NORRIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00650-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FRANCES S. NORRIS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Mary Kelly +1 703 299 3700
Office COFC
Filed 9/29/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/14/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 2, 1998, affirmed [15-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [20-1] appeal by FRANCES S. NORRIS. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5076. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998, Terminated: 12/2/1998 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by FRANCES S. NORRIS. Copy to Defendant, Judge Bruggink and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 045004. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [18-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [17-1] order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998, Terminated: 1/22/1998 Terminated:
          MOTION by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service : 1/20/98 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [17-1] order . (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER denying as moot [16-1] motion for Leave to File a Surreply, Surreply, and Renewed Objection to Continuance ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998
              JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998
                Case closed (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998, Terminated: 1/14/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service : 1/9/98 ) for Leave to File a Surreply, Surreply, and Renewed Objection to Continuance . Response due: 1/26/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [5-1] motion to Dismiss complaint for lack of jurisdiction ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Terminated:
                      Amended RESPONSE by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service: 12/23/97 ) to [9-1] motion to Stay the filing of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, etc. filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/98 ) for Leave to File sur-reply , and renewed motion to Stay Proceeedings on plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 1/22/98 {Sur-reply is included in motion.} (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Stay the filing of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/8/1998 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service: 12/22/97 ) to [9-1] motion to Stay the filing of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment Reply due: 1/8/98 (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss complaint for lack of jurisdiction . Service: 12/12/97 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                RESPONSE by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service: 12/15/97 ) to [5-1] motion to Dismiss complaint for lack of jurisdiction Reply due: 1/5/98 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 1/5/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/12/97 ) to Stay the filing of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [for 60 days after the Court has ruled upon defendant's motion for dismissal]. Response due: 12/29/97 (JT) Modified on 01/05/1998
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 12/11/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by FRANCES S. NORRIS (Service : 12/5/97 ) for Summary Judgment , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/5/98. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/1/97) to Dismiss complaint for lack of jurisdiction Response due: 1/1/9. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Katherine Mary Kelly Service : 10/17/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/3/1997 Court Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                                            NOTICE by FRANCES S. NORRIS of related case. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044225. Answer due on 11/28/97. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?