FABER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00271-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY E. FABER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil B. Kabatchnick +1 202 872 1051
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/10/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/15/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LARRY E. FABER, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Terminated:
      RESPONSE by LARRY E. FABER to [22-1] order. Service: 1/27/99 (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER that Case shall be dismissed on January 29, 1999, in absence of further explanation from plaintiff or an absolute deadline for Board action ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 1/15/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 Court Filing
            ORDER set status report deadline to 1/15/99 or earlier if this matter is resolved before then. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 12/16/98. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER Service: 8/13/98 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 7/24/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER set Plaintiff's Status Report deadline to 7/28/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998
                      STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER Service: 6/11/98 (AB)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Status Report
                        STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 4/24/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: this case remains pending while Plaintiff awaits a ruling from the Board for Correction of Military Records. Plaintiff will advise the court as soon as possible of the status of that case. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998
                            STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 3/6/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER. Service: 1/8/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of change of facsimile number by Neil B. Kabatchnick, attorney for LARRY E. FABER. Service: 12/8/97 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by LARRY E. FABER Service: 10/28/97 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline that plaintiff will advise the Court concerning the status of his appeal to the Correction Board ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (CDC) Modified on 10/30/1997
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [3-1] motion to suspend proceedings in order to permit plaintiff to seek relief administratively by the Secretary of the Air Force, acting by and through the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla Service : 4/29/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by LARRY E. FABER to [4-2] order. Service: 4/18/97 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to questions in order by 4/25/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997, Terminated: 5/9/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by LARRY E. FABER (Service: 4/10/97) to suspend proceedings in order to permit plaintiff to seek relief administratively by the Secretary of the Air Force, acting by and through the Air Force Board for Correction of Military Records. Response due: 4/28/97. (FE) Modified on 04/15/1997
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT (Filing Fee waived, see 96-205 C), Answer due on 6/9/97. (FE) Modified on 04/15/1997
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 343 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?