FEDERAL DEPOSIT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00282-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fdic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Joseph Igo +1 202 942 3609
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Thomas Murphy
Office COFC
Filed 4/16/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/29/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FEDERAL DEPOSIT and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Terminated:
      MOTION by FEDERAL DEPOSIT, USA for entry of joint stipulated order of dismissal without prejudice. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
        Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER extending the appointment of Judge Wiese as the Issue Judge to resolve the statute of limitations question, with the case to be reassigned to Judge Wiese. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Decision to opt out of case-specific discovery by FEDERAL DEPOSIT. Service: 3/16/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FEDERAL DEPOSIT. Service: 4/27/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FEDERAL DEPOSIT. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patrick Terrence Murphy. Service : 5/4/98. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick. Service : 2/3/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Clarification regarding the status of this case in the Court; and allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from Winstar related list by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997, Terminated: 7/21/1997 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/97) for Clarification regarding the status of this case in the Court Response due: 7/7/97. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 6/12/97 (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 4/21/1997 Court Filing
                            Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997 Notice of Related Cases
                              NOTICE by FEDERAL DEPOSIT of related case (96-108 C). (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT (Filing Fee waived), Answer due on 6/16/97. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?