WEDDLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00034-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/16/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 4/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5135'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 82 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [80] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 81 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 05-5135 for [80] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 80 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 063021. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 79 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to RCFC 41(b). (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 78 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Court Filing
          ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT RULES AND ORDERS. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing plaintiff's action with prejudice pursuant to RCFC 41(b). Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 77 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 3/11/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 76 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
              ORDER granting Plaintiffs Motion for an enlargement of time [75] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. Response due no later than Friday January 28, 2005. (eph, )
                LREF
                Blank 75 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004, Terminated: 1/3/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Enlargement of Time by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE.Service: 12/20/04. Response due by 1/6/2005. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 74 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER: [73] Dft's Motion is GRANTED IN PART and discovery in this matter is stayed pending the court's resolution of dft's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski for Juge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 73 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004, Terminated: 11/30/2004 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Protective Order or, in the Alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery by USA.Service: 11/24/2004. Response due by 12/13/2004. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 72 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [71] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file his response to dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. Pltf shall file his response no later than 1/21/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 71 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2004 Terminated:
                        UNOPPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File, Motion for Enlargement of Time to File His Response to Dft's Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, and to Amend Scheduling Order, by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE.Service: 11/8/2004. Response due by 11/26/2004. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 70 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 10/25/04.(jat, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 69 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Statement of Facts
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 10/22/04.(jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (together with separately bound appendix) by USA.Service: 10/22/2004. Response due by 11/22/2004 (hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 67 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION to Amend the Unfiled Motion for Remand, for Extension of Time to File Dft's Response to [65] Pltf's MOTION for Remand, until 4/16/2004, and Reply to Dft's Response to [65] Pltf's Motion for Remand, until 5/14/2004, by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE.Service: 3/12/2004. Response due by 3/29/2004. (jcp, ) Modified on 3/19/2004 to add language about the motion to amend the unfiled motion to remand (jcp, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 66 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA Service: 2/24/2004.(lg1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 65 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Remand With Separate Appendix by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 2/12/2004. Amended Proof of Service: 3/12/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004.(jcp, ) Modified on 3/16/2004 (jcp, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 64 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [63] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time until Friday, 2/13/2004, within which to file his "Motion for Remand, Separate Statement of Facts, Separate Affidavit in Support of Motion for Remand, Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Motion for Leave to Supplement the Administrative Record with Additional Medical Records, and to File Additional Administrative Regulations, and Supplementary Application to the BCNR (DD Form 149) with Motion for Remand. Motions as contemplated by pltf may be filed by Friday, 2/13/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 63 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004, Terminated: 1/16/2004 Terminated:
                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Pltf's Motion for Remand and Pltf's Motion to Amend the August 21, 2003 Scheduling Order by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE.Service: 1/5/2004. Response due by 1/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [61] Dft's Motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record Under Seal. The Administrative Record filed on 10/7/2003 shall be placed under seal. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 61 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003, Terminated: 11/6/2003 Terminated:
                                            NOTICE OF FILING and MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Administrative Record (23 Volumes) by USA.Service: 10/7/03. Response due by 10/24/2003. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 60 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Administrative Record
                                              ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in 23 Separately Bound Volumes by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 59 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                ORDER: Dft shall file by Tuesday, 10/7/2003 the original and one copy of the Administrative Record, after which pltf may file by Thursday, 1/8/2004 either a moton for judgment upon the Administrative Record pursuant to RCFC 56.1 or a motion to remand the proceedings. Further, pltf's [52] Motions filed on April 22, 2003 are DEEMED TO BE MOOT. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due 10/7/2003. Motion(s) due by 1/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Sinclair Groat for UNITED STATES. Service: 7/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Notice of Change of AddressCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address for Plaintiff by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block for all further proceedings. Judge James F. Merow no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File unopposed motion for enlargement of time for continuation of stay of proceedings, etc. by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE.Service: 4/18/03. Response due by 5/5/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER; Parties' Status Report due 7/17/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Amended Document
                                                                    AMENDED STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 2/11/03. (lrd)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Status Report
                                                                      STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 2/6/03. (lrd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION to Stay proceedings, by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE, pending action by the Board for Correction of Naval Records(BCNR). Service: 2/6/03. (lrd)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time, granting [45] Motion for Leave to File motion to stay, granting [46] Motion for Leave to File amended status report. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 2/11/03 ) for Leave to File Amended Status Report. Response due: 2/28/03 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 2/5/03 ) for Leave to File motion for continuation of stay of proceedings. Response due: 2/24/03 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 3/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 2/5/03 ) to Extend Time for continuation of stay. Response due: 2/24/03 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Status Report
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT filed by USA. Service: 8/8/02 (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT filed by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 8/5/02 (DS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to file motion for continuation of stay of proceedings, granting [40-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 8/5/02) to continue stay of proceedings pending action by the Board for Correction of Naval Records. (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002, Terminated: 8/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 8/5/02) for Leave to file motion for continuation of stay of proceedings . (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Leave to file the attached Motion to Stay proceedings Status Report deadline to 8/12/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002, Terminated: 2/6/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 2/4/02) for Leave to file the attached Motion to Stay proceedings until 7/25/02. Response due: 2/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [33-1] motion to continue Stay of proceedings to allow the Board for Correction of Naval Records to complete its administrative proceedings Joint or separate Status Report is due on 2/4/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001, Terminated: 8/6/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 8/2/01) to continue Stay of proceedings to allow the Board for Correction of Naval Records to complete its administrative proceedings until 1/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/20/01. (LTD) Modified on 08/07/2001
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                          MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 8/2/01 ) for Leave to file the attached motion for continuance of proceedings and plantiff's status report . Response due: 8/20/01 (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER re: (1) As provided by the Orders filed on May 20, 1997 and August 2, 2000, proceedings shall remain suspended to await a decision by the Borad for the Correction of Naval Records on plaintiff's renewed application for relief; (2) Within 30 days following a Decision by the cited Board, the parties shall file a Status Report(s), etc.,; (3) Absent a decision by the cited Board on or before July 25, 2001, the Board is requested to notify the parties as to the amount of additional time estimated to be needed to reach a decision and an appropriate Status Report(s) providing information, shall be filed by the parties by 8/9/01, etc.; (4) Any Status Report(s) filed prusuant to (3), shall also be set forth a position(s) as to whether the suspension of proceedings in this matter should continue;, and (5) A copy of this suspension order shall be provided by the parties to the Board for Correction of Naval Records ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                              MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 1/24/01) for Continuation of the Stay Proceedings . Response due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 1/24/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Charles Einstman. Service: 8/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER re: as provided by the Order filed on 5/20/97, proceedings shall remain suspended to await a decision by the Board for the Correction of Naval Records on Plaintiff's renewed application for relief; within 30 days following a Decision by the cited Board, the parties shall file a status report(s). Absent a decision by the cited Board on or before 1/10/01, the Board is requested to notify the parties as to the amount of additional time estimated to be needed to reach a decision and an appropriate status report(s) shall be filed by 1/25/01. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE. Service: 6/29/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 6/29/00 ) for Leave to file his motion for a formal status conference . Response due: 7/17/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER re: proceedings shall remain suspended to await a decision by the Board for the Correction of Naval Records. Absent a decision by the Board on or before 6/15/00, set Status Report(s) deadline to 6/30/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT. by USA Service: 12/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [18-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings pending action by the BCNR. Within 30 days following a Decision by the BCNR, the parties shall file a status report. Absent a decision by the Board by 11/29/99, set the parties status report deadline to 12/13/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999, Terminated: 5/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 4/28/99 ) to continue stay of proceedings pending action by the BCNR. Response due: 5/17/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to extend time for continuance of stay of proceedings pending action by the board for correction of naval records set Status Report deadline to within 30 days following a decision by the Board or by June 1, 1999 ( Signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998, Terminated: 9/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 9/24/98 ) for Leave to extend time for continuance of stay of proceedings pending action by the board for correction of naval records . Response due: 10/26/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [14-1] motion for continuance of stay of proceedings until November 28, 1998. Parties to file a status report(s) within 30 days following a decision by the BCNR; absent a decision by the Board by November 30, 1998, the parties are to file a Status Report(s) by 11/30/98 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998, Terminated: 2/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 2/24/98 ) for continuance of stay of proceedings until November 28, 1998. (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to continue stay. parties to file a Status Report within 30 days of decision by Board , and parties to file a status report by 5/28/98, detailing additional time Board needs to issue decision, if a decision has not been issued by May 19, 1998 . ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997, Terminated: 9/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 9/26/97 ) for Leave to continue stay , (for six months). Response due: 10/14/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: (1) Within 30 days following a decision, the parties shall file status report(s); (2) Absent a decision by 11/19/97, parties shall file status report(s) re: additional time, etc. Status report by deadline of 9/9/99 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/6/97 ) to [9-1] motion for Leave to File Correction to Cross Motion Reply due: 5/23/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 4/21/97 By Hand) to [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 4/30/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service : 4/21/97 By Hand) for Leave to File Correction to Cross Motion . Response due: 5/8/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [0-0] motion to Extend Time to reply to memorandum . Response to [6-1] cross motion reset to 4/30/97 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/10/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to memorandum , [until 4/30/97]. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by JAMES BRYAN WEDDLE (Service: 3/31/97) and RESPONSE to [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by USA. Response due: 4/17/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [6-1] cross motion reset to 4/17/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/97) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service : 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER deeming pleading filed on 1/16/97 as a complaint and addressing further case proceedings guidelines (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 27 COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through K), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042898, (Motion for discovery under Rule 27 due by 2/18/97). (FE) Modified on 01/22/1997
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE) Modified on 01/22/1997
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?