WETSEL-OVIATT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00668-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WETSEL-OVIATT LUMBER COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/3/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $71000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/19/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WETSEL-OVIATT and USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service :7/17/02 (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents and plaintiff's first request for admissions by 7/15/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service by hand: 6/16/98 ) to [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents and plaintiff's first request for admissions Reply due: 7/6/98 (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998, Terminated: 7/8/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's second set of interrogatories and request for production of documents and plaintiff's first request for admissions [until 7/15/98]. Response due: 6/29/98 (AB)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time, out of time, to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of documents ( Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by WETSEL-OVIATT (Service: 4/20/98 (by hand)) to [13-1] motion to Extend Time, out of time, to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of documents. Reply due: 4/29/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/17/1998, Terminated: 5/1/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/15/98 ) to Extend Time, out of time, to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of documents [to May 8, 1998]. Response due: 5/4/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 2/20/98 ( JPSR due 4/9/98 ) (AB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to February 20, 1998, within which to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 2/20/98. ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998, Terminated: 1/22/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/16/98 ) to Extend Time to February 20, 1998, within which to respond to complaint . Response due: 2/2/98. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint in this case reset Answer deadline to 1/16/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman Service : 12/18/97 (LD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint in this case reset Answer deadline to 1/16/98 ( signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/6/1998, Terminated: 12/15/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/2/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint in this case [to January 16, 1998]. Response due: 12/12/97 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gerald Mark Alexander Service : 10/14/97 (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                                    NOTICE by WETSEL-OVIATT of related cases. (94-389 C, 96-323 C and 97-487 C). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044286. Answer due on 12/2/97. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?