BORN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00333-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES JOSEPH BORN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Ann Smith +1 703 548 3774 +1 703 518 5545 pasmithaty@aol.com
Office COFC
Filed 4/13/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/11/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. Each party is to bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [15-1] motion to dismiss, denying [21-1] motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by JAMES JOSEPH BORN to response to [21-1] motion for summary judgment. Service: 9/4/99 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 9/15/99 for [21-1] motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to dismiss, [15-2] motion to dismiss and for judgment upon the administrative record. Service: 8/10/99 (reply to response to renewed motion included) (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/10/99 ) to [21-1] motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 8/27/99 (reply to response to renewed motion included) (JT) Modified on 08/11/1999
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by JAMES JOSEPH BORN (Service: 7/27/99 ) to [15-1] motion to dismiss, [15-2] motion to dismiss and for judgment upon the administrative record. Reply due: 8/27/99 (renewed motion for summary judgment included) (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Terminated:
                  RENEWED MOTION by JAMES JOSEPH BORN (Service : 7/27/99 ) for summary judgment. Response due: 8/27/99 (response to renewed motion to dismiss included) (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER Plaintiff's response to [15-1] motion to dismiss reset to 8/2/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Administrative Record
                      Administrative record (James Joseph Born) filed by USA. Service: 5/21/99. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record of James Born (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999, Terminated: 5/27/1999 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/99 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record of James Born. Response due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Statement of Facts
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 5/21/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Terminated:
                              RENEWED MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/99 ) to dismiss or, in the alternative, to dismiss and for judgment upon the administrative record. Response due: 6/21/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patricia Ann Smith. Service : 4/1/99. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 5/21/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999, Terminated: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/16/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until May 21, 1999]. Response due: 4/2/99 (JT) Modified on 03/17/1999
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER denying [8-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 10/21/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          RESPONSE by JAMES JOSEPH BORN (Service: 10/6/98 ) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/23/98 (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by JAMES JOSEPH BORN (Service : 10/6/98 ) for Summary Judgment Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/6/98 (CDC) Modified on 10/19/1998
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998, Terminated: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/10/98 ) to Dismiss Response due: 10/13/98 (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 9/10/98. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998, Terminated: 6/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 9/10/98]. (AB)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ethan Steinbuch. Service : 5/1/98 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 23), Answer due on 6/12/98. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998, Terminated: 4/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by JAMES JOSEPH BORN (Service: 4/13/98) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?