FOLTZ v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00623-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LAWRENCE C. FOLTZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Joseph Green +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7152
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ethan Steinbuch +1 202 441 2849 robertsteinbuch@gmail.com
Office COFC
Filed 9/16/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/23/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be allowed to the defendant. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [8-1] [8-2] To the extent that defendant's dispositive motion filed on December 18, 1997 seeks dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, the motion is denied. To the extent that defendant's said motion alternately seeks dismissal of the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted and/or summary judgment on the administrative record, the motion is denied, the clerk is directed to enter judgmnet in favor of the defendant. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be allowed to the defendant.( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment . Service: 3/9/98 (CDC)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/19/98 for [8-1] motion to Dismiss, reset to 3/19/98 for [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998, Terminated: 2/26/1998 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief. (to March 19, 1998) (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
              RESPONSE by LAWRENCE C. FOLTZ (Service: 2/13/98 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment Reply due: 3/2/98 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, for judgment upon the administrative record Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 2/13/98, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 2/13/98 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998, Terminated: 1/12/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by LAWRENCE C. FOLTZ (Service : 1/5/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, for judgment upon the administrative record [to February 13, 1998]. Response due: 1/22/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Administrative Record
                    Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 12/17/97 (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record out of time ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/17/97) to Dismiss , or, alternatively for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record, together with separate appendix filed by leave of Judge. Response due: 1/20/98. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/17/97. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 12/18/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/17/97 ) for Leave to File the administrative record out of time . Response due: 1/5/98 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/19/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/17/97 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997, Terminated: 11/19/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to December 17, 1997). (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/7/1997 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by LAWRENCE C. FOLTZ (Service : 10/27/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Daniel Christopher Cox for LAWRENCE C. FOLTZ. Added Thomas Joseph Green. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ethan Steinbuch. Service: 10/7/97. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044153. Answer due on 11/17/97. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 225 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?