JARVIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00806-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo BILLY W. JARVIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D Copeland +1 972 931 8300 +1 972 931 8305 jdctax@sbcglobal.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin C. King, Jr. +1 202 307 6506 benjamin.c.king@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES A. BRUTON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig D. Singer +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 csinger@wc.com
No Logo ROBERT S. BENNETT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD LOUIS BRUSCA +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 8209 Richard.Brusca@skadden.com
Office COFC
Filed 11/24/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $25000000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/27/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (167) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 153 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Costs Taxed
Costs Taxed in amount of $ $4,440.75 against plaintiff. (dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 152 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 CAFC Mandate Affirming
    MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated January 28, 2002 affirmed [148-1] judgment order. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 151 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 1/28/2002 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by BILLY W. JARVIS. Copy to Judge Eric G. Bruggink, Defendant and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 050753. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 150 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Bill of Costs
        Bill of costs by USA. Service: 10/26/00 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 11/13/00 ) (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 149 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ERRATA substituting page of the Opinion of 9/27/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 148 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Costs to the defendant. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 147 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Court Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint. Costs to the defendant. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 146 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Transcript
                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Pre-Trial Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 15, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 145 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Transcript
                    BENCH RULING, 1 volume, at Fort Worth, Texas, for date of August 24, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 144 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000
                      Cumulative Index filed 1 volume, at Fort Worth, Texas, for the dates of August 22-24, 2000. Filed together with Defendant's Exhibits: 1, 7-17, 19-21, 23, 32-33, 38-39; Plaintiff's Exhibits: 1, 3-4, 6, 9-11, 19-20, 22, 27. Notice to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 143 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 2 volumes, at Fort Worth, Texas for the dates of August 22-23, 2000. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 142 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [138-1] motion for ruling on Plaintiff's cross-motion to compel production (Defendant's objections to the production of certain documents submitted for in camera review are denied in part and sustained in part), granting in part, denying in part [139-1] motion to Quash Subpoena (Mr. Loosley need only be available for testimony on 8/25/00), denying [141-1] motion to set place of trial in Dallas, Texas, denying [141-2] motion for Continuance. Set Trial for 8/22/00 in Fort Worth, Texas. Defendant shall present its case-in-chief first. Fed. R. Evid. 615 is invoked. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 141 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 8/14/00) to set place of trial in Dallas, Texas , or, for Continuance . Response due: 8/31/00. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Pretrial Conference
                              Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 9/14/00 ) (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 140 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000
                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 11, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 139 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/11/00) to Quash Subpoena . Response due: 8/28/00. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000
                                    Evidentiary Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/16/00 ) (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000
                                      Hearing set at 1:30 p.m. on 8/11/00 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 138 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 8/9/00 ) for ruling on Plaintiff's cross-motion to compel production. Response due: 8/28/00 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 137 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [135-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial memorandum of contentions of fact and law by 8/8/00 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 136 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA. Service: 8/8/00. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 135 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000, Terminated: 8/8/2000 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/7/00) to Extend Time to file pretrial memorandum of contentions of fact and law , (until August 8, 2000). Response due: 8/24/00. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 134 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                Amended Exhibit list by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/31/00 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re: Gerald Hilsher and Gary Richardson are required to attend trial in Dallas, Texas, or Fort Worth, Texas, from 8/22/00-8/25/00, notwithstanding distance of travel. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 2:00 p.m. 8/15/00 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 132 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/28/00 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. Response due: 8/14/00 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Witness List
                                                        Witness list by USA. Service: 7/28/00 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Exhibit
                                                          Exhibit list by USA. Service: 7/28/00 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Witness ListCourt Filing
                                                            Amended Witness List by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/00 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                              Amended Exhibit list by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/11/00 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Witness List
                                                                Witness list by BILLY W. JARVIS. Service: 7/7/00 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Exhibit
                                                                  Exhibit list by BILLY W. JARVIS. Service: 7/7/00 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER set Plaintiff's Appendix G deadline on 7/11/00; set Defendant's Appendix G deadline on 7/28/00 ; set Defendant's memorandum of contentions of fact and law filing deadline to 8/7/00 ; set Plaintiff's response to Defendant's memorandum due 8/14/00 ; set telephonic pretrial Conference for 8/15/00 ; and set trial for 9:30 a.m., CST 8/22/00-8/25/00 in Dallas, Texas. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying [120-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is directed to advise the court by telephone on or before 6/30/00, on behalf of both parties, as to the feasibility of conducting trial during the week of August 21, 2000. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. (1 Separate Volume of Exhibits) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/11/00 (JT) Modified on 05/16/2000
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                          BRIEF by BILLY W. JARVIS re: [120-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BILLY W. JARVIS. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/20/00 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000, Terminated: 6/27/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                            MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 4/17/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/18/00 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 15, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER amending the Order of 3/15/00. Within 21 days of service of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Defendant shall file only a statement of genuine issues. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/04/2000
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/30/00. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 3/30/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000
                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/14/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 3/15/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Benjamin C. King Jr. Service : 2/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/14/00 (JT) Modified on 02/07/2000
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 22, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [87-1] motion to quash subpoenas. Set joint Status Report deadline to 1/14/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/22/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by BILLY W. JARVIS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [102-1] motion for Leave to File, out of time, joint status report. Set telephonic Status Conference for 3:30 p.m., 11/22/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [105-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests until November 1, 1999. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 10/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests [until November 1, 1999]. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [101-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories, request for production of documents and request for supplementation of Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's requests for admission until 10/25/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF by USA re: objection to the production of certain documents. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 11/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/19/99 ) for Leave to File, out of time, joint status report. Response due: 11/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories, request for production of documents and request for supplementation of Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's requests for admission [until October 25, 1999]. Response due: 11/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [97-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's requests for production of documents. Reset Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's requests for production of documents deadline to 10/6/99. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/23/1999
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          REPLY by ROBERT S. BENNETT, JAMES A. BRUTON to response to [87-1] motion to quash subpoenas, [87-2] motion for entry of protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS to [93-1] notice by USA. Service: 9/10/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/18/1999, Terminated: 9/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/15/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's requests for production of documents [until October 6, 1999]. Response due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 8/30/99 ) to [87-1] motion to quash subpoenas, [87-2] motion for entry of protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [94-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion to quash subpoenas, or for a protective order. Plaintiff's response to [87-1] motion to quash subpoenas reset to 9/1/99, [87-2] motion for entry of protective order reset to 9/1/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/02/1999
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999, Terminated: 9/1/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 8/23/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to quash subpoenas, or for a protective order [until August 30, 1999]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [87-1] motion to quash subpoenas reset to 9/1/99, [87-2] motion for entry of protective order reset to 9/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of "Brief In Support Of Its Objection To The Production Of Certain Documents" by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [91-1] motion to Extend Time to submit certain document's to the Court for in camera review. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/24/99 for Defendant to submit certain documents to the court for an in camera review. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999, Terminated: 8/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/99) to Extend Time to submit certain document's to the Court for in camera review , (until August 24, 1999). Response due: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of order originally filed under seal on May 13, 1999). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [73-1] motion to publish opinion without certain redactions. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [86-1] motion to Extend Time to submit documents in camera and a brief re: documents by 8/20/99 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999, Terminated: 11/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ROBERT S. BENNETT, JAMES A. BRUTON (Service : 8/6/99 ) to quash subpoenas or, in the alternative, for entry of protective order. Response due: 8/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999, Terminated: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/6/99 ) to Extend Time to submit documents in camera and a brief re: documents [until August 20, 1999]. Response due: 8/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 24, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [81-1] motion for summary judgment and set joint status report deadline to 10/18/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                              REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BILLY W. JARVIS. Service: 6/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999, Terminated: 7/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 6/28/99 ) for summary judgment. Response due: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [57-1] motion for summary judgment, mooting [78-1] motion for an order requiring Plaintiff to bring its motion for summary judgment in compliance with RCFC 56 and 83.1, denying [71-1] motion to dismiss, denying [69-1] motion to compel production of documents (Plaintiff may re-file a request for production of documents. Defendant shall respond to the renewed request within 21 days of service.), denying [70-1] motion to compel production of documents pursuant to subpoena duces tecum, granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time to permit discovery. Reset discovery deadline to 10/18/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/26/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/18/99 ) to [70-1] motion to compel production of documents pursuant to subpoena duces tecum, [69-1] motion to compel production of documents and Plaintiff's request to take depositions. Reply due: 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/18/99 ) for an order requiring Plaintiff to bring its motion for summary judgment in compliance with RCFC 56 and 83.1. Response due: 7/6/99 (JT) Modified on 06/22/1999
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/18/99 ) to [71-1] motion to dismiss third cause of action. Reply due: 7/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/18/99 ) to Extend Time to permit discovery to be had [until October 16, 1999]. Response due: 7/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set telephonic status conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/24/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Defendant shall respond to the following pending motions: 1) April 27, 1999 motion for partial summary judgment, 2) June 1, 1999 renewed motion to compel production of documents, 3) June 1, 1999 renewed motion to compel production of documents pursuant to subpoena duces tecum and 4) June 3, 1999 motion to dismiss third cause of action (contained in April 27, 1999 motion for partial summary judgment), by June 18, 1999 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999, Terminated: 8/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 6/3/99) to publish opinion without certain redactions . [FILED UNDER SEAL] Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by BILLY W. JARVIS. Service: 6/1/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 6/1/99) to Dismiss plaintiff's third cause of action. Response due: 7/2/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        RENEWED MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 5/28/99 ) to compel production of documents pursuant to subpoena duces tecum. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT) Modified on 06/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          RENEWED MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 5/28/99 ) to compel production of documents. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Defendant's response to [57-1] motion for summary judgment (count one) reset to 6/28/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 7, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished ordered entered on March 31, 1999 and filed under seal) ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/18/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing Defendant's status report under seal. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/18/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [54-1] motion For reconsideration of [53-1] order, denying [60-1] motion to compel production of documents, denying [59-1] motion to compel production of documents. Set joint status report deadline to 5/28/99. signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (See entry of 8/16/99) (JT) Modified on 08/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Defendant is relieved of its duty to file oppositions to Plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment or either of its two motions to compel pending the court's issuance of an opinion on the motion for reconsideration. That opinion will establish filing deadlines for the Defendant's opposition briefs in those matters; Defendant shall file a joint status report by 5/13/99 ; and the depositions scheduled for 5/18/99 and 5/19/99 are indefinitely postponed pending the court's forthcoming opinion on the motion for reconisderation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/7/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 5/3/99) to Compel Production Of Documents . Response due: 5/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 4/30/99) to Compel production of documents pursuant to subpoena duces tecum . Response due: 5/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 5/7/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 5/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint status report. Reset joint status report deadline to 5/13/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999, Terminated: 6/25/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 4/23/99 ) for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999, Terminated: 4/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/99) to Extend Time to file a joint status report , (until May 13, 1999). Response due: 5/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999, Terminated: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 4/8/99 ) For reconsideration of [53-1] order Set joint status report deadline to 4/23/99. under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings FILED UNDER SEAL 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 26, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 04/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [47-1] motion for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint, denying motion for leave to file a cross-motion for summary judgment, granting [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The second and third causes of action are dismissed. The first cause of action is limited to a maximum recovery of $1,769.099.18. Set joint status report deadline to 4/23/99. (see entry of 5/19/99) ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 05/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS re: [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/27/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. by USA ( Transcript due 4/26/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing "Amended Certificate of Service" by BILLY W. JARVIS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/28/99 ) to [47-1] motion for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Reply due: 2/11/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by John David Copeland. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 1/11/99 ) for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Response due: 1/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 9:30 a.m. 3/26/99 for [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS to [40-1] memorandum by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by John David Copeland. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL F. COX by USA. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/6/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental proposed finding of uncontroverted fact and second declaration of Michael F. Cox. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA re: [28-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 11/6/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998, Terminated: 11/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/6/98 ) for Leave to supplemental proposed finding of uncontroverted fact and second declaration of Michael F. Cox . [FILED UNDER SEAL] Response due: 11/23/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for production of documents . Interrogatories deadline to 12/4/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filing Defendant's motion for protective order and Plaintiff's response to motion for protective order by leave of the Judge and granting [35-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 10/16/98 ) to [35-1] motion for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998, Terminated: 10/21/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998, Terminated: 10/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for production of documents , (until December 4, 1998). Response due: 11/6/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting defendant's [32-1] motion to Extend Time to file supplemental brief to November 9, 1998 set plaintiff's Brief deadline to 11/23/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998, Terminated: 9/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/24/98 ) to Extend Time to file supplemental brief , (until November 9, 1998). Response due: 10/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [29-1] motion for More Definite Statement. Set briefs (not to exceed ten (10) pages of text) due: 9/25/98 for USA, 10/9/98 for BILLY W. JARVIS and set oral argument for 10:00 a.m., 10/27/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/1/98 ) to [29-1] motion for More Definite Statement. Reply due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 6/24/98 ) for More Definite Statement. Response due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Service: 6/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to reply in support of motion for partial summary judgment. Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response to motion reset to 6/22/98 for [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/3/98 ) to Extend Time to reply in support of motion for partial summary judgment [until June 21, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 5, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION OF JOHN D. COPELAND by BILLY W. JARVIS Re: [21-1] motion response by BILLY W. JARVIS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 5/21/98 ) to [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 5/21/98 ) for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Out of Time. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response to [12-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment reset to 5/18/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998, Terminated: 5/12/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service : 2/8/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [to May 18, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: pursuant to the telephone status conference of 5/5/98, the United States is directed to furnish to the court for in camera review the information and analysis used by the IRS to conclude the Plaintiff would be entitled to $1,769,099.18. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: discovery matters. ( Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/4/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 5/5/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report. Set telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 4/22/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference set at 11:00 a.m. on 4/22/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/6/98 (JT) Modified on 04/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998, Terminated: 3/31/1999 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/6/98 ) for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998, Terminated: 4/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by BILLY W. JARVIS, USA for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER allowing plaintiff's response to defendant's motions to be filed by leave; and denying as moot without prejudice to reassertion, [7-1] motion to suspend discovery, [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's requests for admission. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BILLY W. JARVIS (Service: 3/19/98 ) to [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's requests for admission, [7-1] motion to suspend discovery in this case until the filing of the joint preliminary status report filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 4/2/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 2/23/98 ( JPSR due 4/13/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998, Terminated: 3/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/98 ) to suspend discovery in this case until the filing of the joint preliminary status report. (filed as a motion for protective order) Response due: 2/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/3/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's requests for admission [to May 26, 1998]. Response due: 2/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 2/23/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/23/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until February 22, 1998.] Response due: 1/26/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Fitzpatrick Cox Service : 1/9/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits Ap1-p6), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044539. Answer due on 1/23/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?