STUDENT MINISTRIES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00657-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo STUDENT MINISTRIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Watkins +1 601 378 0121
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Gustafson David.D.Gustafson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/30/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/26/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STUDENT MINISTRIES, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by STUDENT MINISTRIES and USA. Service: 1/22/99. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/1/1998 Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by STUDENT MINISTRIES, USA. Service: 11/23/98. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by STUDENT MINISTRIES, USA. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by STUDENT MINISTRIES, USA. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998
                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 31, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER set Joint Status Report deadline to 6/1/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Status Conference
                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/30/98 ) (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Court Filing
                      ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 3/31/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report out of time. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998, Terminated: 2/20/1998 Terminated:
                            JOINT MOTION by STUDENT MINISTRIES and USA (Service : 2/19/98 ) for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report out of time 7/8/96 (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 AnswerCourt Filing
                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/29/97 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Douglas Gustafson. Service : 11/20/97. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 11/19/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/29/97 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997, Terminated: 11/19/1997 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by STUDENT MINISTRIES (Service : 11/14/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until December 29, 1997). Response due: 12/1/97 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibit A), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044254. Answer due on 12/1/97. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?