MILAS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00331-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THEODORE PATRICK MILAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/13/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/20/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 3, 1999 affirmed [23-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [24-1] appeal by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5056. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999, Terminated: 12/3/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS. Copy to Defendant, Judge Tidwell and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT #047019. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION denying [18-1]plaintiff's cross motion, for judgment on the administrative record, and granting [9-1] defendant's motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS to response to [18-1] cross motion. Service: 10/27/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/16/98 ) to [18-1] cross motion. Reply due: 11/2/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER filing by leave Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record andReply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                    CROSS MOTION by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS ( Service: 9/16/98 ) and RESPONSE to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/19/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/16/98 (JT) Modified on 09/24/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER filing by leave of the court Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for judgement [sic] on the administrative record and cross motion for judgement [sic] on the administrative record. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [18-1] cross motion reset to 10/19/98. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or for judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998, Terminated: 8/13/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS (Service : 8/6/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or for judgment upon the administrative record [to September 30, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Administrative Record
                                Administrative record (three volumes) filed by USA. Service: 8/4/98. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file palintiff's Naval service record, the official record for the board for correction of Naval records and the transcript of the board of inquiry, granting [11-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998, Terminated: 8/4/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/27/98 ) for Leave to file palintiff's Naval service record, the official record for the board for correction of Naval records and the transcript of the board of inquiry , and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 8/17/98. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Statement of Facts
                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 7/27/98 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/27/98 ) for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record . Response due: 8/27/98 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to answer complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 7/27/98. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/5/98 ) to Extend Time to answer complaint [to July 27, 1998]. Response due: 6/22/98 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes. Service : 5/13/98 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Court Filing
                                                ORDER informing the parties of two rules that will apply to the litigation of this suit in addition to the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS (Service: 4/13/98) for Leave to File Administrative Record Response due: 4/30/98. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                    NOTICE by THEODORE PATRICK MILAS of no related cases. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045324. Answer due on 6/12/98. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 396 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?