MATHENY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00812-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICK R. MATHENY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/25/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 9/27/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PATRICK R. MATHENY. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. Service: 9/22/04.(dls)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
    MOTION to Stay proceedings by PATRICK R. MATHENY. Filed by leave of the Judge. (Amended Status Report included)Service: 2/9/04. Response due by 2/26/2004 (jat, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Status ReportCourt Filing
      AMENDED STATUS REPORT by PATRICK R. MATHENY. Filed by leave of the Judge. (Motion to Stay included) Service: 2/9/04.(jat, ) Modified on 2/24/2004 (jat, ).
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER: The stay of proceedings shall continue until further order of the court and pltf is DIRECTED to FILE a Status Report within thirty days of the VA Regional office decision indicating the status of the subject matter. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Terminated:
          STATUS REPORT and MOTION to Continue the Stay of Proceedings by PATRICK R. MATHENY.Service: 2/3/2004. Response due by 2/20/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Springer Moore for USA. Service: 11/18/03.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Staying proceedings pending outcome of ABCMR decision (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by PATRICK R. MATHENY. Service: 3/27/01. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Deadline updated; setting Status Report deadline to 10/3/01 . (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Opher Shweiki Service : 9/12/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat. Service: 4/29/99. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                        Notice of reassignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Change of attorney name by USA. Service: 8/13/98. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Status Report
                            STATUS REPORT by PATRICK R. MATHENY. Service: 6/30/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Deadline updated; set Petitioner's Status Report deadline to 1/2/99. (180 days) (JT) Modified on 07/13/1998
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/1998, Entered: 1/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay the proceedings pending a decision on plaintiff's application presently before the Army Board of Correction of Military Records. Set Status Report deadline to 7/13/98 and every 180 days thereafter. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998, Terminated: 1/13/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by PATRICK R. MATHENY (Service : 1/8/98 ) to Stay the proceedings pending a decision on plaintiff's application presently before the Army Board of Correction of Military Records. Response due: 1/26/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: 1/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re: special procedures ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Randi-Sue Rimerman Service : 12/11/97 (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                                        NOTICE by PATRICK R. MATHENY of related case; (96-189 C). (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044546. Answer due on 1/26/98. (FE)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 212 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?