LIFSEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00719-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CARL LIFSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones, Osteen & Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Lawrence Arnold +1 912 876 0111
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Wayne Stewart
Office COFC
Filed 10/20/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/7/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 30, 2000 affirmed [50-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER denying as moot [51-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [49-1] order. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [52-1] appeal by CARL LIFSEY. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5104. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 53 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 7, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 52 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999, Terminated: 6/30/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by CARL LIFSEY. Copy to Defendant, Judge James T. Turner and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 047625. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 51 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 5/11/2000 Terminated:
            MOTION by CARL LIFSEY (Service : 5/13/99 ) for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [49-1] order. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 50 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 49 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Court Filing
                ORDER denying [22-1] motion to Dismiss or, granting [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, and directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant. Each party shall bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Oral Argument
                  Oral Argument re: [22-1] motion to Dismiss or by USA ( Transcript due 6/7/99 ), [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. by USA ( Transcript due 6/7/99 ) (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/29/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 47 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m., 5/7/99 for [22-1] motion to Dismiss, [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Oral Argument re: [22-1] motion to Dismiss or by USA set at 10:30 5/7/99, [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. by USA set at 10:30 5/7/99 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 46 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Wayne Stewart. Service: 12/28/98. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                              RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 10/2/98 ) to [41-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply in support of motion to dismiss or in the alternative for judgement upon the administrative record Reply due: 10/13/98. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 44 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by USA to response to [22-1] motion to Dismiss or, [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. Service: 9/29/98. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 43 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply in support of motion to dismiss or in the alternative for judgement upon the administrative record. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 10/5/98 for [22-1] motion to Dismiss or, reset to 10/5/98 for [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 42 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Service of Materials responsive to ARPERCEN's search by USA. Service: 9/25/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998, Terminated: 9/28/1998 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/24/98 ) to Extend Time to file a reply in support of motion to dismiss or in the alternative for judgement upon the administrative record , (until October 5, 1998). Response due: 10/13/98. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 9/11/98 ) to [22-1] motion to Dismiss or, [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 39 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying [35-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 4, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998
                                              Oral Argument re: [35-1] motion for Protective Order by USA ( Transcript due 10/5/98 ) (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                Oral Argument re: [35-1] motion for Protective Order by USA set at 2:30 p.m. on 9/4/98 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998
                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [35-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 8/20/98 (AB)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                    RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 8/14/98 ) to [35-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998, Terminated: 9/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/98 ) for Protective Order. Response due: 8/17/98 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of Service of the entire military record that ARPERCEN had mailed to Army counsel on June 17, 1998 by USA. Service: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/17/98 ) to [30-1] motion for leave of absence of counsel of record. Reply due: 8/3/98. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File Extracts from the Official Military Personnel File of Carl S. Lifsey, granting [23-2] motion for waiver of copying requirements., granting [30-1] motion for leave of absence of counsel of record, granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motions Response to [22-1] motion to Dismiss or reset to 9/17/98, [22-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. reset to 9/17/98 ( Signed by Judge James T. Turner. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Administrative Record
                                                              Administrative record filed by USA Service: 7/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                MOTION by CARL LIFSEY (Service : 7/13/98 ) for leave of absence of counsel of record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  REPLY by CARL LIFSEY to response to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motions. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/15/98 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/7/98 ) to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motions Reply due: 7/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by CARL LIFSEY (Service : 7/2/98 ) to Extend Time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motions [until after the Plaintiff receives a copy of the entire administrative record]. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT) Modified on 07/13/1998
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                        RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 7/2/98 ) to [23-1] motion for Leave to File Extracts from the Official Military Personnel File of Carl S. Lifsey, [23-2] motion for waiver of copying requirements. Reply due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 6/19/98 ) to [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998, Terminated: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/29/98 ) for Leave to File Extracts from the Official Military Personnel File of Carl S. Lifsey , and for waiver of copying requirements. Response due: 7/16/98 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/29/98 ) to Dismiss or , in the Alternative, for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. Response due: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 6/29/98. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998, Terminated: 6/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                    Renewed MOTION by USA (Service : 6/17/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to June 29, 1998]. Response due 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/19/98 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Service: 6/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                          RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 6/2/98 ) to [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reply due: 6/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 6/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint . Response due: 6/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY to [14-2] order. Service: 5/1/98 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [11-1] motion for a more definite statement of plaintiff's claim . Plaintiff shall produce to government counsel copies of all documents by 5/8/98 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [11-1] motion for a more definite statement of plaintiff's claim. Service: 4/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 4/7/98 ) to [11-1] motion for a more definite statement of Plaintiff's claim. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998, Terminated: 4/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/26/98) for a more definite statement of plaintiff's claim . Response due: 3/16/98. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY by CARL LIFSEY to response to [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Service: 1/5/98. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 3/19/98. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998, Terminated: 2/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to March 19, 1998) Response due: 2/17/98 (DS)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a response to the complaint . Answer deadline to 2/17/98 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CARL LIFSEY (Service: 12/17/97 ) to [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a response to the complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/5/98 (JT) Modified on 01/07/1998
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997, Terminated: 1/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/12/97 ) to Extend Time within which to file a response to the complaint [to February 17, 1998] Response due: 12/29/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re: special procedures to conserve resources of the parties and expedite disposition ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/6/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Peter Stuart Levitt Service: 10/31/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044347. Answer due on 12/19/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?