SOLOMON, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-vv-00310-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ISAIAH JEREMIAH SOLOMON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel H. Paavola +1 410 224 6563 +1 410 841 5328 paavola@verizon.net
No Logo LOLITA S. SOLOMON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel H. Paavola +1 410 224 6563 +1 410 841 5328 paavola@verizon.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 5/31/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/6/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Order
      ORDER dismissing the petition with prejudice pursuant to Vaccine rule 21. ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Order
        ORDER set Additional Documents [accurate address for petitioner] due: 9/23/96 for ISAIAH JEREMIAH SOLOMON (signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
          NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Petition
            PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 5) by LOLITA S. SOLOMON, personal and individually and as legal representative of the estate of ISAIAH JEREMIAH SOLOMON. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041570, Vac. Date: 6/1/94 (Respondent's report due 8/29/96). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Set/Clear Flags
              **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 103 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?