WOLL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00846-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MARY CAROL WOLL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Moran +1 412 355 0355
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/24/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated September 30, 1999 affirmed [20-1] judgment order (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [22-1] appeal by MARY CAROL WOLL. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5179. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998, Terminated: 9/30/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MARY CAROL WOLL. Copy to Defendant, Judge Miller and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 046241. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 20, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998
          JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED DECISION granting [6-2] defendant's motion for judgment upon the administrative record, and denying plaintiff's [15-1] cross motion, and directing Clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant. (Signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller.) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998
              Case closed (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Oral Argument
                Oral Argument re: [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record by USA ( Transcript due 8/19/98 ), [15-1] cross motion by MARY CAROL WOLL ( Transcript due 8/19/98 ) (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Set/Reset Hearings
                  Oral Argument re: [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record by USA, [15-1] cross motion by MARY CAROL WOLL rescheduled at 11:00 a.m. on 7/20/98 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 7/16/98 for [15-1] cross motion, [6-1] and [6-2] motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/18/98 ) to [15-1] cross motion. Reply due: 6/2/98. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by USA to [14-1] statement facts by MARY CAROL WOLL. Service: 5/18/98. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                          CROSS MOTION by MARY CAROL WOLL ( Service: 4/27/98 ) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(4) by USA, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/28/98 (JT) Modified on 05/05/1998
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                            STATEMENT OF PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS filed by MARY CAROL WOLL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/27/98 (JT) Modified on 05/04/1998
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                              COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by MARY CAROL WOLL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/27/98 (JT) Modified on 05/04/1998
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] cross motion reset to 5/28/98. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/25/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(4) reset to 4/28/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998, Terminated: 3/25/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by MARY CAROL WOLL (Service: 3/23/98) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss until 4/28/98. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Administrative Record
                                      Administrative record filed by USA. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 3/3/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/27/98 ) for Leave to File administrative record Response due: 3/16/98 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 Statement of Facts
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 2/27/98 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/27/98 ) to Dismiss pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(4) , for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record Response due: 3/30/98 (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/2/98 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998, Terminated: 2/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to March 2, 1998]. Response due: 2/23/98 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/7/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla Service : 12/31/97 (LD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A,B & C), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044641. Answer due on 2/13/98. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?