COLLINS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00370-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LAWRENCE COLLINS, JR., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Stuart Levitt
Office COFC
Filed 5/27/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/10/1998
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 96-1002[W. District of Texas]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998
JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint. No costs. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [12-2] defendant's motion for Summary Judgment, and directing the clerk to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. No costs. (Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE of change of address by LAWRENCE COLLINS JR. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of change of address by LAWRENCE COLLINS JR. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/97 ) to Extend Time to November 18, 1997, to reply in support of its motion to dismiss or for judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 12/4/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 11/18/97 (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by LAWRENCE COLLINS JR. Service: 10/19/97. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/97 ) to Dismiss , r in the alternative, for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 11/10/97 (HW) Modified on 10/17/1997
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Statement of Facts
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 10/10/97. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Statement of Facts
                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 10/10/97 (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE and record filed before the Board by USA to [6-1] order Service: 9/11/97 (CDC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/10/97 ) to Extend Time to October 10, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 9/29/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Peter Stuart Levitt Service : 8/4/97 (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER re: defendant will submit the record before the Board, A.S.A.P., etc. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Extend Time to August 25, 1997, to file amended complaint ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by LAWRENCE COLLINS JR. (Answer due 9/12/97) Five copies sent to DOJ. Service: 7/14/97. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997, Terminated: 7/24/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by LAWRENCE COLLINS JR. (Service : 6/23/97 ) to Extend Time to file amended complaint (30 days). Response due: 7/10/97 (AB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                        Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas (San Antonio), case number 96-cv-1002, consisting of 3 bound volumes. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 6/24/97). (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?