FORD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00330-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN MICHAEL FORD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ming-Yuen Meyer-Fong +1 202 305 1311
Office COFC
Filed 4/13/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/11/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) dated August 4, 2000 affirmed [23-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [24-1] appeal by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5112. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999, Terminated: 8/4/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD. Copy to Judge Francis Allegra, defendant and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 047676. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [8-2] defendant's motion for Judgment on the administrative record, denying plaintiff's [11-1] cross motion for judgment on the administrative record. No costs. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 30, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Oral Argument
                Oral Argument re: [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 4/29/99 ) (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 3/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/30/99 for [11-1] cross motion, [8-1] motion to Dismiss, for [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD to response to [11-1] cross motion. Service: 2/3/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to file reply brief out of time. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999, Terminated: 2/8/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD (Service : 2/3/99 ) for Leave to to file reply brief out of time (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                              MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 8/7/98) to file Exhibit to Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response to Motion to Dismiss or for judgment on the record Response due: 8/24/98. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/7/98 ) to [11-1] cross motion. Reply due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Statement of Facts
                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD. Service: 7/9/98. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                    CROSS MOTION by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD ( Service: 7/9/98 ) and RESPONSE to [8-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 8/10/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [11-1] cross motion reset to 8/10/98. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                        NOTICE of Correction to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/17/98 (JT) Modified on 06/22/1998
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998 Statement of Facts
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA Service: 6/12/98 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/12/98 ) to Dismiss , for Summary Judgment [with separately bound appendix] Response due: 7/13/98 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 2/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Designate Administrative Record. Response to plaintiff's designation of administrative record due on 6/12/98. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Designate Administrative Record [to June 12, 1998]. Response due: 5/18/98 (JT) Modified on 02/08/1999
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ming-Yuen Meyer-Fong Service : 4/30/98 (CDC)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 2/8/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                    Designation of administrative record by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD. Service: 4/13/98 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                      NOTICE by KEVIN MICHAEL FORD of no related cases. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045324. Answer due on 6/12/98. (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?