TIPPETT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00308-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID E. TIPPETT, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Sean Dufault +1 202 616 0471 +1 202 353 7988 michael.dufault@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/30/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/23/2002
Origin 4
Reopened 3/27/2002
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
MOTION by USA (Service: 1/3/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to compel until 1/9/03. Response due: 1/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 93 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER to return Plaintiff's motion because this case is closed (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 92 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the defendant shall cancel plaintiff's discharge, reinstate him at the grade of Captain, correct his records to reflect active duty service to the date of reinstatement, and give plaintiff back pay from the date of discharge to reinstatement (less appropriate offsets). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 91 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Court Filing
        ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff in accordance with the Order issued April 12, 2002. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 90 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Court Filing
            ORDER vacating [86-1] judgment order and directing the parties to advise the court no later than April 19, 2002 of other appropiate relief or the need for further proceedings. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 89 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 CAFC Mandate Reversing
              MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 27, 2002 reversing and remanding the [86-1] judgment order. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 88 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: Parties please advise the Court of any objections to removing the seal from this case, if the Court does not hear from parties, the case will be transferred to open files on January 19, 2001 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Terminated:
                  CAFC Case Number Re: [87-1] appeal by DAVID E. TIPPETT CAFC NUMBER: 00-5133 (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 87 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID E. TIPPETT. Copy to Judge Robert H. Hodges, defendant and C.A.F.C. . FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 050378. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 86 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000, Terminated: 4/12/2002 Judgment*
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 85 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Court Filing
                        UNPUBLISHED DECISION concluding that plaintiff's discharge was not rendered ivoluntary by ineffective assistance of counsel. Plaintiff's discharge from the Army was voluntary. The clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000
                          Case closed (LD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 84 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000
                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at New Orleans, Louisiana, for date of June 1, 2000 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Trial Held
                              Trial held ( Transcript due 7/3/00 ) (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 83 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [73-1] motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 82 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER set trial for 10:00 a.m., 6/1/00-6/2/00 in New Orleans, Louisiana. (Federal Courthouse, Room C-311, 500 Camp Street) (Trial is closed to the public) ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 81 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re: the Circuit opinion and May hearing. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 80 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: The parties shall file depositions by 4/14/00 and Status Report deadline to 5/1/00 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 79 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Leave to file telecopied signature of declarant. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Copy to parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 78 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [77-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 77 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2000 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/8/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories [until March 9, 2000]. Response due: 3/27/00 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 76 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Filing Original Supplemental Declaration by USA. Service: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 75 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000, Terminated: 3/14/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 2/29/00) for Leave to file telecopied signature of declarant Response due: 3/17/00. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories [until March 8, 2000]. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000, Terminated: 5/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 2/28/00 ) for Leave to Supplement the Record. Response due: 3/16/00 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [71-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories deadline to 3/1/00. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Francis M. Allegra for Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000, Terminated: 2/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/25/00) to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery until 3/1/00. Response due: 3/13/00. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 2/15/00 ) For reconsideration of [67-1] order under Rule 83.2. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories deadline to 2/25/00. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/17/2000
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000, Terminated: 2/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/11/00) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories , (until February 25, 2000). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying [58-1] motion to Compel Defendant to produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/27/00 ) to [58-1] motion to Compel Defendant to produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army. Reply due: 2/10/00 (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Extend Time to the opposed motion for an order that the defendant produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army. Defendant's response to [58-1] motion to Compel Defendant to produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army reset to 1/25/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [62-1] motion to modify the procedural schedule. Reset Discovery deadline to 2/29/00 ; reset briefs deadline to 3/28/00 ; and reset oral argument for 10:00 a.m., 4/28/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000, Terminated: 1/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/00) to Extend Time to the opposed motion for an order that the defendant produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army , (until January 25, 2000). (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 1/12/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 1/6/00 ) to modify the procedural schedule. Response due: 1/24/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 01/07/2000
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for an order. Defendant's response to [58-1] motion to Compel Defendant to produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army reset to 1/11/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/27/1999, Terminated: 12/29/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/27/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for an order [until 1/11/00]. Response due: 1/10/00 (AB)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [57-4] order. Service: 12/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 12/14/99 ) to Compel Defendant to produce complete, unredacted copies of the several investigations conducted by the U.S. Army. Response due: 1/3/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/14/00 for counsel to supplement the record ; set briefs deadline to 1/28/00 ; and set oral argument for 2/28/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re: the parties will advise the court by 9/25/99 how they propose to resolve this matter. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Sean Dufault. Service: 8/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 CAFC Mandate Reversing
                                                                                          MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated 8/9/99 vacating and remanding the [47-1] judgment order. (FE) Modified on 07/24/2000
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [52-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [51-1] order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999, Terminated: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 3/29/99 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [51-1] order. (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [50-1] motion to seal protected information in Court's Order. Court's August 21, 1997 Order shall be placed under seal. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999, Terminated: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/16/99 ) to seal protected information in Court's Order. Response due: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998
                                                                                                    ***Case signed out to Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit this day. *** (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                      CAFC Case Number Re: [48-1] appeal by DAVID E. TIPPETT. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5005. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/22/1997, Terminated: 8/9/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID E. TIPPETT. Copy to Defendant, Judge Hodges and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 044361. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997
                                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. [VACATED BY JUDGMENT OF FEDERAL CIRCUIT DATED 8/9/99.] (FE) Modified on 07/24/2000
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997
                                                                                                            Case closed (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [15-1] motion to Dismiss [Placed UNDER SEAL by court's order of March 18, 1999.] ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 03/22/1999
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Cross Motion, 1 volume, at Washington, D.c., for date of June 4, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [30-1] cross motion by DAVID E. TIPPETT ( Transcript due 7/7/97 ). (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY by DAVID E. TIPPETT to response to [30-1] cross motion . Service: 5/30/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 6/4/97 for [30-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 5/8/97) for Leave to File Reply to Motion of 3/26/97 and Plaintiff's Request for Interrogatories . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [38-1] motion for Leave to File a response to plaintiff's March 26, 1997, motion and plaintiff's request for interrogatories. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 5/12/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/12/97) to [30-1] cross motion. Reply due: 5/29/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 5/12/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997, Terminated: 5/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/21/97 ) for Leave to File a response to plaintiff's March 26, 1997, motion and plaintiff's request for interrogatories. Response due: 5/8/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [30-1] cross motion reset to 5/12/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997, Terminated: 4/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/1/97) to Extend Time to Respond to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment . (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Supplement by DAVID E. TIPPETT to [30-1] cross motion by DAVID E. TIPPETT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/26/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          REPLY by DAVID E. TIPPETT to response to [28-1] motion to admit missing brief and remand or to supplement plaintiff's motion for a status conference regarding major problems with the certified Administrative Record, [25-1] motion for a status conference [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 3/26/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/14/97 ) to [28-1] motion to admit missing brief and remand or to supplement plaintiff's motion for a status conference regarding major problems with the certified Administrative Record. Reply due: 3/28/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to respond tomotion to admit missing brief and remand, etc. and Response to [28-1] motion to admit missing brief and remand or to supplement plaintiff's motion for a status conference regarding major problems with the certified Administrative Record reset to 3/14/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997, Terminated: 3/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/6/97) to Extend Time to respond tomotion to admit missing brief and remand, etc. [to March 14, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by DAVID E. TIPPETT by leave of the Judge AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Service: 3/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service: 3/3/97) and RESPONSE to [15-1] motion to Dismiss by USA by leave of the Judge AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 4/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: 3/11/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [30-1] cross motion reset to 4/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Order
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for a status conference and Response to [25-1] motion for a status conference reset to 3/14/97 (signed by Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service: 2/18/97) to admit missing brief and remand or to supplement plaintiff's motion for a status conference regarding major problems with the certified Administrative Record AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 3/7/97 (FE) Modified on 03/06/1997
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997, Terminated: 2/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/10/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for a status conference (to March 14, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [25-2] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss and Response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 3/6/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 1/28/97) for a status conference , and to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss (to March 6, 1997). Response due: 2/14/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service : 1/21/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss, etc. , (until March 6, 1997). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to dispositive motion and Response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 28 days after received a copy of so much of the Administrative Record and Protective Order and directing parties the original and copy of the Administrative Record filed on 11/15/96 shall remain under seal until further notice from the Court (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM [SUPPLEMENT} by DAVID E. TIPPETT re: [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment by DAVID E. TIPPETT by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File reply to plaintiff's opposition to a protective order and for copies of investigations (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996, Terminated: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/96) for Leave to File reply to plaintiff's opposition to a protective order and for copies of investigations out of time. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996, Terminated: 12/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service: 12/4/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [to 28 days after plaintiff receives the complete administrative record]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER returning plaintiff's filing for corrections [Rule 15(a)] (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/96 ) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 12/23/96. (HW) Modified on 12/02/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. [filed IN CAMERA] Service: 11/21/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by DAVID E. TIPPETT (Service: 11/16/96) to [10-1] motion for Clarification of Order dated 10/8/96 and for protective order. Reply due: 12/3/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing administrative record under seal by USA. Service: 11/15/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative record filed by USA [IN CAMERA]. Service: 11/15/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Response to [10-1] motion for Clarification of Order dated 10/8/96, and for protective order reset to as soon as possible and set Additional Documents [defendant's Administrative Record to be filed under seal] and WAIVING COPYING REQUIREMENTS for USA (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/31/96) for Clarification of Order dated 10/8/96, and for protective order . Response due: 11/18/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Defendant will file the administrative record as soon as available from the Correction Board. [ Brief deadline to 9/9/99] ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set Notice of Compliance [administrative record] deadline to as soon as available (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/3/96) to Continue stay pending plaintiff's appeal of the decision by the Army Board for Correction of Military Records . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/5/96) to plaintiff's motion to suspend proceedings and for reconsideration of the 6/3/96 order by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez Service: 6/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing defendant to order the official record of this case and file it as soon as possible (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041553. Answer due on 7/29/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?