ROMING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00630-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo BEN D. ROMING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Salomon Gomez +1 202 616 0339
Office COFC
Filed 9/18/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $32000
Nature of Suit 516 - Miscellaneous - Damages
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/12/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint without prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Withdraw [1-1] complaint ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 12/18/1997 Terminated:
        MOTION by BEN D. ROMING (Service : 12/13/97 ) to Withdraw [1-1] complaint (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/97 ) to Dismiss pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) Response due: 12/18/97 (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/3/1997 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez Service: 10/1/97. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 10/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re: filing of motions for extension of time and requests for oral argument. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044183. Answer due on 11/17/97. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 53 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?