NATIONAL CITY BANK, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00141-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Integra Financial Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
No Logo Landmark Savings Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
No Logo National City Bank Of Pennsylvania, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
No Logo National City Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Paul Levasseur +1 212 463 2000 llevasseur@mayerbrown.com
Office COFC
Filed 3/5/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/18/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Terminated:
      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/11/00 (by hand)) for an order to show cause and for expedited treatment. Response due: 10/25/00 (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur. Service : 3/8/99. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/31/1997 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Pamela Anne Roth Service : 12/29/97 (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from Winstar related list by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in accordance with the portion of the Court's 1/7/97 opinion precluding Winstar-related claims filed after 12/7/95, as untimely. . Service: 6/9/97 (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER Extending Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss (until 6/9/97) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (AB)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/9/97 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in accordance with the portion of the Court's 1/7/97 opinion precluding Winstar-related claims filed after 12/7/95, as untimely. (AB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/28/97 ) to Extend Time to June 9, 1997, to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss and reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' motion to stay proceedings. Response due: 6/16/97 (CDC)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL (Service: 5/15/97 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in accordance with the portion of the Court's 1/7/97 opinion precluding Winstar-related claims filed after 12/7/95, as untimely. Reply due: 5/29/97 (HW) Modified on 05/28/1997
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                        REPLY by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL to response to [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings in this action until 14 days after the Court of Appeal's final decision on the Ariadne appeal (and any other appeals of Judge Wiese's decision) and final action by the U.S. Supreme Court . Service: 5/15/97 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time [to 5/15/97] in which to file its reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/15/97 for [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings in this action until 14 days after the Court of Appeal's final decision on the Ariadne appeal (and any other appeals of Judge Wiese's decision) and final action by the U.S. Supreme Court , and Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in accordance with the portion of the Court's 1/7/97 opinion precluding Winstar-related claims filed after 12/7/95, as untimely. reset to 5/15/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Joseph Patrick for Added Thomas Matthew Buchanan. Copy to defendant. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997, Terminated: 4/30/1997 Terminated:
                              MOTION by NATIONAL CITY BANK, et al. (Service: 4/21/97) to Extend Time [to 5/15/97] in which to file its reply brief . Response due: 5/8/97. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/25/97 ) for Leave to File corrected response to motion to stay proceedings and motion to dismiss . Response due: 4/11/97 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/19/97) to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, in accordance with the portion of the Court's 1/7/97 opinion precluding Winstar-related claims filed after 12/7/95, as untimely. Response due: 4/21/9. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/19/97 ) to [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings in this action until 14 days after the Court of Appeal's final decision on the Ariadne appeal (and any other appeals of Judge Wiese's decision) and final action by the U.S. Supreme Court. Reply due: 3/31/97. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/27/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service: 3/20/97. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL (Service: 3/5/97) to Stay all proceedings in this action until 14 days after the Court of Appeal's final decision on the Ariadne appeal (and any other appeals of Judge Wiese's decision) and final action by the U.S. Supreme Court Response due: 3/24/97. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                                          NOTICE by NATIONAL CITY BANK, LANDMARK SAVINGS, NATIONAL CITY CORP., INTEGRA FINANCIAL of related case(s). (90-8 C and other related WINDSTAR cases). (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1,2 & 3), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043139. Answer due on 5/5/97. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?