POWELL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00404-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SAMUEL S. POWELL, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/6/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $9000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/26/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated August 27, 1998, affirmed [23-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998
    CAFC Case Number Re: [22-1] appeal by SAMUEL S. POWELL. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5062. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by SAMUEL S. POWELL. Copy to Defendant, Judge Bruggink and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 044913. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 1/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [19-1] motion for Rule 11 Sanctions ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 12/17/1997 Terminated:
          MOTION by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service : 12/10/97 ) for Rule 11 Sanctions [included with Notice of Defendant's Perjury] Response due: 12/29/97 (JT) Modified on 01/05/1998
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 12/17/1997 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of perjury by SAMUEL S. POWELL Service: 12/10/97 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 1/30/1998 Judgment*
              JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint on the ground that it is barred by operation of the principle of res judicata (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 Terminated Case
                Case closed (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                  PUBLISHED DECISION granting defendant's [8-1] motion to Dismiss, and directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 10/28/97 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 10/17/97 (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service: 10/2/97 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 10/20/97 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to November 2, 1997, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 11/3/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997, Terminated: 9/24/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service : 9/19/97 ) to Extend Time to November 2, 1997, to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. Response due: 10/6/97 (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/3/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997, Terminated: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service : 8/28/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until October 3, 1997). Response due: 9/15/97 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 Court Filing
                                  ORDER denying [9-1] motion For reconsideration of [5-2] order under Rule 83.2 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997, Terminated: 8/19/1997 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service : 8/12/97 ) For reconsideration of [5-2] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/18/97 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 9/18/97. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER to the extent plaintiff's "amendment to motion against enlargement of time" is intended as a motion for sanctions, it is denied. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by SAMUEL S. POWELL (Service: 8/8/97 ) to [4-1] motion to Extend Time to August 19, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Reply due: 8/22/97 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to August 19, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. reset Answer deadline to 8/19/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997, Terminated: 8/5/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/1/97 ) to Extend Time to August 19, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 8/19/97 (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla. Service : 6/20/97 (AB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997
                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043677. Answer due on 8/5/97. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997
                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?