PRIDE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00394-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo VASILIKI PRIDE, Plaintiff

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy James Ferrante +1 703 644 2009 kingand@erols.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Randall Gottlieb
Office COFC
Filed 6/2/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County
Terminated 12/16/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 Stipulation
Stipulation by VASILIKI PRIDE, USA concerning amount due to plaintiff. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 60 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [59-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulation by 12/17/98 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 59 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/4/1998, Terminated: 12/2/1998 Terminated:
      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/30/98 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulation , (until December 17, 1998). Response due: 12/31/98. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 58 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulation of amount due. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 11/30/98 for the parties to file their joint stipulation concerning the amount due Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998
          Status Conference held (no reporter requested) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 3:30 p.m., 11/10/98. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 56 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 11/10/1998 Terminated:
              MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 10/30/98 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulation of amount due , (until November 20, 1998). Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 55 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [54-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 10/30/98 for the parties to file a joint stipulation of the amount due Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998, Terminated: 10/21/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 10/14/98 ) to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation , (until October 30, 1998). Response due: 11/16/98. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 53 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to file joint stipulation. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 10/16/98 for the parties to file the joint stipulation concerning the amount due to Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998, Terminated: 9/22/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/98 ) to Extend Time to file joint stipulation [until October 16, 1998.] Response due: 10/5/98 (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 50 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service: 9/3/98) to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation of the amount due her as a result of the Court's May 18, 1998, opinion , (until September 18, 1998). Response due: 10/5/98. (FE) Modified on 09/15/1998
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation of the amount. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/18/98 for the filing of the joint stipulation concerning the amount due to Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [48-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation re: amount due to plaintiff (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998, Terminated: 8/24/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/98 ) to Extend Time to file a joint stipulation re: amount due to plaintiff [until 9/8/98]. (AB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 47 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file joint stipulation , (until August 21, 1998). (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 46 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service: 7/9/98) to Extend Time within which to file a joint stipulation of the amount due, etc. , (until July 24, 1998). (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 45 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [44-1] motion to Extend Time to file stipulation for amount due set Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/10/98 ( Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 44 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998, Terminated: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 6/26/98 ) to Extend Time to file stipulation for amount due [until July 10, 1998] Response due: 7/13/98 (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 43 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to file stipulation. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/29/98 for the parties to file a joint stipulation. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 42 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998, Terminated: 6/18/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/18/98 ) to Extend Time to file stipulation [until 6/29/98]. (AB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 41 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Court Filing
                                            PUBLISHED DECISION denying [28-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [6-1] motion to Dismiss, granting [8-1] cross motion, and directing parties to file a stipulation concerning the amount due plaintiff by 6/18/98 , with the Clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff, without further order of the court, upon receipt of the stipulation. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 40 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/1/98 ) to [36-1] motion to file supplemental authorities. (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 39 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [38-1] motion for Leave to File response to plaintiffs' second motion to file supplemental authorities. ( Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998, Terminated: 5/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/1/98 ) for Leave to File response to plaintiffs' second motion to file supplemental authorities. Response due: 5/18/98 (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [36-1] motion to file supplemental authorities. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 23, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998, Terminated: 4/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 4/24/98 ) to file supplemental authorities. Response due: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Oral Argument
                                                          Oral Argument re: [28-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 5/26/98 ) (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Withdraw Contingent Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1631. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998, Terminated: 4/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 3/31/98 ) for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. (Supplement Authority included) Response due: 4/17/98 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [28-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998, Terminated: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 3/23/98 ) to Withdraw Contingent Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1631. (Included with motion for leave to amend complaint) Response due: 4/9/98 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service: 3/23/98) to [28-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 4/9/98. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/98) to Dismiss , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/13/98. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by VASILIKI PRIDE (Answer due 39/98 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 2/12/98 (CDC) Modified on 03/12/1998
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Leave to File amended complaint ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998, Terminated: 2/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 2/12/98 ) for Leave to File amended complaint . Response due: 3/2/98. (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/17/98 for plaintiff to amend her complaint , oral argument set for 2:30 p.m., 4/23/98 for [8-1] cross motion and [6-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 1/28/98 ) for Oral Argument Response due: 2/17/98 (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 1/20/1998 Response
                                                                                    SUR-REPLY by USA to [14-1] motion reply filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/15/98 (DS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 2:30 p.m., 1/13/98. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY by VASILIKI PRIDE to sur-reply in opposition to plaintiff's contingent motion to amend the complaint and transfer. Service: 12/19/97 (CDC)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contingent Motion to Amend the Complaint. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998, Terminated: 12/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 12/19/97 ) for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contingent Motion to Amend the Complaint. Response due: 1/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY by USA to Reply to response to [14-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint and transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631; reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Service: 11/24/97. (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File a sur-reply. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997, Terminated: 12/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/24/97 ) for Leave to File a sur-reply. Response due: 12/11/97 (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 1/20/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY by VASILIKI PRIDE to response to [8-1] cross motion (and motion to amend complaint and transfer) filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 11/13/97 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 11/13/97 ) to Amend [1-1] complaint and transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631; reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 12/1/97. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/14/97 for [8-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: 11/18/1997, Terminated: 11/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 11/5/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment (to November 14, 1997). (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/7/97 for [8-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/9/1997, Terminated: 10/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by VASILIKI PRIDE (Service : 10/3/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until 11/7/97). Response due: 10/6/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/1/97 ) to [8-1] cross motion Reply due: 10/20/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION for summary judgment by VASILIKI PRIDE ( Service: 9/15/97 ) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. Response due: 10/16/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by VASILIKI PRIDE Service: 9/15/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [8-1] cross motion reset to 10/16/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/15/97) to Dismiss . Response due: 9/15/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to August 15, 1997, to file a motion or answer to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 8/15/97 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997, Terminated: 8/11/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/1/97 ) to Extend Time to August 15, 1997, to file a motion or answer to the Complaint. Response due: 8/19/97 (CDC) Modified on 08/04/1997
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Craig Randall Gottlieb. Service : 6/16/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043653. Answer due on 8/1/97. (FE) Modified on 06/04/1997
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?