RICHEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00478-RWG
District Judge Reginald W. Gibson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEPHEN W. RICHEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack E. Carter
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Peachey
Office COFC
Filed 7/15/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 5/27/2003
Origin 1
Reopened 5/2/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003
Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 88 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 87 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED ORDER directing the clerk to vacate the judgmnet of November 14, 2001 and enter judgment dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 86 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 CAFC Mandate Reversing
        MANDATE of CAFC reversing [78] Published Decision, and remading case. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Terminated:
          CAFC Case Number Re: [85-1] appeal by USA. CAFC NUMBER: 02-5058. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 85 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002, Terminated: 5/2/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copy to STEPHEN W. RICHEY, Senior Judge Reginald Gibson and to CAFC. Fee Not required. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 84 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Certified Transcript to Attorney
              CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT,dated November 16, 2001, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 83 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that: 1) Plaintiff is hereby reinstated to active duty to his former position of Captain in the Regular Army, with his consent, beginning April 1, 1996, the date of his honorable discharge; 2) Plaintiff shall receive all attendant back pay and benefits consistent with hsi reinstatement for the period April 1, 1996 to the date of the Published Opinion, less applicable set-offs. 3) Plaintiff shall receive any and all additional relief as determined by the Secretary of the Army and to which plaintiff is entitled, consistent with the opinion of July 18, 2001, and as required by law and regulations. 4) Plaintiff shall receive of and from the United States an after-tax payment in the amount of $113,638.18. Reasonable costs shall be assessed against defendant in favor of plaintiff. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 5/27/2003 (lld, ). [VACATED BY ORDER OF 05/21/03]
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001
                  Case closed (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 82 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA to [78-1] opinion filed on July 18, 2001, stating that the ABCMR has completed its review of the information provided by plaintiff and has determined that plaintiff is entitled to an after-tax payment in the amount of $113,638.18.Service: 10/19/01 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 81 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [80-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to 07/18/01 Opinion by 10/19/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 80 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001, Terminated: 9/6/2001 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                        MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 8/31/01) to Extend Time to respond to 07/18/01 Opinion until 10/19/01. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 79 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Peachey. Service : 9/4/01 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 78 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                            PUBLISHED DECISION denying [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [23-1] cross motion; directing ABCMR to determine the dollar amount of plaintiff's entitlement and file said information within 45 days of the date of this opinion (9/4/01) ; and absent any objections by the parties within 15 days thereof, directing the Clerk to forthwith enter judgment accordingly . Costs to plaintiff. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 77 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 ~Notice (other)
                              "Special Selection Board (SSB) decisions on Captain Richey's application for promotion" by USA. Service: 6/29/01. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 76 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of FILING "The full and complete written text of each of the four Special Selection Board (SSB) decisions on Captain Richey's application for promotion" by USA. Service: 6/29/01. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 75 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Defendant's written text of Board Decisions on Capt. Richey's application for promotion and Memorandum of Record are due on 6/29/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 74 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                    Letter dated June 14, 2001 re: exhibit to the Army Board for Correction of Military Records (ABCMR) by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 73 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER directing Defendant to file missing page of submission filed 4/20/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 72 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Decision by AgencyCourt Filing
                                        Decision on remand by the Army Board for the Correction of Military Records. Copy to parties and to Judge. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 71 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re-remanding this matter back to the ABCMR, with defendant's response to be filed by 4/23/01 . ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties and certified copy of this order and opinion of August 26, 1999, forwarded to the ABCMR. (DS) Modified on 02/26/2001
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 70 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 11/14/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                            RESPONSE [to defendant's memorandum] by STEPHEN W. RICHEY to [69-2] order, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/12/01. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 69 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER directing Plaintiff to file reply re: Memorandum of Law by 1/12/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 68 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by USA to [67-1] memorandum by STEPHEN W. RICHEY. Service: 12/11/00 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Deadline updated; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/15/00 for plaintiff's reply to response to memorandum of law (3 calendar days from receipt of defendant's response which was served by Federal Express on 12/11/00) (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Memorandum
                                                    MEMORANDUM of law filed by STEPHEN W. RICHEY [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER filing by leave Plaintiff's memorandum of law. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (Note: Copy of memorandum attached to defendant's copy of this order and also faxed to defendant by chambers) (JT) Modified on 12/12/2000
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 16, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER set Plaintiff's brief deadline to 11/27/00 ; Defendant will file its response within 10 calendar days of receipt of Plaintiff's brief; Plaintiff may file a reply and must do so within 3 calendar days of receipt of Defendant's response. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Status Conference
                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 11/21/00 ) (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 11/16/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                STATUS REPORT (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA Service: 10/20/00. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Deadline updated reset Status Report deadline to 11/27/00 (30 days) (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                      Deadline updated; set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 10/18/00. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Status Report
                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/21/00 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                          Deadline updated; set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 9/20/00. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Status Report
                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/21/00 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Curtis Griffin Service : 7/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                Deadline updated; set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 8/21/00. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA Service: 6/23/00 (FE) Modified on 06/26/2000
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000
                                                                                    Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 7/26/00 (30 days) (FE) Modified on 06/26/2000
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/22/00. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000
                                                                                        Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 6/21/00 . (FE) Modified on 06/26/2000
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by STEPHEN W. RICHEY re: continuing jurisdiction in this court filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/28/00 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Plaintiff shall file his brief setting forth his positions on the issue of this court's retention of jurisdiction forthwith. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/25/00. (FE) Modified on 04/27/2000
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 5/26/00 . (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                  BRIEF by USA re: jurisdiction after final agency decision in response to remand. Service: 4/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 13, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                      BRIEF by USA re: special selection board process. Service: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/22/00. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                          Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 4/24/00 . (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER staying the current matter until the Army's special selection boards have had a reasonable time to render a decision. Set deadline of 4/3/00 for Defendant to file a memorandum and set deadline of 4/12/00 for the parties to file briefs re: this court's jurisdiction. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/12/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY (Service : 3/1/00 ) to continue the status conference. (JT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER reset telephonic Status Conference for 1:30 p.m., 3/13/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 3/13/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 3/24/00. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Defendant's status report received by the Clerk's Office on 1/27/00, is hereby filed by leave of the Judge because it was untimely (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 3/1/00 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 12/23/99 (AB)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999
                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 1/24/00 (AB)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; (30 days) Status Report deadline to 12/29/99 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 11/29/99. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; set Defendant's status report deadline to 10/28/99. (30 days) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999
                                                                                                                                                Administrative Record returned to defendant's attorney pursuant to Rule 60.1. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED DECISION Remanding this case to the U.S. Army Board for Correction of Military Records for a determination of factual findings and conclusions of law as directed in this opinion; staying proceedings until March 1, 2000; directing defendant to file a status report every 30 days, with the first status report due September 27, 1999; and directing defendant to submit all new findings of fact and conclusions of law by March 1, 2000. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ). Copy to parties and certified copy to ABCMR. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 13, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: the court will schedule oral argument thereon prior to issuing its decision if it is deemed necessary. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/12/98 ) (LD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [32-1] motion to reschedule telephone conference set for June 29, 1998, at 2:00 p.m. Reset telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 7/13/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998, Terminated: 6/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY (Service : 6/11/98 ) to reschedule telephone conference set for June 29, 1998, at 2:00 p.m. [to July 13, 1998]. Response due: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 6/29/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by STEPHEN W. RICHEY to response to [23-1] cross motion. Service: 6/11/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Plaintiffs' reply to response to motion reset to 6/12/98 for [23-1] cross motion. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [24-1] statement facts by STEPHEN W. RICHEY. Service: 5/4/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/4/98 ) to [23-1] cross motion. Reply due: 5/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [25-1] motion to supplement administrative record, granting [25-2] motion for Leave to File amended brief out of time. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998, Terminated: 4/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY (Service : 3/31/98 ) to supplement administrative record , and for Leave to File amended brief out of time . Response due: 4/17/98 (Supplements attached to motion) (DS) Modified on 04/07/1998
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERSTATEMENT OF FACTS filed by STEPHEN W. RICHEY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/1/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY ( Service: 4/1/98 ) and AMENDED RESPONSE to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/4/98 (JT) Modified on 04/06/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [23-1] cross motion reset to 5/4/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Amend the Briefing Schedule. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/23/98 for Plaintiff to withdraw his 2/19/98 submission and file a corrected submission. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998, Terminated: 3/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/98 ) to Amend the Briefing Schedule. Response due: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNTERSTATEMENT OF FACTS filed by STEPHEN W. RICHEY. Service: 2/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by STEPHEN W. RICHEY. Service: 2/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY ( Service: 2/19/98 ) and RESPONSE to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 3/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the filing of several Plaintiff documents by leave of the Judge and further directing the plaintiff to submit corrected proofs of service.( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [18-1] cross motion reset to 3/23/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER returning, unfiled, plaintiff's cross-motion, etc. for correction of defects (failure to comply with Rule 56.1(b)(1) and (2); and directing plaintiff to file his Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment by 2/18/98 ; with defendant's time to respond to run from the date of re-service. ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time file responsive pleadings to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 2/2/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997, Terminated: 12/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by STEPHEN W. RICHEY (Service : 12/17/97 ) to Extend Time file responsive pleadings to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [to January 31, 1998] 1/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 12/18/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative record filed by USA, filed pursuant to 11/4/97 order. Service: 11/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record of the ABCMR ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 10/31/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997, Terminated: 11/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/31/97 ) for Leave to File the administrative record of the ABCMR . Response due: 11/17/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/31/97 ) for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 12/1/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to October 31, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. No further enlargements. reset Answer deadline to 10/31/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997, Terminated: 10/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/97 ) to Extend Time to October 31, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to October 15, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. r Answer deadline to 10/15/97 ( signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997, Terminated: 9/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/9/97 ) to Extend Time to October 15, 1997, to respond to the Complaint. Response due: 9/26/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ethan Steinbuch Service : 8/7/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043857. Answer due on 9/15/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?