ST. MATTHEW v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00569-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo St. Matthew Publishing, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. C. Joyce +1 918 585 2751
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/14/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/16/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 87 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that (1) for the years beginning June 1, 1979 and 1980, plaintiff is not an organization desribed in 26 U.S.C. Section 501(a), not is plaintiff an organization described in 26 U.S.C. Section 170(c)(2) and, to that extent, plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, and judgment is entered in defendant's favor; and (2) beginning June 1, 1981, plaintiff is an organization described in 26 U.S.C. Section 501(c)(3) which is exempt from tax under 26 U.S.C. Section 501(a), and an organization described in 26 U.S.C. Section 170(c)(2) and, to that extent, judgment is entered against defendant and in favor of plaintiff, and plaintiff's complaint for a declaration is granted. Each party shall bear its own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 86 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Stipulation
      Stipulation by ST. MATTHEW, USA for entry of judgment (CDC)
        LREF
        Blank 85 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 5/15/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 84 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000 Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/15/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 83 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 3/16/00 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 82 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/15/00. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 81 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER staying the case until 2/15/00 and set joint Status Report deadline to 2/15/00. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 80 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/3/99. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 79 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER set discovery deadline to 11/1/99 and set dispositive motion filing deadline to 11/15/99 or joint status report deadline to 11/15/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 78 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by ST. MATTHEW to response to [53-1] motion to sanction W.C. Rapp, David Gustafson and Mildred L. Siedman pursuant to RCFC 11. Service: 5/7/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 77 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by ST. MATTHEW to response to [46-1] motion to compel Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses to provide complete answers to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition questions, [47-1] motion for Sanctions. Service: 5/7/99 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 76 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 75 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/30/99 ) to [47-1] motion for Sanctions, [46-1] motion to compel Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses to provide complete answers to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition questions. Reply due: 5/14/99 (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 74 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/27/99 ) to [53-1] motion to sanction W.C. Rapp, David Gustafson and Mildred L. Siedman pursuant to RCFC 11. Reply due: 5/10/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 73 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [45-1] motion For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2 and vacating the Order of 1/19/99. Defendant's response to [53-1] motion to sanction, [47-1] motion for sanctions and [46-1] motion to compel reset to 5/3/99. Set joint status report deadline to 5/3/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/21/1999
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 72 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Status Report
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/9/99. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 71 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [69-1] motion for Leave to file a corrected page. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 70 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Milton R. McElrath by ST. MATTHEW Re: [64-1] motion reply by ST. MATTHEW. Service 3/23/99 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999, Terminated: 3/26/1999 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 3/22/99) for Leave to file a corrected page . Response due: 4/8/99. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW to [63-2] order. Deadline set in [63-2] Order. Service: 3/19/99. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [45-1] motion For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2. Defendant shall take the deposition of Mr. Joyce by 4/2/99. Set joint status report deadline to 4/9/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [65-1] motion for Leave to file corrected page (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999, Terminated: 3/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/12/99 ) for Leave to file corrected page , page included. Response due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                  REPLY by ST. MATTHEW to response to [45-1] motion For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/10/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER filing by leave of the Court Plaintiff's reply to response to motion to reconsider and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/26/99 for Plaintiff to correct the defect of their filing (original affidavit). ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Filing Corrected Certificate of Service by USA. Service: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/3/99 ) to [45-1] motion For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 17, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Stay . Further defendant shall Respond to [45-1] motion For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2 by 3/3/99 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999
                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/19/99 ) (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW to [48-2] order. Service: 2/12/99. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE of filing corrected "Certificate of Service" by ST. MATTHEW. Service: 2/3/99. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 2/17/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/10/99 ) to Strike five procedural motions etc., or, in the alternative to Extend Time within which to respond to those motions , (until 30 days after filing of an order acting on plaintiff's motion to reconsider). Response due: 3/1/99. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 2:00 p.m. 2/17/99, in Court of Federal Claims, 717 Madison Place, N.W., Washington, D.C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : ) to sanction W.C. Rapp, David Gustafson and Mildred L. Siedman pursuant to RCFC 11. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER filing by leave of the court Plaintiff's motion to sanction W.C. Rapp, David Gustafson and Mildred L. Siedman. Plaintiff is to correct the defect (date certificate of service) by 2/22/99. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              REPLY by ST. MATTHEW to response to [49-1] motion to sanction W.C. Rapp and David Gustafson pursuant to RCFC11. Service: 2/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/3/99 ) to [49-1] motion to sanction W.C. Rapp and David Gustafson pursuant to RCFC11. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/16/99 (JT) Modified on 02/09/1999
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                  MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 1/27/99 ) to sanction W.C. Rapp and David Gustafson pursuant to RCFC11. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Plaintiff's motion to sanction W.C. Rapp and David Gustafson is to be filed by leave of the court. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/22/99 for Plaintiff to correct the defect (original affidavit) of their motion to sanction. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                      MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 2/3/99 ) for Sanctions. (Separate Exhibit A) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                        MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 2/3/99 ) to compel Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses to provide complete answers to Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition questions. (Separate Exhibit A) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/22/99 (JT) Modified on 02/09/1999
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999, Terminated: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 1/27/99 ) For reconsideration of [42-2] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/20/99 ) to [43-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 2/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999, Terminated: 2/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 1/20/99 ) to Stay . Response due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER re: (1) For the reasons set out in this order and in the 12/4/98 order, the court orders the disqualification of Mr. Joyce as counsel for plaintiff in this case; and (2) Plaintiff shall advise the court, consistent with the requirements of Rule 81(d)(4) of the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims, of its selection of another representative by 1/29/99 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/11/1999
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW to [37-2] order. Service: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Plaintiff's response to Court's Order of 12/4/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999, Terminated: 1/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 12/28/98 ) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Plaintiff's response to Court's Order of 12/4/98. Response due: 1/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [37-2] order. Service: 12/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER deferring a ruling of Defendant's motion to disqualify Mr. Joyce until each party sets out in detail the facts it would solicit or present via Mr. Joyce's testimony. Set the parties summary deadline to 12/21/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery, granting [35-2] motion to Extend Time to file status report Discovery deadline to 3/31/99 , Status Report deadline to 4/15/99 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998, Terminated: 11/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/98 ) to Extend Time to complete discovery , (until March 31, 1999) and to Extend Time to file status report , (until April 15, 1999). Response due: 12/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion to disqualify Plaintiff's attorney of record. Service: 11/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW (Service: 10/28/98 ) to [32-1] motion to disqualify Plaintiff's attorney of record. Reply due: 11/9/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/16/98 ) to disqualify Plaintiff's attorney of record. Response due: 11/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Reset Plaintiff's response to Defendant's first set of interrogatories and request for admissions deadline to 9/15/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998, Terminated: 8/24/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 8/20/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Admission [until 9/15/98]. (AB)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to complete Discovery and to file a joint status report or dispositive motions. Reset Discovery deadline to 11/30/98 and reset Joint Status Report or dispositive motions filing deadline to 12/14/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998, Terminated: 7/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION (Service: 7/24/98) to Extend Time to complete Discovery until 11/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part (in-person deposition of two government officials involved in preparing the Technical Advice Memorandum), denying in part [23-1] motion to Amend [22-1] order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY by ST. MATTHEW to response to [23-1] motion to Amend [22-1] order. Service: 7/15/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/14/98 ) to [23-1] motion to Amend [22-1] order. Reply due: 7/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998, Terminated: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 7/13/98 ) to Amend [22-1] order. Response due: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [23-1] motion to Amend [22-1] order reset to 7/30/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (pursuant to paragraph 3 of the June 16, 1998 Order) by USA to [22-1] order. Service: 6/10/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [19-1] motion for Protective Order, reset Discovery deadline to 8/31/98 , reset Motion Filing deadline to 9/15/98 , reset Status Report deadline to 9/15/98 ( Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. ). Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [19-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW (Service: 5/6/98 ) to [19-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 5/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/98 ) for Protective Order. Response due: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER denying plaintiff's requests that the court (1) declare the FAD void and (2) order the I.R.S. to provide appellate review; directing parties to complete discovery by 7/27/98; file a joint status report by 8/11/98; and file any dispositive motions by 8/11/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by ST. MATTHEW to [16-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: [13-3] order. Service: 3/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; set Brief deadline to 4/2/98 re: reply to memorandum in response to order of February 6, 1998. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE [brief on jurisdiction] by ST. MATTHEW pursuant to [13-3] order. Service: 2/20/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 4, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing plaintiff to file a brief on jurisidiction by 3/6/98 ; defendant to respond 28 days after filing; and plaintiff to reply 10 days after filing of defendant's response. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/6/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1998, Entered: 1/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference rescheduled for 2:00 p.m. on 2/4/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER reset Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 2/4/98. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Status Conference for 2:00pm, 1/29/98 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE [appendix to JPSR] by ST. MATTHEW and USA to [9-2] order. Service: 1/16/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/20/98 for the parties to file their appendix to the Joint Preliminary Status Report. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 12/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion to defer filing of administrative record, denying [7-2] motion for Leave to File appendix to joint preliminary status report exceeding 50 pages in length. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 12/12/97 , administrative record to be filed by 12/12/97 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997, Terminated: 11/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ST. MATTHEW (Service : 11/20/97 ) to defer filing of administrative record , or, in the alternative, for Leave to File appendix to joint preliminary status report exceeding 50 pages in length. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: special procedures ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service : 10/14/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 10/14/97 ( JPSR due 12/1/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044039. Answer due on 10/14/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?