VOSS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00372-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID H. VOSS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Wilson Waters +1 630 571 7711 +1 630 571 7755 thomaswaters@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Mary Kelly +1 703 299 3700
Office COFC
Filed 5/27/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $957000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/19/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 15, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Dismiss and the clerk os directed to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 Oral Argument
          Oral Argument re: [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 1/16/01 ) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m., 12/15/00 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 01/03/2001
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER extending the appointment of Judge Wiese as the Issue Judge to resolve the statute of limitations question, with the case to be reassigned to Judge Wiese. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 9/15/97 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 9/3/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                    RESPONSE by DAVID H. VOSS (Service: 8/27/97 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/15/97 (CDC)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/28/97 ) to Dismiss Response due: 8/28/97 (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from Winstar relasted list by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Katherine Mary Kelly Service : 6/24/97 (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                            NOTICE by DAVID H. VOSS of related cases. (90-8 C and related Winstar Cases). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A & B), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043624. Answer due on 7/28/97. (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?