WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00323-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/4/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $2900000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/15/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 89 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Stipulation
Stipulation by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER, USA of dismissal with prejudice filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 88 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 7/17/02. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 87 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
        Case closed (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 86 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Certified Transcript to Attorney
          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 85 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that as provided for in Rule 54(b), plaintiff shall recover of and from the United States, on count I of the complaint, the sum of $2,200,000.00, plus interest pursuant to the Contract Disputes Act, from January 9, 1996, until paid, with each party to bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 84 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Court Filing
              ORDER approving the Joint Stipulation for Entry of Partial Judgment, filed May 3, 1999, and directing the clerk to enter partial judgment, pursuant to Rule 54(b), as there is no just cause for delay. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 83 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999
                Stipulation by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER, USA for entry of partial judgment. (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 82 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER reset Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 4/7/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 81 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 11:30 a.m. 4/6/99; (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 80 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by telephone, 10:00 a.m. 3/18/99 ; ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 79 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 10:00 a.m. 2/24/99 ; ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 78 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 1/27/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 77 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            AMENDED ORDER set telephone Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 10/5/98 ( Signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 76 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service : 9/16/98 ) for Leave to file supplement to plaintiff's exhibit list and pre-trial memorandum of contentions of fact and law NUNC PRO TUNC . Response due: 10/5/98. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 75 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                AMENDED ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 9/29/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 74 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  SUPPLEMENT by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER re: [43-1] exhibits list by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER, [41-1] memorandum by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/10/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 9/10/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 72 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 8/4/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 71 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m., 7/16/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 70 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 6/9/98. A two day trial concerning the Leek case only is set in Washington, D.C. for October 20-21, 1998 at 9:30 a.m. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/26/1998
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 69 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 5/18/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 67 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998
                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 22, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 68 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER re: Plaintiff's motion for orders authorizing service of subpoenas and requiring appearance of witnesses at trial and on Defendant's motion in limine to exclude irrelevant testimony. Granting in part (with respect to Patricia A. Ferrell and Raymond E. LaBoa), denying in part (with respect to Robert J. Leaverton) [45-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial and requiring the appearance of witnesses at trial. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Oral Argument
                                                  Oral Argument re: [49-1] motion in Limine by USA ( Transcript due 5/22/98 ) (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 4/22/98 for [49-1] motion in Limine. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                      Oral Argument re: [49-1] motion in Limine by USA set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/22/98 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 4/9/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [49-1] motion in Limine. Service: 3/6/98 (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [61-1] motion to Extend Time. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/6/98 for [49-1] motion in Limine. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER re: pretrial conference and trial postponed. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/20/98 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion in limine,(until 3/6/98). (FE) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion in limine and plaintiff's motion for relief. Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/20/98 for [49-1] motion in Limine and Response to [55-1] motion For reconsideration of [44-1] order under Rule 83.2 reset to 2/20/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [56-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion in limine and plaintiff's motion for relief. Service: 1/30/98 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                      RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 1/21/98 ) to [56-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion in limine and plaintiff's motion for relief. Reply due: 2/4/98 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/21/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998, Terminated: 2/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/16/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion in limine and plaintiff's motion for relief [to February 20, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/2/98 (JT) Modified on 01/26/1998
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service by hand : 1/6/98 ) For reconsideration of [44-1] order under Rule 83.2 , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 01/15/1998
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            (Response to motion in limine and) REPLY by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER to response to [45-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial . Service by hand: 1/6/98 (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service by hand: 1/6/98 ) to [49-1] motion in Limine (and reply re: motion for orders authorizing service of subpoenas). Reply due: 1/16/98 (DS) Modified on 01/20/1998
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion In Limine by 1/6/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997, Terminated: 12/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service : 12/15/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion In Limine and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Orders Authorizing Service of Subpoenas Upon Witnesses [to January 6, 1998] Response due: 1/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 1/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Status Conference for 1/20/98 . A pretrial conference for the trial on damages scheduled to begin on March 10, 1998, shall be held in chambers on February 26, 1998 at 10:00a.m. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying [33-1] motion for the entry of partial judgment . Trial rescheduled for for 3/10-12/98 and a Status Conference for 4:00pm, 12/11/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 12/8/97 ) to [45-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. Reply due: 12/17/97 (Included with motion in limine) (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/97 ) in Limine to exclude irrelevant testimony regarding legal issues previously decided by the court, to exclude irrelevant exhibits (and in opposition to motion for authorization of subpoenas). Response due: 12/22/97 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 30, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by USA. Service: 11/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 Exhibit
                                                                                                Exhibit list by USA. Service: 11/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 Witness List
                                                                                                  Witness list by USA. Service: 11/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997, Terminated: 4/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service : 11/21/97 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial Response due: 12/8/97 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying [35-1] motion for Order shortening time to respond to discovery requests and motion for expedited consideration granting [36-1] motion for Protective Order to prevent discovery ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Exhibit
                                                                                                        Exhibit list by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER Service: 11/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Witness List
                                                                                                          Witness list by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER Service: 11/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER Service: 11/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 11/18/97 ) to [36-1] motion for Protective Order to prevent discovery and reply to plaintiff's motion for an order shortening time to respond to discovery. Reply due: 12/5/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/10/97 ) to [33-1] motion for the entry of partial judgment, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/24/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  REPLY by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER to response to [33-1] motion for the entry of partial judgment. Service: 11/12/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/13/97) to [35-1] motion for Order shortening time to respond to discovery requests and motion for expedited consideration. Reply due: 11/28/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/13/97) for Protective Order to prevent discovery Response due: 12/1/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/7/1997, Terminated: 11/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service : 11/3/97 ) for Order shortening time to respond to discovery requests and motion for expedited consideration Response due: 11/20/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997
                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/1/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:30 on 10/30/97. ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 10/30/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997, Terminated: 12/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service : 10/10/97 ) for the entry of partial judgment Response due: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pre-trial brief deadline to 11/21/97. Pretrial Conference for 10:00am, 12/9/97; Trial deadline set on 9:30am, 12/16/97 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                    Trial set at 9:30 on 12/16/97 and 12/17/97. (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER (Errata) re: 8/12/97 Opinion ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Oral Argument - Motion for Summary Judgment, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 22, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER ( Transcript due 6/23/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER rescheduling oral argument at 2:00 on 5/22/97 for [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability ( signed Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER oral argument [hearing] set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/28/97 for [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability (signed Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER to response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability. Service: 1/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 1/10/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/10/97) to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability. Reply due: 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and the complaint, Response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liabilty reset to 1/10/97 and reset Answer deadline to 1/10/97 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 12/5/96) to [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and the complaint. Reply due: 12/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996, Terminated: 12/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/2/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and the complaint (to January 10, 1997). Response due: 12/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment, Response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liabilty reset to 12/10/96 and reset Answer deadline to 12/10/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 10/17/96 ) to [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 10/31/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/15/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [to January 10, 1997]. Response due: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary Judgment and to complaint, Response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of liabilty reset to 10/3/96 and reset Answer deadline to 10/3/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996, Terminated: 9/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/3/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary Judgment and to complaint [to October 3, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 9/4/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 8/9/96) to [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reply due: 8/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service by hand: 8/6/96 ) for Summary Judgment on the issue of liability , together with separate two volume appendix. Response due: 9/3/96. (HW) Modified on 01/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER. Service by hand: 8/6/96. (HW) Modified on 09/06/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996, Terminated: 8/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/5/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to September 4, 1996]. Response due: 8/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [4-1] motion for Leave to File motion for summary judgment in advance of date established by RCFC 56(a) (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/12/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 7/2/96) to [4-1] motion for Leave to File motion for summary judgment in advance of date established by RCFC 56(a). Reply due: 7/15/96 (FE) Modified on 07/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman Service: 7/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for summary judgment and Response to [4-1] motion for Leave to File motion for summary judgment in advance of date established by RCFC 56(a) reset to 7/1/96 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 07/08/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service: 6/25/96 ) to [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996, Terminated: 6/28/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/96) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for summary judgment (to July 1, 1996). Response due: 7/11/96 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996, Terminated: 7/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER (Service BY HAND: 6/10/96) for Leave to File motion for summary judgment in advance of date established by RCFC 56(a) [to as soon as possible]. Response due: 6/24/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER of related case. (94-389 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041578. Answer due on 8/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?