WETSEL-OVIATT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00487-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/17/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $138000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/19/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WETSEL-OVIATT and USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 7/17/02. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Amended Answer to Complaint
        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by USA amends [6-1] answer by USA. Service: 3/27/98 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Amend [6-1] answer. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER set Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 4/22/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 4/9/98 ) to [15-1] motion to Amend [6-1] answer. Reply due: 4/23/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and production of documents. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/27/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998, Terminated: 4/24/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/98 ) to Amend [6-1] answer Response due: 4/13/98 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] motion to Amend [6-1] answer set to 4/13/98 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998, Terminated: 3/30/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/25/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and production of documents [to March 27, 1998]. Response due: 4/13/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/25/98 for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/23/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests. (to March 25, 1998) (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 2/4/98 ) to [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel. Reply due: 2/23/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/27/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's motion to compel [to May 27, 1998]. Response due: 2/13/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/13/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service by hand: 1/13/98 ) to Compel responses to first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents. Response due: 1/27/98 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/97 ) for Leave to File Its Response Out of Time to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to its First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Out of Time. Response due: 1/5/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service : 11/14/97 ) to Compel responses to its first set of interrogatories, etc. Response due: 12/1/97 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Answer
                                      ANSWER (and affirmative) to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/19/97 ( JPSR due 11/6/97 ). (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 9/19/97 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997, Terminated: 9/17/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/15/97) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 9/19/97. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                                            NOTICE by WETSEL-OVIATT of related cases. (94-389 C and 96-323 C). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043864. Answer due on 9/15/97. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?