SHERWIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00378-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES T. SHERWIN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Jay Hoffman
Office COFC
Filed 5/29/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/14/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 23, 1999 dismissed [27-1] appeal by CHARLES T. SHERWIN. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [27-1] appeal by CHARLES T. SHERWIN. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5100. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999, Terminated: 6/23/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHARLES T. SHERWIN. Copy to Defendant, Judge Marian Horn and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 047573. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Plaintiff's reply and denying [21-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
          REPLY by CHARLES T. SHERWIN to response to [21-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/15/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/10/99 ) to [21-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Defendant's response to [21-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order reset to 3/10/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER Response to [21-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order reset to 3/3/99 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/23/1999, Terminated: 4/7/1999 Terminated:
                  MOTION by CHARLES T. SHERWIN (Service : 1/16/99 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [20-1] judgment order . (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant ot Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999
                      Case closed (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [9-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint with prejudice. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998 Memorandum
                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by CHARLES T. SHERWIN. Service: 2/23/98 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by CHARLES T. SHERWIN to [14-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 11/18/97 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response and Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief by leave of the court. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                RESPONSE by USA to request from the Chambers of Judge Horn re: Defendant's position on oral argument. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/20/98 (JT) Modified on 03/17/1998
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: 11/18/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 11/4/97 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Administrative Record
                                    Administrative record (Vols. I and II) filed by USA Service: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 notice of filing
                                      Notice of filing administrative record by USA Service: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record, denying [8-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by CHARLES T. SHERWIN (Service: 10/18/97 ) to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 11/4/97 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/97 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due: 11/14/97 (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997, Terminated: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/97 ) for Leave to File the administrative record , and for Waiver of Duplication (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to October 14, 1997, to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 10/14/97 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997, Terminated: 9/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/9/97 ) to Extend Time to October 14, 1997, to respond to the complaint. Response due: 9/26/97 (CDC)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to September 11, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 9/11/97 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997, Terminated: 7/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/22/97 ) to Extend Time to September 11, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 8/8/97 (CDC)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Jay Hoffman. Service : 6/10/97 (AB)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043622. Answer due on 7/28/97. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE) Modified on 06/02/1997
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?