01. (Plaintiff's response is due on 8/1/01). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Defendant's supplemental brief is due on 7/18/01 , and Plaintiff's response Brief is due on 8/1/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (see No. 96-494C for transcript) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 96-494C FOR ORDER scheduling oral argument for 10:00 a.m. 6/29/01 for [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment . ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK to response to [155-1] renewed [cross] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 5/21/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [162-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to fourth reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, granting [162-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/21/01 for [155-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir For Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Reply shall be limited to 25 pages. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001, Terminated: 4/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 4/26/01 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to fourth reply in support of its motion for summary judgment , (until May 21, 2001) and For leave to exceed the page limitation , (by 5 pages) Response due: 5/14/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeffery Thomas Infelise. Service: 4/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 4/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/23/01) to [114-1] cross motion. Reply due: 5/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing of revised proposed finding of uncontroverted fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW BY FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/22/01. (LTD) Modified on 03/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RENEWED (CROSS) MOTION together with two volumes of appendix by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 3/22/01) for Summary Judgment . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Protective Order re: concerning release of confidential tax returns, etc. (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE: See order filed 03/07/01 in 96-494. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: (1) granting [128-1] motion for Leave to file copy of declaration of Michael F. Duhl; (2) granting in part, denying in part [114-1] cross motion; (3) granting in part, denying in part [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims; and (4) mooting [8-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (See: 96-590 for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 9, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held (see No. 96-590C for transcript of proceedings) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Scheduling a Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 2/9/01 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (See: 96-494 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 19, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 10, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument re: [114-1] cross motion by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims by USA held. See No. 96-494C for transcript due to be filed on 2/5/01. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/9/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 1/10/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service by hand: 1/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [134-1] motion to Bifurcate ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service by hand: 12/20/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [134-1] motion to Bifurcate and [134-2] motion to Transfer First Heights Plaintiffs' Winstar-related claim for resolution of statute of limitations issue. Service: 12/18/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 1/19/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [114-1] cross motion by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims by USA set at 10:00 a.m. on 1/17/01. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 143 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 12/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 12/4/00 ) to [134-1] motion to Bifurcate, [134-2] motion to Transfer First Heights Plaintiffs' Winstar-related claim for resolution of statute of limitations issue. Reply due: 12/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to response to [114-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 140 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corrected Copy - Defendant's Statement Of Genuine Issues Of Material Fact In Dispute (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 139 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected Copy - Defendant's Third Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment Against First Heights On "Tax Benefit" Claims And Response To First Heights' Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 138 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filing by leave and granting [137-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [136-1] motion for Leave to File corrected brief and statement of genuine issues of material fact in dispute. Plaintiffs are allowed to file a reply brief up to and including 25 pages. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 137 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000, Terminated: 11/28/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 11/21/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 136 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/00 ) for Leave to File corrected brief and statement of genuine issues of material fact in dispute. Response due: 12/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 135 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 11/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000, Terminated: 12/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/20/00 (by hand)) to Bifurcate and to Transfer First Heights Plaintiffs' Winstar-related claim for resolution of statute of limitations issue. Response due: 12/4/00 (JT) Modified on 11/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [131-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/28/00 for [114-1] cross motion. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 132 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of defendant's counsel re: [129-1] motion response filed [by leave of the judge]. Service 11/7/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000, Terminated: 11/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 11/14/00 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to November 28, 2000). Response due: 12/1/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 11/7/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 129 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service: 11/7/00 ) to [114-1] cross motion. Reply due: 11/27/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 128 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/7/00 ) for Leave to file copy of declaration of Michael F. Duhl . Response due: 11/27/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 3, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Plaintiffs' motion to correct the certificate of service for their status report. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of revised findings of uncontroverted fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Appendix in support of Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED and PULTE CORPORATION. Service: 10/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [120-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion to compel. Set deadline of 10/10/00 for Mr. Pearlman to respond to Plaintiff's motion to compel. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Defendant's Response to [114-1] cross motion reset to 10/31/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 11/2/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000, Terminated: 10/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by RONALD A PEARLMAN (Service : 9/29/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion to compel [until October 10, 2000]. Response due: 10/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the motion for enlargement to September 29, 2000 within which to respond to Motion to Compel ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [CORRECTED] MEMORANDUM by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION re: [114-1] cross motion by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK Service: 9/22/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [115-1] motion for Leave to file corrected cross-motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 10/3/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000, Terminated: 9/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 9/20/00 ) for Leave to file corrected cross-motion for summary judgment. Response due: 10/4/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION ( Service: 9/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims by USA. (5 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Defendant's Response to [114-1] cross motion reset to 10/16/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [111-1] motion to Extend Time to file brief in support of cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to Defendant's motion summary judgment. Plaintiff's Response to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 9/15/00 and set Plaintiff's cross-motion filing deadline to 9/15/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/4/2000, Terminated: 9/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 8/31/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to file brief in support of cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to Defendant's motion summary judgment [until September 15, 2000]. Response due: 9/14/00 (JT) Modified on 09/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [109-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents by 8/24/00 (signed by Acting Chief Judge Lynn J. Bush for Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000, Terminated: 8/23/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/21/00) to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents , (until August 24, 2000). Response due: 9/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [107-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's request for production of documents. Reset Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's request for production of documents to 8/21/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000, Terminated: 8/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/14/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's request for production of documents [until August 21, 2000]. Response due: 8/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 26, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument on defendant's motion to compel plaintiff's waiver of the 26 U.S.C. Section 6103 Privilege held ( Transcript due 6/27/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000. signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE concerning Plaintiffs' May 26, 2000, response to Defendant's brief in support of its motion for clarification of March 17, 2000, opinion addressing "exemplary" documents agreed upon by the parties by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Date Information for Selected Privileged Documents by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to Defendant's 6/1/00 Notice of Filing of Date Information for Selected Privileged Documents. Service: 6/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 31, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument on defendant's motion to compel plaintiff's waiver of the 26 U.S.C. Section 6103 Privilege set at 2:00 p.m. on 6/26/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument re: [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000 by USA ( Transcript due 6/30/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to [99-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 5/26/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief by USA re: [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000 filed by USA. Service by hand: 5/22/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corrected NOTICE of Lodging of Documents for status conference by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 15, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Plaintiff's Response to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims reset to 7/17/00 ; set Additional Documents (supplemental briefing) due: 5/22/00 for USA, 5/26/00 for PULTE CORPORATION, for PULTE DIVERSIFIED, for FIRST HEIGHTS; and oral argument set for 3:00 p.m., 5/31/00 for [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/22/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 10:30 on 5/15/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000 filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/9/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [93-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for clarification. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 5/9/00 for [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000, Terminated: 5/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/27/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for clarification [until May 9, 2000]. Response due: 5/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 4/17/00) to [91-1] motion for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000 filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/1/00. (HW) Modified on 05/23/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/7/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File corrected exhibits, additional exhibit, and additional documents for in camera review. Response due: 4/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [93-1] motion for Leave to Serve, out of time, documents pursuant to the Court's 3/17/00 Opinion. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000, Terminated: 5/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/7/00 ) for Leave to Serve, out of time, documents pursuant to the Court's 3/17/00 Opinion. Response due: 4/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: documents submitted by defendant for in camera review. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/31/00) for Clarification of the opinion of March 17, 2000 . Response due: 4/17/00. (FE) Modified on 05/23/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing "Documents Under Seal For In Camera Review" by USA. Service: 3/31/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [81-1] motion to compel. Defendant shall produce the appropriate documents by 3/31/00 and set deadline of 3/24/00 for Defendant to submit documents for in camera review. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SURREPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION re: Defendant's second reply in support of motion for summary judgment against First Heights on "Tax Benefit" Claims. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to response to [81-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Service: 11/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [84-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [85-1] motion for Leave to File surreply to Defendant's second reply in support of motion for summary judgment against First Heights on "Tax Benefit" Claims. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/22/99 (by hand)) to [85-1] motion for Leave to File surreply to Defendant's second reply in support of motion for summary judgment against First on "Tax Benefit" Claims. Reply due: 12/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 11/10/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File surreply to Defendant's second reply in support of motion for summary judgment against First Heights on "Tax Benefit" Claims. Response due: 11/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999, Terminated: 11/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 11/2/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 10/26/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to compel discovery [until November 2, 1999]. Response due: 11/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/7/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to compel [until October 14, 1999]. Response due: 10/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED and PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 9/24/99) to Compel Discovery , filed with two volumes of exhibits. Response due: 10/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing revised proposed findings of fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (see: 95-525 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to response to [74-1] motion to strike the argument that appears on pages 49-50 of Defendant's reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Service: 6/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/25/99 (by hand)) to [74-1] motion to strike the argument that appears on pages 49-50 of Defendant's reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Errata by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 6/22/99 ) to strike the argument that appears on pages 49-50 of Defendant's reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Response due: 7/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service by hand: 6/10/99) to [68-1] motion for Leave to file the Supplemental Declaration of Donald C. Lubick, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to file the Supplemental Declaration of Donald C. Lubick (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 6/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims, (filed with 1 appendix). Service: 6/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999, Terminated: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 6/3/99) for Leave to file the Supplemental Declaration of Donald C. Lubick Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [66-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/28/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE of Coast-to-Coast Financial Corp, Local America Bank of Tulsa and Centex Corporation re: [64-1] motion response by PULTE CORPORATION, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/21/99 (JT) Modified on 06/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 5/21/99 ) to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Reply due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected Appendix to Motion for Summary Judgment on Tax Benefit Claims by USA. (JT) Modified on 05/11/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [60-1] motion for Leave to file corrected appendix. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Plaintiff's response to [54-1] motion for summary judgment on tax benefit claims reset to 5/21/99 , Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 6/14/99 for [54-1] motion for summary judgment on tax benefit claims. Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 6/29/99 for [54-1] motion for summary judgment on tax benefit claims. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999, Terminated: 5/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/99) for Leave to file corrected appendix . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER vacating the order of 3/25/99, granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment; to allow the other Plaintiffs to file briefs in support of First Heights' response and the Defendant's response to First Heights' response, granting [57-1] motion for Leave to amend certificates of service. Set Plaintiffs' motion to compel filing deadline to 4/5/99 , set Defendant's response due 4/16/99 and Plaintiffs' reply due 5/3/99. Set Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's dispositive motion deadline to 4/23/99 and set Defendant's reply deadline to 5/10/99. Set Oral argument on the motion to compel and for summary judgment for 10:00 a.m., 5/21/99. Set discovery deadline to 7/27/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 3/19/99 motion for enlargement of time. Accordingly, paragraphs 3 and 4 of the Court's 3/8/99 Order are amended. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/99 ) for Leave to amend certificates of service . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 3/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 3/19/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment; to allow the other Plaintiffs to file briefs in support of First Heights' response and the Defendant's resonse to First Heights' response [until April 23, 1999 (for Plaintiffs' filings) and May 10, 1999 (for Defendant's filings)]. Response due: 4/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/99 ) for Summary Judgment on tax benefit claims. (1 Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log by Brief deadline of 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log , (until 1/8/99). Response due: 1/11/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/21/98) to Extend Time to serve privilege log until 12/23/98. Response due: 1/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. (See 95-525) Service: 12/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Defendant shall serve their privilege log on Plaintiffs by 12/21/98. The Government is granted leave to file a supplemental privilege log with respect to Office of Thrift Supervision documents. Defendant shall complete their document production by 12/31/98. Set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 1/19/99 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Plaintiffs to file their motion to compel ; set Additional Documents due: 2/9/99 for USA (response to motion to compel) for Plaintiff (response to dispositive motion); 2/23/99 for Plaintiff (reply brief re: motion to compel); for USA (reply brief re: dispositive motion) ; set oral argument regarding the motion to compel on 5:00 p.m., 3/3/99 ; and reset discovery deadline to 6/30/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER filing by leave and granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint interrogatories deadline to 11/6/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/30/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/02/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [45-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents and the time of discovery. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint set of requests for production deadline to 9/28/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [41-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Service: 8/25/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION, USA for Protective Order. (See 95-525) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 8/14/98 (by hand)) to [41-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Reply due: 8/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/98 ) to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first request for production of documents, granting [38-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first document requests and first set of interrogatories. Set Plaintiff's response to Defendant's first request for production of documents to 7/21/98 and reset Plaintiff's time for producing documents in response to Defendant's first document requests and first set of interrogatories to 8/5/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998, Terminated: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 7/10/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first request for production of documents [to July 21, 1998] and to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first document requests and first set of interrogatories [to August 5, 1998]. Response due: 7/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production of documents . Interrogatories deadline to 7/10/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998, Terminated: 7/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 7/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production of documents [to July 10, 1998]. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE 95-525C for MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents . (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents, granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink.) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 21, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE Case No. 95-525 for MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [until July 7, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See 95-525 for ORDER re: consideration of defendant's motion for partial dismissal shall be suspended pending further order from the court. The parties are directed to file all future papers using a single caption reflecting all five cases (95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        See 95-525 for MEMORANDUM by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK re: [29-1] joint preliminary status rpt. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/22/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 5/21/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE NO. 95-525C FOR JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE NO. 95-525C FOR SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 9/22/98; and directing petitioner to file a supplement to the joint preliminary status report by 4/10/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 3/6/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE 95-525C FOR MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE NO. 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/25/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE NO. 95-525C FOR MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report (to February 25, 1998). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION to response to [18-1] motion for Leave to File to file sur-reply. Service: 2/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/13/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/20/98 ) to [18-1] motion for Leave to File to file sur-reply. Reply due: 2/2/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER reassigning case to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/31/1997, Entered: 1/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 12/31/97 ) for Leave to File to file sur-reply . Response due: 1/20/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting that this case be removed from the list of Winstar related cases by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/5/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/30/97) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for partial dismissal of plaintiffs' complaint until 6/5/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 5/9/97 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 5/23/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to May 23, 1997, to reply to plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion for partial dismissal., granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Dismissal Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/23/97 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/97 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response re: motion to dismiss , (until May 30, 1997). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997, Terminated: 5/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/14/97 ) to Extend Time to May 23, 1997, to reply to plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion for partial dismissal. Response due: 6/2/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service : 5/9/97 ) for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Dismissal . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION (Service: 4/28/97 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 5/15/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/26/97) to Dismiss . Response due: 4/28/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** See 96-590 C for motion for entry of supplemental case management Order. *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/26/97 (signed by the Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997, Terminated: 2/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service: 2/19/97) to Extend Time [to 3/26/97] within which to respond to plaintiffs' complaint . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service: 1/8/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/26/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, PULTE DIVERSIFIED, PULTE CORPORATION of related case(s). (Winstar-related). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/26/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042791. Answer due on 2/24/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?