GUARANTY FINANCIAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-cv-00335-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GUARANTY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Stephen Blatt +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 dblatt@wc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Paul Levasseur +1 212 463 2000 llevasseur@mayerbrown.com
Office COFC
Filed 5/14/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $10000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/24/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GUARANTY FINANCIAL, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur Service : 9/24/97 (CDC)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 Terminated Case
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER allowing parties to file a motion requesting removal from the Winstar related case list by 8/20/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 08/01/1997
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/14/97 ) to Dismiss the Complaint Response due: 8/14/97 (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Complaint
              COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through D), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043555. Answer due on 7/14/97. (FE)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 162 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?